Giza v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: DEBORAH ANN GIZA
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 2:2020cv00263
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL CASE sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 9/17/2020. (mr)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
August 7, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (rmf)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 , WAIVES payment of the filing fee, and DIRECTS the United States Marshals Service to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 8/6/2020. (rmf)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , #4 Order,, Set Deadlines, filed by Deborah Ann Giza. (Gikas, Rick)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Deborah Ann Giza is afforded until 8/19/2020, to file an amended in forma pauperis motion on the Court's form. She is CAUTIONED if she does not respond by the deadline, she may be denied leave to proceed in forma pauperis because the current motion is ambiguous. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 8/5/2020. (lhc)
July 14, 2020 Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE; IFP MOTION PENDING) (bas)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Rick C Gikas on behalf of DEBORAH ANN GIZA (Gikas, Rick)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff DEBORAH ANN GIZA. (Gikas, Rick)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by DEBORAH ANN GIZA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Action of Appeals Council, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Summons to U.S. Attorney, #4 Addendum Marshall's Service Form to U.S. Attorney, #5 Proposed Summons Summons to U.S.A.G., #6 Addendum Marshall's Service Form to U.S.A.G., #7 Proposed Summons Summons to Commissioner of SSA, #8 Addendum Marshall's Service form to Commissioner of SSA)(Gikas, Rick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giza v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH ANN GIZA
Represented By: Rick C Gikas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?