Citi Condo Association, Inc. v. Ohio Security Insurance Company
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance Company and Citi Condo Association, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00404
Filed: November 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS: Rule 26(a)(1) initial exchanges must be completed by 4/16/ 2021; Plaintiff's deadline to seek leave to amend the pleadings is 7/1/2021; Defendant's deadline to seek leave to amend the pleadings is 8/1/2021; The deadline to complete all fact discovery and expert discovery is 12/1/2021; Plaintiff's expert witness disclosures and reports are to be provided to Defendant by 8/1/2021; Defendant's expert witness disclosures and reports are to be provided to Plaintiff by 9/1/2021; Rule 26(e) supplements are due by 10/1/2021. The parties are ordered to conduct mediation and the deadline for the parties to select a mediator 3/1/2021, with mediation to be completed and a report filed by 12/1/2021. The Court VACATES the Preliminary Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for January 14, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/29/2020. (lhc)
December 22, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT by Citi Condo Association, Inc. . (Hargrove, Thomas)
December 17, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand by Ohio Security Insurance Company.(Wooton, Lewis)
December 7, 2020 Filing 9 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file discovery filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company; 12/07/2020 to be filed by 01/04/2021. (Wooton, Lewis)
November 24, 2020 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2021 12:30 PM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Parties' proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 1/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/24/2020. (smb)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/24/2020. (smb)
November 19, 2020 Filing 5 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company ; answer due by 12/17/2020. (Wooton, Lewis)
November 12, 2020 **NEW CASE** Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (shk)
November 11, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ohio Security Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Ohio Casualty Corporation, Corporate Parent The Ohio Casualty Insurance Corporation for Ohio Security Insurance Company.. (Wooton, Lewis)
November 11, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lewis S Wooton on behalf of Ohio Security Insurance Company (Wooton, Lewis)
November 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4396088.) from Porter Superior Court, Cause No. 64D05-2010-MI-8452, filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wooton, Lewis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citi Condo Association, Inc. v. Ohio Security Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Lewis S Wooton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citi Condo Association, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Hargrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?