Hartford Fire Insurance Company v. 4 Pardo Inc et al
Plaintiff: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: DVL Express Inc, Accutrac Capital, Accutrac Capital also known as eCapital Freight Factoring Inc as assignee of Karamjit Singh doing business as KP Trucking, Karan Transport Inc, MMJ Transportation Inc doing business as Road Legends, US Freight Lines Inc, Eva Logistics Inc, Daily Trucking LLC, AG Expedited Inc, NS Brothers Inc, Dhami Brothers Trucking Inc, Financial Carrier Services LLC as assignee of Kerna Inc doing business as K Trans, Road Falcons Inc, Young & Sons Transportation Inc, EGL Logistics Inc, Fast Running Inc, Dark Horse Express LLC, Kingz Trucking Inc, Global Freight Group Inc, JAAP Trucking Inc, Trans Recovery Solutions LLC, Atlas SN Holding LLC, Byard Transport LLC, G Squared Funding LLC, Tradition Transportation Co LLC, Ekron Elite Transportation LLC, US Highway Express Inc, InstaPay Flexible LLC, DAB Trucking Services Inc, OTR Capital LLC, Muzom Transportation Inc, Capable Express LLC, Highway Express Inc, TruckStar Logistics Inc, GMT Logistic Inc, Cowen Truck Line Inc, JKS Logistics Inc, Falcon Express Lines Inc, Indy Star Transport Inc, Lucky Express Group Inc, Penguin Trucking Inc, Royal Cargo Group Corp, 22 Transport LLC, AM Trucking LLC, American Motor Transportation Inc, Patriot Carriers Inc, England Carrier Services LLC as assignee of JBs Trucking doing business as Jesus Urrea Berrelleza, Transportation Finance Corp, BIR Transport Co Inc, Bibby Transportation Finance Inc doing business as eCapital Freight Factoring (East) Corp as assignee of Dark Horse Express LLC, BGS Transport LLC, Velox Transport Solutions LLC, Star Way Corp, EGZIT Corporation, RRM Transportation, KY Truck Lines LLC, TAFS Inc, TruckStar Inc, Bibby Transportation Finance Inc doing business as eCapital Freight Factoring (East) Corp as assignee of JEZ Transport Inc, MLS Logistics LLC, TBS Factoring Service LLC, S&T Transport Inc, Soorma Trucking LLC, Pride USA Inc, England Carrier Services LLC, JPMKL Inc, Prime Trucking Inc, KL Franks Trucking LLC, Cargo Carriers Inc, TSK Express LLC, Drina Express Inc, Bibby Transportation Finance Inc doing business as eCapital Freight Factoring (East) Corp as assignee of DRC Elite Inc, Road Wolves Inc, AMZ Trans Inc, STL Truckers LLC, M&S Transport Inc, GGF Inc, United Transport Inc, Transwest Capital Inc, Amal Transportation LLC, Wiseway Motor Freight Inc, NAS Logistics LLC, Orange Commercial Credit Inc, MGR Freight System Inc, Freightx Logistics Inc, TKO Logistics Inc, B&B Carriers LLC, All to Express Corp doing business as ATEC, 18 Wheeler Transportation Inc, Streamline Express Inc, Delta Freight Inc, NIK Logistics LLC, Silvas Express Inc, Corelogic Credco LLC, Shepard Trucking LLC, Jeep Transport LLC, US 1 Logistics LLC, ZED Express LLC, All State Enterprise Inc, Financial Carrier Services LLC, Sunbelt Finance LLC, Gold Sky Logistics Inc, Rakmark Inc, Assist Financial Services Inc, NIS Freight Inc, Connect Express LLC, Tru Funding LLC, MMR Express Inc, R&R Transportation Inc, Go Power Inc, MCM Trucking Inc, DDM Logistics Inc, Max Freight Inc, Old Time Express Inc, Kennedy Transportation Inc, IIK Transport Inc, Versatile Transport LLC, Warnert Racing Inc, Phoenix Capital Group, LLC, Indy Freight Brokerage, Express Freight Finance Inc, Devin Horne Transport LLC, SUV Trucking Co LLC, Excel Moving & Hauling Inc doing business as EMH Logistic, Alexander Winton & Associates Inc as assignee of A&L Cargo doing business as Fast Track Express, Commonwealth Capital LLC, Bethel Brothers Logistics LLC, New Sound Transport Inc, Sunbelt Finance LLC as assignee of G&M Trucking Inc doing business as Grace & Mercy Trucking, Eagle Eye Truck Lines LLC, PAM International Inc, Bultrans Freight Systems Inc, GetGo Transportation Co LLC, Trans Cold Logistics LLC, IGS Trans Inc, Dovgal Express Inc, EDJ Trucking Inc, Assist Financial Services Inc as assignee of All to Express Corp doing business as ATEC, Goom Inc, 2K Transportation Inc, Foley Carrier Services LLC, LJM International LLC, Delta Freight Systems LLC, Quality Freight LLC, Spectrum Express Inc, Border Team LLC, Relex Logistics Inc, RD Expedited Inc, WB Logistics Inc, 4 Pardo Inc, AFS World LLC, Judgin Transportation Inc, JTT Logistics Inc, MISL Transport Inc, AFS Logistics Inc, Lama Express Inc, G&M Trucking Inc doing business as Grace and Mercy Trucking, Prime Trux LLC, USA Cargo LLC, ATL Express Inc, Kollcaku Inc, Griffin Transportation Inc, A & K Trucking of Atlanta LLC, Iowa Express Inc, Alexander Winton & Associates Inc, Freedom 1 Inc, Open Way Inc, Cornerstone Cargo LLC, Saber Trucking LLC, Expect Logistics Inc, DRC Elite Inc, BSL Express Trucking Inc, SAFinancial Group Inc, Solid Group Inc, Abraham & Associates PLLC, Aladdin Capital Inc, eCapital Freight Factoring Inc, First Choice Auto LLC, Forsage Inc, WIM Transportation LLC, Sierra Finance International LLC and R Lara Trucking Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00334
