Crown Point, Indiana City of v. Pinnacle Treatment Centers, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: City of Crown Point and Crown Point, Indiana City of
Defendant: Pinnacle Treatment Centers IN-1 LLC, Pinnacle Treatment Centers, Inc. and CapGrOW Holdings JV Sub V LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00359
Filed: October 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand filed by Crown Point, Indiana City of. (Arceneaux, Adam)
December 4, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE: CapGrow Holdings JV Sub V LLC, Crown Point, Indiana City of, Pinnacle Treatment Centers IN-1 LLC, Pinnacle Treatment Centers, Inc. was directed to return the Consent to or Declination of the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge attached at Docket Entry #10 regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Clerk's Office has not received the form. CapGrow Holdings JV Sub V LLC, Crown Point, Indiana City of, Pinnacle Treatment Centers IN-1 LLC, Pinnacle Treatment Centers, Inc. shall return the form within 10 days of the date of this entry. If, after the expiration of the 10-day extension set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Counsel also advised of 10-day consent deadline by phone (shk)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: The Court, finding good cause shown and noting Defendants do not object, GRANTS #22 Plaintiff City of Crown Point, Indiana's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff the City of Crown Point, Indiana's deadline to file its reply to [DE 13] City of Crown Point, Indiana's Motion to Remand is EXTENDED to 12/4/2020. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 11/25/2020. Text entry order. (tc)
November 24, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 Response to Motion, by Counter Defendant Crown Point, Indiana City of, Plaintiff Crown Point, Indiana City of. (McKeown, Eric)
November 23, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric J McKeown on behalf of Crown Point, Indiana City of (McKeown, Eric)
November 19, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Remand filed by CapGrow Holdings JV Sub V LLC, Pinnacle Treatment Centers IN-1 LLC, Pinnacle Treatment Centers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Crandley, Mark)
November 17, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Seal by Defendant CapGrow Holdings JV Sub V LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Crandley, Mark)
November 16, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER TO DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIMS by Crown Point, Indiana City of . (Arceneaux, Adam)
November 12, 2020 Filing 17 SCHEDULED AS RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE on 11/12/2020, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Pla appeared by attys Adam Arceneaux, Eric McKeown. Dfts appeared by atty Mark Crandley. Without objection, the Court sets this matter over for a period of 90 days. Parties to meet and confer as to potential of initiating discovery. Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/11/2021 09:30 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted to join the conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 12/3/2020. (Tape #ATT HOST.) (tc)
November 9, 2020 Filing 16 ENTERED IN ERROR.
November 5, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE by Crown Point, Indiana City of Report of Parties' Planning Meeting (Arceneaux, Adam)
November 5, 2020 Filing 14 BRIEF in Support of #13 MOTION to Remand filed by Crown Point, Indiana City of. (Arceneaux, Adam)
November 5, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff Crown Point, Indiana City of. (Arceneaux, Adam)
November 3, 2020 Jurisdictional Stmt Deadline terminated. (mlc)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: The Court provisionally SEALS [DE 11] Defendants' Confidential Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement. The Court SETS a deadline of 11/17/2020 for Defendants to file a motion citing relevant case law and standards necessary to maintain this filing under seal. The Court notes that in the absence of such a motion, the seal on [DE 11] Defendants' Confidential Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement will be lifted. Any future sealed filings shall comport with N.D. Ind. L.R. 5-3. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 11/3/2020. Text entry order. (tc)
November 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by CapGrow Holdings JV Sub V LLC, Pinnacle Treatment Centers IN-1 LLC, Pinnacle Treatment Centers, Inc. Regarding Jurisdiction (Crandley, Mark)
October 26, 2020 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2020 10:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted to join the conference. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 10/26/2020. (tc)
October 26, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by CapGrow Holdings JV Sub V LLC, Pinnacle Treatment Centers IN-1 LLC, Pinnacle Treatment Centers, Inc..(Crandley, Mark)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court ORDERS Defendants Pinnacle Treatment Centers, Inc., Pinnacle Treatment Centers IN-I, LLC, and CapGrow Holdings JV Sub V LLC to FILE, on or before 11/2/2020, a supplemental jurisdictional statement that properly alleges the citizenship of CapGrow Holdings JV Sub V LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 10/19/2020. (bas)
October 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Per DE #6 CapGrow Holdings JV SUB V LLC answer due 10/26/2020. (nae)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by CapGrow Holdings JV Sub V LLC (Crandley, Mark)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 10/9/2020. (tc)
October 7, 2020 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. NEW CASE. (jat)
October 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by CapGrOW Holdings JV Sub V LLC, Pinnacle Treatment Centers IN-1 LLC, Pinnacle Treatment Centers, Inc. Civil Cover Sheet (Crandley, Mark)
October 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J Crandley on behalf of CapGrOW Holdings JV Sub V LLC, Pinnacle Treatment Centers IN-1 LLC, Pinnacle Treatment Centers, Inc. (Crandley, Mark)
October 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4363474.) from Lake Superior Court, Cause No. 45C01-2009-PL-000567, filed by CapGrOW Holdings JV Sub V LLC, Pinnacle Treatment Centers IN-1 LLC, Pinnacle Treatment Centers, Inc..(Crandley, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crown Point, Indiana City of v. Pinnacle Treatment Centers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Treatment Centers IN-1 LLC
Represented By: Mark J Crandley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Treatment Centers, Inc.
Represented By: Mark J Crandley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CapGrOW Holdings JV Sub V LLC
Represented By: Mark J Crandley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Crown Point
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crown Point, Indiana City of
Represented By: Adam Arceneaux
Represented By: Eric J McKeown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?