New City Auto Group, Inc v. O'Rourke & Moody LLP et al
Plaintiff: New City Auto Group, Inc
Defendant: Michael Moody, Terry Gaouette, O'Rourke & Moody LLP, Crock & Associates, LLC, Gaouette and Associates, SC and Amy Lokken
Case Number: 2:2020cv00377
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #7 Notice of Transmittal of Bankruptcy Record. Because there isnothing pending in this matter right now, the briefing schedule was inadvertently set. The parties are notified that the briefing schedule set in Docket Entry 7 is HEREBY STRICKEN. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 11/16/20. (mlc)
November 16, 2020 Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (tlr)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kimberly E Blair PHV for Michael Moody and O'Rourke & Moody LLP. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 11/12/2020. (ace)
November 10, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Transmittal of Bankruptcy Record. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-21890. Briefs are due in accordance with Rule 8018 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. Appellant Brief due by 12/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 USBC Docket Sheet with Exhibits)(rmf)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION AND ORDER ADOPTING the amended recommendation by the bankruptcy court #2 , GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Withdraw the Reference #1 and WITHDRAWING the reference of this adversary proceeding. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 11/5/2020. (mrm)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 Application for Attorney Kimberly E. Blair to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of O'Rourke & Moody LLP and Michael N. Moody. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4387927(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
October 20, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Transmittal of Bankruptcy Record. Bankruptcy Court case number 18-21890, Ahler, Adv 20-2024. The $181.00 filing fee for the Motion to Withdraw Reference was not paid. (Attachment: #1 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet). (nal)
October 20, 2020 Filing 2 AMENDED RECOMMENDATION ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW THE REFERENCE re #1 Defendants' Motion to Withdraw the Reference. Signed by Bankruptcy Judge James R Ahler on 10/19/20. (nal)
September 18, 2020 Filing 1 Defendants' MOTION to Withdraw the Reference by Defendants Michael Moody and O'Rourke & Moody LLP. (nal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New City Auto Group, Inc v. O'Rourke & Moody LLP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New City Auto Group, Inc
Represented By: R Brian Woodward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Moody
Represented By: Michael A Kreppein
Represented By: Kimberly E Blair PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Gaouette
Represented By: Michael I Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O'Rourke & Moody LLP
Represented By: Michael A Kreppein
Represented By: Kimberly E Blair PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crock & Associates, LLC
Represented By: Michael I Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gaouette and Associates, SC
Represented By: Michael I Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Lokken
Represented By: Michael I Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?