Filed: September 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2020 Filing 63 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to 2K Transportation Inc; A&K Trucking of Atlanta LLC; AFS Logistics Inc; Alexander Winton & Associates Inc as assignee of A&L Cargo dba Fast Track Express; Alexander Winton & Associates Inc as assignee of Big M Transportation Inc; Alexander Winton & Associates Inc as assignee of Brite Logistics; Alexander Winton & Associates as assignee of Cargo Solutions Express Inc; Alexander Winton & Associates Inc as assignee of CB Trucking Inc; Alexander Winton & Associates Inc as assignee of Dhami Brothers Trucking Inc; Alexander Winton & Associates Inc as assignee of DMN Transport Inc; Alexander Winton & Associates Inc as assignee of EDJ Trucking Inc; Alexander Winton & Associates Inc as assignee of Expect Logistics Inc; Alexander Winton & Associates Inc as assignee of Falcon Express Lines Inc; Alexander Winton & Associates Inc as assignee of Far West Capital for Border Team LLC; Alexander Winton & Associates Inc as assignee of Ideal Trans LLC; Alexander Winton & Associates Inc as assignee of Indy Freight Brokerage Inc; Alexander Winton & Associates Inc as assignee of Karan Transport Inc; Alexander Winton & Associates Inc as assignee of Kennedy Transportation; Alexander Winton & Associates Inc as assignee of Old Time Express Inc; Alexander Winton & Associates Inc as assignee of Patriot Carriers Inc; Alexander Winton & Associates Inc as assignee of Quality Freight LLC; Alexander Winton & Associates Inc as assignee of Royal Cargo Group Corp; Alexander Winton & Associates Inc as assignee of Solid Group Inc; Alexander Winton & Associates Inc as assignee of Tital Quality Transport; Alexander Winton & Associates Inc as assignee of Trans Cold Logistics; Alexander Winton & Associates Inc as assignee of TRansStates Express Inc; Alexander Winton & Associates Inc as assignee of Versatile Transport LLC; AMZ Trans Inc; ATL Express Inc; Byard Transport LLC; Commonwealth Capital LLC as assignee of Daily Trucking LLC; Daily Trucking Inc; GetGo Transportation Co LLC; Gold Sky Logistics Inc; KY Truck Lines LLC; M&S Transport Inc; MISL Transport Inc; PAM International Inc; Royal Cargo Group Corp; Solid Group Inc; Transwest Capital Inc as assignee of MMR Express Inc; United Transport Inc; US 1 Logistics LLC; US Freight Lines Inc by Plaintiff Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
November 13, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to AG Expedited Inc; All to Express Corp dba ATEC; Amal Transportation LLC; American Motor Transportation Inc; Bethel Brothers Logistics LLC; Cornerstone Cargo LLC; DAB Trucking Services Inc; Delta Freight Inc; Ekron Elite Transportation LLC; Eva Logistics Inc; Freightx Logistics Inc; G&M Trucking Inc dba Grace and Mercy Trucking; Gold Sky Logistics Inc; Griffin Transportation Inc; IGS Trans Inc; JKS Logistics Inc; Max Freight Inc; MCM Trucking Inc; NIS Freight Inc; Prime Trucking Inc; SA Financial Group Inc as assignee of Asante Trucking LLC; Star Way Corp; Tradition Transportation Co LLC; USA Cargo LLC; US Highway Express Inc; Warnert Racing Inc; WIM Transportation LLC by Plaintiff Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
November 13, 2020 Filing 61 Proposed Summons filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Cranley, Grace)
November 12, 2020 Filing 60 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *AFS World LLC; Corelogic Credco LLC as assignee of BIR Transport Co Inc; Corelogic Credco LLC as assignee of Cowen Truck Line Inc; Corelogic Credco LLC as assignee of R&R Transportation Inc; Corelogic Credco LLC as assignee of SV Group; JAAP Trucking Inc; NIK Logistics LLC; Silva's Express Inc; TSK Express LLC* regarding #56 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company (nae)
November 12, 2020 Filing 59 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Forsage, Inc* regarding #55 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company (nae)
November 11, 2020 Filing 58 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Spectrum Express Inc served on 11/3/2020, answer due 11/24/2020. (Cranley, Grace)
November 11, 2020 Filing 57 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Relex Logistics Inc served on 11/2/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. (Cranley, Grace)
November 11, 2020 Filing 56 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to AFS World LLC; Corelogic Credco LLC as assignee of BIR Transport Co Inc; Corelogic Credco LLC as assignee of Cowen Truck Line Inc; Corelogic Credco LLC as assignee of R&R Transportation Inc; Corelogic Credco LLC as assignee of SV Group; JAAP Trucking Inc; NIK Logistics LLC; Silvas Express Inc; TSK Express LLC by Plaintiff Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
November 11, 2020 Filing 55 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Forsage Inc by Plaintiff Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
November 11, 2020 Filing 54 ANSWER to #22 Counterclaim of England Carrier Services LLC by Hartford Fire Insurance Company.(Gumbiner, Krysta)
November 10, 2020 Filing 53 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Cowen Truck Line Inc; Sunbelt Finance LLC as assignee of 2K Transportation Inc; Sunbelt Finance LLC as assignee of Drina Express Inc; Sunbelt Finance LLC as assignee of G&M Trucking Inc dba Grace and Mercy Trucking; Sunbelt Finance LLC as assignee of KY Truck Lines* regarding #47 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company (nae)
November 10, 2020 Filing 52 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Border Team LLC; Capable Express LLC; First Choice Auto LLC; Foley Carrier Services LLC as assignee of MLS Logistics LLC; Foley Carrier Services LLC as assignee of SUV Trucking Co LLC; Freedom 1 Inc; Kingz Trucking Inc; OTR Capital LLC as assignee of 22 Transport LLC; OTR Capital LLC as assignee of AFS World LLC; OTR Capital LLC as assignee of Bethel Brothers Logistics LLC; OTR Capital LLC as assignee of Cargo Carriers Inc; OTR Capital LLC as assignee of Kingz Trucking Inc; OTR Capital LLC as assignee of LJM International LLC; OTR Capital LLC as assignee of Shepard Trucking LLC; OTR Capital LLC as assignee of Velox Transport Solutions LLC; OTR Capital LLC as assignee of Young & Sons Transportation; R&R Transportation Inc; Shepard Trucking LLC; STL Truckers LLC; Tru Funding LLC as assignee of Global Freight Group Inc; Tru Funding LLC as assignee of NS Brothers Inc* regarding #44 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company (jat)
