Edsal Manufacturing Company, LLC et al v. Bell et al
Plaintiff: Edsal Manufaturing Company, LLC, Sandusky Buddy LLC, Edsal Sandusky TN, LLC and Edsal Manufacturing Company, LLC
Defendant: B&B Goods, Inc. and Brandon Bell
Case Number: 2:2021cv00104
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1836
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Capp, Mitchell)
May 17, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER, Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand to #1 Complaint, by B&B Goods, Inc., Brandon Bell.(Michmerhuizen, Michael) Modified docket text on 5/18/2021 (kjp).
May 10, 2021 Filing 12 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2021 09:00 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1274 and enter access code 4620540# when prompted to join the conference. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 5/10/2021. (tc)
April 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony M Stites on behalf of B&B Goods, Inc., Brandon Bell (Stites, Anthony)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 4/12/2021. (tc)
April 9, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Extension Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1(b) re #1 Complaint, by Defendants B&B Goods, Inc., Brandon Bell. (Michmerhuizen, Michael) Modified on 4/12/2021 to reflect document is not a motion (tc).
April 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael H Michmerhuizen on behalf of B&B Goods, Inc., Brandon Bell (Michmerhuizen, Michael)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mark W Steiner PHV for Edsal Manufacturing Company, LLC, Edsal Sandusky TN, LLC, and Sandusky Buddy LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. (ace)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Timothy J Lowe PHV for Edsal Manufacturing Company, LLC, Edsal Sandusky TN, LLC, and Sandusky Buddy LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 4/8/2021. (ace)
April 7, 2021 Filing 4 Application for Attorney Mark W. Steiner to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Edsal Manufacturing Company, LLC, Edsal Sandusky TN, LLC, and Sandusky Buddy LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4535319(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
April 7, 2021 Filing 3 Application for Attorney Timothy J Lowe to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Edsal Manufacturing Company, LLC, Edsal Sandusky TN, LLC and Sandusky Buddy LLC. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4535285(Lowe PHV, Timothy)
March 29, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to B&B Goods, Inc., Brandon Bell. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(mrm)
March 26, 2021 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. **NEW CASE** (mrm)
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against B&B Goods, Inc., Brandon Bell( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4523880.), filed by Edsal Manufacturing Company, LLC, Sandusky Buddy LLC, Edsal Sandusky TN, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A., #2 Exhibit B., #3 Exhibit C., #4 Exhibit D., #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons)(Capp, Mitchell) Modified on 3/30/2021 to correct typo (mrm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edsal Manufacturing Company, LLC et al v. Bell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B&B Goods, Inc.
Represented By: Michael H Michmerhuizen
Represented By: Anthony M Stites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Bell
Represented By: Michael H Michmerhuizen
Represented By: Anthony M Stites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edsal Manufaturing Company, LLC
Represented By: Mitchell A Capp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandusky Buddy LLC
Represented By: Mitchell A Capp
Represented By: Mark W Steiner PHV
Represented By: Timothy J Lowe PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edsal Sandusky TN, LLC
Represented By: Mitchell A Capp
Represented By: Mark W Steiner PHV
Represented By: Timothy J Lowe PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edsal Manufacturing Company, LLC
Represented By: Mitchell A Capp
Represented By: Mark W Steiner PHV
Represented By: Timothy J Lowe PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?