Chatman v. Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company et al
Plaintiff: James Chatman
Defendant: Renzenberger, Inc., Alysha Guy, Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company and Gilberto Ibarra
Case Number: 2:2020cv00409
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sean C Gingrich PHV for Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company and Renzenberger, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/8/2021. (ace)
January 7, 2021 Filing 20 Application for Attorney Sean C. Gingrich to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Indiana Harbor Belt and Renzenberger. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4444343(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
January 7, 2021 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Alysha Guy on 12/11/2020, filed by James Chatman. (Barker, Bradley)
January 7, 2021 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Gilberto Ibarra on 12/10/2020, filed by James Chatman. (Barker, Bradley)
January 7, 2021 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Renzenberger, Inc. on 11/18/2020, filed by James Chatman. (Barker, Bradley)
January 7, 2021 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad on 11/18/2020, filed by James Chatman. (Barker, Bradley)
January 6, 2021 Filing 15 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/18/2021 11:30 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due 2/12/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/6/2021. (smb)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/6/2021. (smb)
December 29, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #8 Crossclaim by Alysha Guy, Gilberto Ibarra.(Lawrence, Kyle)
December 29, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Alysha Guy, Gilberto Ibarra.(Lawrence, Kyle)
December 29, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle B Lawrence on behalf of Alysha Guy (Lawrence, Kyle)
December 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle B Lawrence on behalf of Gilberto Ibarra (Lawrence, Kyle)
December 9, 2020 Filing 8 First CROSSCLAIM against Alysha Guy, Gilberto Ibarra, filed by Renzenberger, Inc., Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company.(Bilse, Scott)
December 9, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Renzenberger, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hallcon Corporation for Renzenberger, Inc... (Bilse, Scott)
December 9, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company identifying Corporate Parent Consolidated Rail Corporation, Corporate Parent Norfolk Southern Corporation, Corporate Parent Canadian Pacific Railway, Corporate Parent CSX Transportation Inc for Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company.. (Bilse, Scott)
December 9, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Renzenberger, Inc..(Bilse, Scott)
December 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott R Bilse on behalf of Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company, Renzenberger, Inc. (Bilse, Scott)
December 9, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company.(Bilse, Scott)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Alysha Guy, Gilberto Ibarra, Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company, Renzenberger, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (Attachments: #1 Renzenberger Inc, #2 Ibarra, #3 Guy)(nae)
November 17, 2020 **NEW CASE** Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (nae)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4400025.), filed by James Chatman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons to Indiana Harbor, #3 Proposed Summons Summons to Renzenberger, #4 Proposed Summons Summons to Ibarra, #5 Proposed Summons Summons to Guy)(Barker, Bradley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chatman v. Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renzenberger, Inc.
Represented By: Sean C Gingrich PHV
Represented By: Scott R Bilse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alysha Guy
Represented By: Kyle B Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company
Represented By: Sean C Gingrich PHV
Represented By: Scott R Bilse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilberto Ibarra
Represented By: Kyle B Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Chatman
Represented By: Bradley N Barker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?