November 10, 2020 Filing 51 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *Aladdin Capital Inc as assignee of B&B Carriers; All State Enterprise Inc; Assist Financial Services Inc as assignee of All to Express Corp dba ATEC; Assist Financial Services Inc as assignee of DAB Trucking Services Co; Assist Financial Services Inc as assignee of Delta Freight Inc; Assist Financial Services Inc as assignee of Fortune Lines Inc; Assist Financial Services Inc as assignee of Go Power Inc; Assist Financial Services Inc as assignee of Gold Sky Logistics Inc; Assist Financial Services Inc as assignee of Indy Star Transport Inc; Assist Financial Services Inc as assignee of Iowa Express Inc; Assist Financial Services Inc as assignee of JTT Logistics Inc; Assist Financial Services Inc as assignee of RRM Transportation; Assist Financial Services Inc as assignee of WB Logistics Inc; Atlas SN Holding LLC as assignee of TAK Trucking Inc; BIR Transport Co Inc; Bultrans Freight Systems Inc; Cargo Carriers Inc; Connect Express LLC; Dark Horse Express LLC; DDM Logistics Inc; EGL Logistics Inc; Express Freight Finance Inc as assignee of Amal Transportation LLC; Express Freight Finance Inc as assignee of MCM Trucking Inc; Falcon Express Lines Inc; Global Freight Group Inc; GMT Logistic Inc; Highway Express Inc; Indy Star Tranport Inc; Kennedy Transportation Inc; KL Franks Trucking LLC; Lama Express Inc; NS Brothers Inc; Old Time Express Inc; Orange Commercial Credit Inc as assignee of NIK Logistics LLC; Penguin Trucking Inc; Phoenix Capital Group LLC as assignee of JAAP Trucking Inc; Phoenix Capital Group LLC as assignee of Redic Trucking Inc; Phoenix Capital Group LLC as assignee of Saber Trucking LLC; Pride USA Inc; Quality Freight LLC; Rakmark Inc; Road Falcons Inc; Saber Trucking LLC; SUV Trucking Co LLC; TAFS Inc as assignee of AGD Group Inc; TAFS Inc as assignee of Heroes Trucking; TAFS Inc as assignee of STL Truckers LLC; TAFS Inc as assignee of US Highway Express Inc; Velox Transport Solutions LLC; Versatile Transport LLC; Wiseway Motor Freight Inc; ZED Express LLC* regarding #43 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company (jat)
November 10, 2020 Filing 50 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against *DRC Elite Inc; EDJ Trucking Inc; EGZIT Corporation; Goom Inc; Iowa Express Inc; Jeep Transport LLC; JTT Logistics Inc; Judgin Transportation Inc; Kollcaku Inc; Muzom Transportation Inc; New Sound Transport Inc; Prime Trux LLC; Road Wolves Inc; Streamline Express Inc; Transportation Finance Corp as assignee of Eva Logistics Inc; Transportation Finance Corp as assignee of Judgin Transportation Inc; Transportation Finance Corp as assignee of Streamline Express Inc; TruckStar Inc; Young & Sons Transportation Inc* regarding #42 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default,, filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company (jat)
November 10, 2020 Filing 49 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against 22 Transport LLC; Devon Horne Transport LLC; Financial Carrier Services LLC as assignee of ATL Express Inc; Financial Carrier Services LLC as assignee of B and J Express LLC; Financial Carrier Services LLC as assignee of Kerna Inc dba K Trans; TKO Logistics Inc regarding #46 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company (kjp)
November 10, 2020 Filing 48 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT against 18 Wheeler Transportation Inc; B&B Carriers LLC; Bibby Transportation Finance Inc dba eCapital Freight Factoring East Corp as assignee of Dark Horse Express; Bibby Transportation Finance Inc dba eCapital Freight Factoring East Corp as assignee of DRC Elite Inc; Bibby Transportation Finance Inc dba eCapital Freight Factoring East Corp as assignee of JEZ Transport Inc; DVL Express dba Dovgal Express Inc; GGF Inc; Indy Freight Brokerage Inc; Karan Transport Inc; LJM International LLC; Patriot Carriers Inc regarding #45 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company (kjp)
November 9, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Cowen Truck Line Inc; Sunbelt Finance LLC as assignee of 2K Transportation Inc; Sunbelt Finance LLC as assignee of Drina Express Inc; Sunbelt Finance LLC as assignee of G&M Trucking Inc dba Grace and Mercy Trucking; Sunbelt Finance LLC as assignee of KY Truck Lines by Plaintiff Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
November 6, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to 22 Transport LLC; Devon Horne Transport LLC; Financial Carrier Services LLC as assignee of ATL Express Inc; Financial Carrier Services LLC as assignee of B and J Express LLC; Financial Carrier Services LLC as assignee of Kerna Inc dba K Trans; TKO Logistics Inc by Plaintiff Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
November 6, 2020 Filing 45 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to 18 Wheeler Transportation Inc; B&B Carriers LLC; Bibby Transportation Finance Inc dba eCapital Freight Factoring East Corp as assignee of Dark Horse Express; Bibby Transportation Finance Inc dba eCapital Freight Factoring East Corp as assignee of DRC Elite Inc; Bibby Transportation Finance Inc dba eCapital Freight Factoring East Corp as assignee of JEZ Transport Inc; DVL Express dba Dovgal Express Inc; GGF Inc; Indy Freight Brokerage Inc; Karan Transport Inc; LJM International LLC; Patriot Carriers Inc by Plaintiff Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service Dkt 18, #2 Exhibit B-Proof of Service Dkt 37, #3 Exhibit C-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
