Davey-Moser v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: LISA J. DAVEY-MOSER and Lisa J Davey-Moser
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL and Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 2:2020cv00346
Filed: September 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USM obo Lisa J Davey-Moser. Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/20/2020, answer due 12/21/2020. (shk)
October 28, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The parties having consented pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge John E Martin for all purposes and is reassigned pursuant to General Order 2018-2 from Magistrate Judge John E Martin and Judge Robert L Miller, Jr to Magistrate Judge John E Martin. (kjp)
October 26, 2020 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL CASE sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 11/9/2020. (smb)
October 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (cc: USMS) (lhc)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVING the filing fee; and DIRECTING the U.S. Marshals Service to effect service on the defendant. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/9/2020. (cc: USMS) (lhc)
September 29, 2020 Judge Robert L Miller, Jr and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. NEW CASE, MOTION PENDING. (nal)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Lisa J Davey-Moser. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 USM 285, #3 Proposed Summons). (Schultis, Angelica) Modified on 9/29/2020 to correct docket text. (nal)
September 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Lisa J Davey-Moser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons). (Schultis, Angelica) Modified on 9/29/2020 to correct docket text. (nal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davey-Moser v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA J. DAVEY-MOSER
Represented By: Angelica Catherine Schultis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa J Davey-Moser
Represented By: Angelica Catherine Schultis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?