Renehan et al v. Menard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Denise Renehan and John Renehan
Defendant: Team Menard Inc dba Menards, Menard Inc dbs Menards, Team Menard, Inc. doing business as Menards and Menard, Inc. doing business as Menards
Not Classified By Court: Richard McDevitt
Case Number: 2:2020cv00349
Filed: September 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2020 Filing 18 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 11/19/2020, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Pltfs appeared by atty Kenneth Elwood. Dft appeared by atty Renee Mortimer. The Report filed as DE #17 is ADOPTED as follows: Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 1/15/2021. All discovery to be completed by 12/1/2021. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 7/1/2021. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 9/3/2021. Rule 26(e) supplements due by 10/1/2021. The last date to seek leave of court to join additional parties and to amend the pleadings for Pltfs is 1/30/2021; for Dft is 3/1/2021. Parties anticipate the case should be ready for a 5 day jury trial by January 2022. Richard McDevitt appointed as mediator. Results of the mediation shall be filed with the court no later than 10 days before the final pretrial conference. All other agreements of the parties concerning discovery are adopted. Magistrate Consent forms due by 12/10/2020. All other dates/ddls to be set by presiding judge at a later time. The summary judgment deadline in FRCP 56 shall not apply. (Tape #ATT HOST.) (tc)
November 11, 2020 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Elwood, Kenneth)
November 4, 2020 Filing 16 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/19/2020 09:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Parties are directed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted to join the conference. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 11/4/2020. (tc)
November 2, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses & Jury Demand by Menard, Inc..(Mortimer, Renee)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING #12 MOTION to Dismiss Team Menard, Inc., d/b/a Menards by Plaintiffs Denise Renehan, John Renehan. The claims against defendant Team Menard, Inc. are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The action remains pending against defendant Menard, Inc. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 10/27/2020. (lhc)
October 26, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Team Menard, Inc., d/b/a Menards by Plaintiffs Denise Renehan, John Renehan. (Elwood, Kenneth)
October 26, 2020 Filing 11 STATEMENT of Agreement regarding #7 Order,,, Set Deadlines,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Medical Specials Summary)(Mortimer, Renee)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth B Elwood on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Elwood, Kenneth)
October 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kara S Simon on behalf of All Defendants (Simon, Kara)
October 1, 2020 Filing 8 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Menard, Inc., Team Menard, Inc. ; answer due by November 3, 2020. (Mortimer, Renee)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Defendants shall file a memorandum explaining in detail their "information and belief" that the diversity jurisdiction minimum amount in controversy is exceeded in this case for each plaintiff no later than 11/2/2020. Plaintiffs shall file a memorandum indicating their reasonable estimate of each plaintiff's damages based on the allegations of the complaint no later than 11/2/2020. In lieu of separate filings, the parties may instead file, no later than 11/2/2020, a joint statement of their agreement that the amount in controversy requirement is met, and the basis for that conclusion. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 10/1/2020. (mrm)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 10/1/2020. (tc)
September 30, 2020 **NEW CASE** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (shk)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Team Menard Inc dba Menards. (Mortimer, Renee)
September 29, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Menard Inc dbs Menards. (Mortimer, Renee)
September 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Renee J Mortimer on behalf of Menard Inc dbs Menards, Team Menard Inc dba Menards (Mortimer, Renee)
September 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4356130.) from Lake Superior Court, Cause No. 45D05-2008-CT-000872, filed by Team Menard Inc dba Menards, Menard Inc dbs Menards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mortimer, Renee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Renehan et al v. Menard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Team Menard Inc dba Menards
Represented By: Renee J Mortimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard Inc dbs Menards
Represented By: Renee J Mortimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Team Menard, Inc. doing business as Menards
Represented By: Renee J Mortimer
Represented By: Kara S Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard, Inc. doing business as Menards
Represented By: Renee J Mortimer
Represented By: Kara S Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Renehan
Represented By: Nathaniel C Henson
Represented By: Kenneth B Elwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Renehan
Represented By: Nathaniel C Henson
Represented By: Kenneth B Elwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Richard McDevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?