November 5, 2020 Filing 44 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Border Team LLC; Capable Express LLC; First Choice Auto LLC; Foley Carrier Services LLC as assignee of MLS Logistics LLC; Foley Carrier Services LLC as assignee of SUV Trucking Co LLC; Freedom 1 Inc; Kingz Trucking Inc; OTR Capital LLC as assignee of 22 Transport LLC; OTR Capital LLC as assignee of AFS World LLC; OTR Capital LLC as assignee of Bethel Brothers Logistics LLC; OTR Capital LLC as assignee of Cargo Carriers Inc; OTR Capital LLC as assignee of Kingz Trucking Inc; OTR Capital LLC as assignee of LJM International LLC; OTR Capital LLC as assignee of Shepard Trucking LLC; OTR Capital LLC as assignee of Velox Transport Solutions LLC; OTR Capital LLC as assignee of Young & Sons Transportation; R&R Transportation Inc; Shepard Trucking LLC; STL Truckers LLC; Tru Funding LLC as assignee of Global Freight Group Inc; Tru Funding LLC as assignee of NS Brothers Inc by Plaintiff Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
November 5, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Aladdin Capital Inc as assignee of B&B Carriers; All State Enterprise Inc; Assist Financial Services Inc as assignee of All to Express Corp dba ATEC; Assist Financial Services Inc as assignee of DAB Trucking Services Co; Assist Financial Services Inc as assignee of Delta Freight Inc; Assist Financial Services Inc as assignee of Fortune Lines Inc; Assist Financial Services Inc as assignee of Go Power Inc; Assist Financial Services Inc as assignee of Gold Sky Logistics Inc; Assist Financial Services Inc as assignee of Indy Star Transport Inc; Assist Financial Services Inc as assignee of Iowa Express Inc; Assist Financial Services Inc as assignee of JTT Logistics Inc; Assist Financial Services Inc as assignee of RRM Transportation; Assist Financial Services Inc as assignee of WB Logistics Inc; Atlas SN Holding LLC as assignee of TAK Trucking Inc; BIR Transport Co Inc; Bultrans Freight Systems Inc; Cargo Carriers Inc; Connect Express LLC; Dark Horse Express LLC; DDM Logistics Inc; EGL Logistics Inc; Express Freight Finance Inc as assignee of Amal Transportation LLC; Express Freight Finance Inc as assignee of MCM Trucking Inc; Falcon Express Lines Inc; Global Freight Group Inc; GMT Logistic Inc; Highway Express Inc; Indy Star Tranport Inc; Kennedy Transportation Inc; KL Franks Trucking LLC; Lama Express Inc; NS Brothers Inc; Old Time Express Inc; Orange Commercial Credit Inc as assignee of NIK Logistics LLC; Penguin Trucking Inc; Phoenix Capital Group LLC as assignee of JAAP Trucking Inc; Phoenix Capital Group LLC as assignee of Redic Trucking Inc; Phoenix Capital Group LLC as assignee of Saber Trucking LLC; Pride USA Inc; Quality Freight LLC; Rakmark Inc; Road Falcons Inc; Saber Trucking LLC; SUV Trucking Co LLC; TAFS Inc as assignee of AGD Group Inc; TAFS Inc as assignee of Heroes Trucking; TAFS Inc as assignee of STL Truckers LLC; TAFS Inc as assignee of US Highway Express Inc; Velox Transport Solutions LLC; Versatile Transport LLC; Wiseway Motor Freight Inc; ZED Express LLC by Plaintiff Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
November 5, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to DRC Elite Inc; EDJ Trucking Inc; EGZIT Corporation; Goom Inc; Iowa Express Inc; Jeep Transport LLC; JTT Logistics Inc; Judgin Transportation Inc; Kollcaku Inc; Muzom Transportation Inc; New Sound Transport Inc; Prime Trux LLC; Road Wolves Inc; Streamline Express Inc; Transportation Finance Corp as assignee of Eva Logistics Inc; Transportation Finance Corp as assignee of Judgin Transportation Inc; Transportation Finance Corp as assignee of Streamline Express Inc; TruckStar Inc; Young & Sons Transportation Inc by Plaintiff Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proof of Service, #2 Exhibit B-Affidavit)(Cranley, Grace)
October 30, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE of Proof of Service received by Gold Sky Logistics Inc re #8 Summons Issued. *Note: Summons was issued, served on 9/22/2020 and docketed with our court on 10/23/2020 DE #32 . (shk)
October 30, 2020 Filing 40 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. GetGo Transportation Co LLC served on 10/9/2020, answer due 10/30/2020. (Cranley, Grace)
October 30, 2020 Filing 39 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Byard Transport LLC served on 10/8/2020, answer due 10/29/2020. (Cranley, Grace)
October 30, 2020 Filing 38 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Alexander Winton & Associates Inc served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Cranley, Grace)
October 29, 2020 Filing 37 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. DVL Express Inc served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. (Cranley, Grace)
October 29, 2020 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. MISL Transport Inc served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; PAM International Inc served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; A & K Trucking of Atlanta LLC served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Cranley, Grace)
October 29, 2020 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. ATL Express Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Commonwealth Capital LLC served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Daily Trucking LLC served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; KY Truck Lines LLC served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Solid Group Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Transwest Capital Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; US 1 Logistics LLC served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; United Transport Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; 2K Transportation Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; AFS Logistics Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Cranley, Grace)
October 29, 2020 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. M&S Transport Inc served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Royal Cargo Group Corp served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; US Freight Lines Inc served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; AMZ Trans Inc served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Cranley, Grace)
October 26, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE by Hartford Fire Insurance Company re #10 Order on Motion to Deposit Funds,, (Cranley, Grace)
October 23, 2020 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. All to Express Corp served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; American Motor Transportation Inc served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Bethel Brothers Logistics LLC served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; DAB Trucking Services Inc served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Delta Freight Inc served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Freightx Logistics Inc served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; G&M Trucking Inc served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Gold Sky Logistics Inc served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; IGS Trans Inc served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; US Highway Express Inc served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; WIM Transportation LLC served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Cranley, Grace)
October 23, 2020 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Amal Transportation LLC served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Cornerstone Cargo LLC served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Griffin Transportation Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; MCM Trucking Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Max Freight Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; NIS Freight Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; RD Expedited Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Star Way Corp served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Tradition Transportation Co LLC served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; USA Cargo LLC served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Warnert Racing Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; AG Expedited Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Cranley, Grace)
October 23, 2020 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. JKS Logistics Inc served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Prime Trucking Inc served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; SAFinancial Group Inc served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Cranley, Grace)
October 19, 2020 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Eva Logistics Inc served on 10/8/2020, answer due 10/29/2020. (Cranley, Grace)
October 19, 2020 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Ekron Elite Transportation LLC served on 10/3/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (Cranley, Grace)
October 16, 2020 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Corelogic Credco LLC served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020; JAAP Trucking Inc served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020; NIK Logistics LLC served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020; Silvas Express Inc served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020; TSK Express LLC served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020; AFS World LLC served on 9/28/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Cranley, Grace)
October 15, 2020 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Forsage Inc served on 9/26/2020, answer due 10/19/2020. (Cranley, Grace)
October 15, 2020 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Cowen Truck Line Inc served on 9/25/2020, answer due 10/16/2020; Sunbelt Finance LLC served on 9/25/2020, answer due 10/16/2020. (Cranley, Grace)
October 13, 2020 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by England Carrier Services LLC re #20 Notice of Appearance, #22 Counterclaim, #21 Answer to Complaint (Bertkau, Bradley)
October 13, 2020 Filing 22 COUNTERCLAIM against Hartford Fire Insurance Company, filed by England Carrier Services LLC.(Bertkau, Bradley)
October 13, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by England Carrier Services LLC.(Bertkau, Bradley)
October 13, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley A Bertkau on behalf of England Carrier Services LLC (Bertkau, Bradley)
October 12, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Devin Horne Transport LLC served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020; Financial Carrier Services LLC served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020; TKO Logistics Inc served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020; 22 Transport LLC served on 9/24/2020, answer due 10/15/2020. (Cranley, Grace)
October 12, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. B&B Carriers LLC served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020; Bibby Transportation Finance Inc served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020; GGF Inc served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020; Indy Freight Brokerage served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020; Karan Transport Inc served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020; LJM International LLC served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020; Patriot Carriers Inc served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020; 18 Wheeler Transportation Inc served on 9/23/2020, answer due 10/14/2020. (Cranley, Grace)
October 12, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Border Team LLC served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Capable Express LLC served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; First Choice Auto LLC served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Foley Carrier Services LLC served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Freedom 1 Inc served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; InstaPay Flexible LLC served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Kingz Trucking Inc served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; OTR Capital LLC served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; R&R Transportation Inc served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; STL Truckers LLC served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Shepard Trucking LLC served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Tru Funding LLC served on 9/22/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Cranley, Grace)
October 9, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Aladdin Capital Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; All State Enterprise Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Assist Financial Services Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Atlas SN Holding LLC served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; BIR Transport Co Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Bultrans Freight Systems Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Cargo Carriers Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Connect Express LLC served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; DDM Logistics Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Dark Horse Express LLC served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; EGL Logistics Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; England Carrier Services LLC served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Express Freight Finance Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Falcon Express Lines Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; GMT Logistic Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Global Freight Group Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Highway Express Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Indy Star Transport Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; KL Franks Trucking LLC served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Kennedy Transportation Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Lama Express Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; MGR Freight System Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; NS Brothers Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Old Time Express Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Orange Commercial Credit Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Penguin Trucking Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Phoenix Capital Group, LLC served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Pride USA Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Quality Freight LLC served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Rakmark Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Road Falcons Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; SUV Trucking Co LLC served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Saber Trucking LLC served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; TAFS Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Velox Transport Solutions LLC served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Versatile Transport LLC served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Wiseway Motor Freight Inc served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; ZED Express LLC served on 9/21/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Cranley, Grace)
October 8, 2020 Filing 29 RECEIPT of $75,000.00 re DE #10 from Plaintiff Hartford Fire Insurance Company. Receipt No. 2021373. (cc: Financial). (nal)
October 8, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. DRC Elite Inc served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; EDJ Trucking Inc served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; EGZIT Corporation served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Goom Inc served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Iowa Express Inc served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; JTT Logistics Inc served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Jeep Transport LLC served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Judgin Transportation Inc served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Kollcaku Inc served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Muzom Transportation Inc served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; New Sound Transport Inc served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Prime Trux LLC served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Road Wolves Inc served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Streamline Express Inc served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Transportation Finance Corp served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; TruckStar Inc served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020; Young & Sons Transportation Inc served on 9/19/2020, answer due 10/13/2020. (Cranley, Grace)
October 7, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by InstaPay Flexible LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- Claim Docs)(Mahoney, Ryan)
October 7, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan A Mahoney on behalf of InstaPay Flexible LLC (Mahoney, Ryan)
October 1, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by MGR Freight System Inc, RD Expedited Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -- MGR Invoice, #2 Exhibit 2 -- RD Invoice)(Mahoney, Ryan)
October 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan A Mahoney on behalf of MGR Freight System Inc, RD Expedited Inc (Mahoney, Ryan)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTS #2 MOTION to Deposit Funds by Plaintiff Hartford Fire Insurance Company and DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to accept and deposit into the Registry of the Court the tender of funds from Plaintiff in the amount of $75,000.00. The Clerk of the Court shall invest the monies properly and promptly, and without further order of the Court may deduct the registry fee as authorized by the Judicial Conference of the United States from the income earned while funds are held in Registry. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a notice with this Court when the deposit has been made. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 9/17/2020. (cc: SB Financial) (lhc)
September 16, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to PAM International Inc, Patriot Carriers Inc, Penguin Trucking Inc, Phoenix Capital Group, LLC, Pride USA Inc, Prime Trucking Inc, Prime Trux LLC, Quality Freight LLC, R Lara Trucking Inc, R&R Transportation Inc, RD Expedited Inc, RRM Transportation, Rakmark Inc, Relex Logistics Inc, Road Falcons Inc, Road Wolves Inc, Royal Cargo Group Corp, S&T Transport Inc, SAFinancial Group Inc, STL Truckers LLC, SUV Trucking Co LLC, Saber Trucking LLC, Shepard Trucking LLC, Sierra Finance International LLC, Silvas Express Inc, Solid Group Inc, Soorma Trucking LLC, Spectrum Express Inc, Star Way Corp, Streamline Express Inc, Sunbelt Finance LLC, TAFS Inc, TBS Factoring Service LLC, TKO Logistics Inc, TSK Express LLC, Tradition Transportation Co LLC, Trans Cold Logistics LLC, Trans Recovery Solutions LLC, Transportation Finance Corp, Transwest Capital Inc, Tru Funding LLC, TruckStar Inc, TruckStar Logistics Inc, US 1 Logistics LLC, US Freight Lines Inc, US Highway Express Inc, USA Cargo LLC, United Transport Inc, Velox Transport Solutions LLC, Versatile Transport LLC, WB Logistics Inc, WIM Transportation LLC, Warnert Racing Inc, Wiseway Motor Freight Inc, Young & Sons Transportation Inc, ZED Express LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jat)
September 16, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to G Squared Funding LLC, G&M Trucking Inc, GGF Inc, GMT Logistic Inc, GetGo Transportation Co LLC, Global Freight Group Inc, Go Power Inc, Gold Sky Logistics Inc, Goom Inc, Griffin Transportation Inc, Highway Express Inc, IGS Trans Inc, IIK Transport Inc, Indy Freight Brokerage, Indy Star Transport Inc, InstaPay Flexible LLC, Iowa Express Inc, JAAP Trucking Inc, JKS Logistics Inc, JPMKL Inc, JTT Logistics Inc, Jeep Transport LLC, Judgin Transportation Inc, KL Franks Trucking LLC, KY Truck Lines LLC, Karan Transport Inc, Kennedy Transportation Inc, Kingz Trucking Inc, Kollcaku Inc, LJM International LLC, Lama Express Inc, Lucky Express Group Inc, M&S Transport Inc, MCM Trucking Inc, MGR Freight System Inc, MISL Transport Inc, MLS Logistics LLC, MMJ Transportation Inc, MMR Express Inc, Max Freight Inc, Muzom Transportation Inc, NAS Logistics LLC, NIK Logistics LLC, NIS Freight Inc, NS Brothers Inc, New Sound Transport Inc, OTR Capital LLC, Old Time Express Inc, Open Way Inc, Orange Commercial Credit Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jat)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to ATL Express Inc, Abraham & Associates PLLC, Accutrac Capital, Aladdin Capital Inc, Alexander Winton & Associates Inc, All State Enterprise Inc, All to Express Corp, Amal Transportation LLC, American Motor Transportation Inc, Assist Financial Services Inc, Atlas SN Holding LLC, B&B Carriers LLC, BGS Transport LLC, BIR Transport Co Inc, BSL Express Trucking Inc, Bethel Brothers Logistics LLC, Bibby Transportation Finance Inc, Border Team LLC, Bultrans Freight Systems Inc, Byard Transport LLC, Capable Express LLC, Cargo Carriers Inc, Commonwealth Capital LLC, Connect Express LLC, Corelogic Credco LLC, Cornerstone Cargo LLC, Cowen Truck Line Inc, DAB Trucking Services Inc, DDM Logistics Inc, DRC Elite Inc, DVL Express Inc, Daily Trucking LLC, Dark Horse Express LLC, Delta Freight Inc, Delta Freight Systems LLC, Devin Horne Transport LLC, Dhami Brothers Trucking Inc, Drina Express Inc, EDJ Trucking Inc, EGL Logistics Inc, EGZIT Corporation, Eagle Eye Truck Lines LLC, Ekron Elite Transportation LLC, England Carrier Services LLC, Eva Logistics Inc, Excel Moving & Hauling Inc, Expect Logistics Inc, Express Freight Finance Inc, Falcon Express Lines Inc, Fast Running Inc, Financial Carrier Services LLC, First Choice Auto LLC, Foley Carrier Services LLC, Forsage Inc, Freedom 1 Inc, Freightx Logistics Inc, 18 Wheeler Transportation Inc, 22 Transport LLC, 2K Transportation Inc, 4 Pardo Inc, A & K Trucking of Atlanta LLC, AFS Logistics Inc, AFS World LLC, AG Expedited Inc, AM Trucking LLC, AMZ Trans Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jat)
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Cranley, Grace)
September 16, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Cranley, Grace)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 Proposed Summons filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Cranley, Grace)
September 16, 2020 DISREGARD: Counsel did not submit Summons or Request for Waiver of Service. (jat) Modified on 9/16/2020 (jat).
September 16, 2020 Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. NEW CASE; Motion pending. (jat)
September 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Krysta K Gumbiner on behalf of Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Gumbiner, Krysta)
September 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Deposit Funds by Plaintiff Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Cranley, Grace)
September 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4341685.), filed by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Acceptance Report, #2 Exhibit B-Cancellation Notice, #3 Exhibit C-Listing of Claims, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cranley, Grace)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartford Fire Insurance Company v. 4 Pardo Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DVL Express Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accutrac Capital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accutrac Capital also known as eCapital Freight Factoring Inc as assignee of Karamjit Singh doing business as KP Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karan Transport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MMJ Transportation Inc doing business as Road Legends
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Freight Lines Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eva Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daily Trucking LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AG Expedited Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NS Brothers Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dhami Brothers Trucking Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Carrier Services LLC as assignee of Kerna Inc doing business as K Trans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Road Falcons Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young & Sons Transportation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EGL Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fast Running Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dark Horse Express LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingz Trucking Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Freight Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAAP Trucking Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Recovery Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas SN Holding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byard Transport LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Squared Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tradition Transportation Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ekron Elite Transportation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Highway Express Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: InstaPay Flexible LLC
Represented By: Ryan A Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAB Trucking Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTR Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Muzom Transportation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capable Express LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Highway Express Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TruckStar Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMT Logistic Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowen Truck Line Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JKS Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Falcon Express Lines Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indy Star Transport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucky Express Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penguin Trucking Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Cargo Group Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 22 Transport LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AM Trucking LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Motor Transportation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patriot Carriers Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: England Carrier Services LLC as assignee of JBs Trucking doing business as Jesus Urrea Berrelleza
Represented By: Bradley A Bertkau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transportation Finance Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BIR Transport Co Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bibby Transportation Finance Inc doing business as eCapital Freight Factoring (East) Corp as assignee of Dark Horse Express LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BGS Transport LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velox Transport Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Star Way Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EGZIT Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RRM Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KY Truck Lines LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TAFS Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TruckStar Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bibby Transportation Finance Inc doing business as eCapital Freight Factoring (East) Corp as assignee of JEZ Transport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MLS Logistics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TBS Factoring Service LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S&T Transport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soorma Trucking LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pride USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: England Carrier Services LLC
Represented By: Bradley A Bertkau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMKL Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Trucking Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KL Franks Trucking LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargo Carriers Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TSK Express LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drina Express Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bibby Transportation Finance Inc doing business as eCapital Freight Factoring (East) Corp as assignee of DRC Elite Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Road Wolves Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMZ Trans Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STL Truckers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&S Transport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GGF Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Transport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transwest Capital Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amal Transportation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wiseway Motor Freight Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAS Logistics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orange Commercial Credit Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGR Freight System Inc
Represented By: Ryan A Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freightx Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TKO Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&B Carriers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All to Express Corp doing business as ATEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 18 Wheeler Transportation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Streamline Express Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Freight Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIK Logistics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvas Express Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corelogic Credco LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shepard Trucking LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeep Transport LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US 1 Logistics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ZED Express LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All State Enterprise Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Carrier Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbelt Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gold Sky Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rakmark Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assist Financial Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NIS Freight Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connect Express LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tru Funding LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MMR Express Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&R Transportation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Go Power Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCM Trucking Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DDM Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Freight Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Time Express Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kennedy Transportation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IIK Transport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Versatile Transport LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warnert Racing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Capital Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indy Freight Brokerage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Freight Finance Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin Horne Transport LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUV Trucking Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Excel Moving & Hauling Inc doing business as EMH Logistic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Winton & Associates Inc as assignee of A&L Cargo doing business as Fast Track Express
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commonwealth Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bethel Brothers Logistics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Sound Transport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunbelt Finance LLC as assignee of G&M Trucking Inc doing business as Grace & Mercy Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Eye Truck Lines LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAM International Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bultrans Freight Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GetGo Transportation Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Cold Logistics LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IGS Trans Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dovgal Express Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDJ Trucking Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assist Financial Services Inc as assignee of All to Express Corp doing business as ATEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goom Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2K Transportation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foley Carrier Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LJM International LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Freight Systems LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Freight LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectrum Express Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Border Team LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Relex Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RD Expedited Inc
Represented By: Ryan A Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WB Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4 Pardo Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFS World LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judgin Transportation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JTT Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MISL Transport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AFS Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lama Express Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&M Trucking Inc doing business as Grace and Mercy Trucking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prime Trux LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Cargo LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATL Express Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kollcaku Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Griffin Transportation Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A & K Trucking of Atlanta LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iowa Express Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Winton & Associates Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom 1 Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Open Way Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornerstone Cargo LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saber Trucking LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Expect Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DRC Elite Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BSL Express Trucking Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAFinancial Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solid Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abraham & Associates PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aladdin Capital Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eCapital Freight Factoring Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Choice Auto LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forsage Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WIM Transportation LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sierra Finance International LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Lara Trucking Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Krysta K Gumbiner
Represented By: Grace Winkler Cranley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?