Pratt Logistics, LLC v. United Transport Inc et al
Plaintiff: Pratt Logistics, LLC
Defendant: C & E Transport, Inc., Charlotte F. Mendez, Ernest A. Fields and United Transport Inc
Case Number: 2:2021cv00148
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Filing 26 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email Correspondence Among Counsel)(Wendt, T)
June 25, 2021 Filing 25 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Twohy, John)
June 24, 2021 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support of #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by United Transport Inc. (Twohy, John)
June 24, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant United Transport Inc. (Twohy, John)
June 23, 2021 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support of #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by C & E Transport, Inc.. (Halstead, John)
June 23, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant C & E Transport, Inc.. (Halstead, John)
June 23, 2021 Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, Jury Demand by C & E Transport, Inc., Ernest A. Fields, Charlotte F. Mendez.(Halstead, John)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER: The Court STRIKES #17 Answer and Motion to Dismiss. Pursuant to N.D. Ind. L.R. 7-1(a), motions must be filed separately. Defendants to file an answer and/or other responsive pleading that complies with N.D. Ind. L.R. 7-1(a) by 6/25/2021. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 6/22/2021. Text entry only. (tc)
June 22, 2021 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support of #7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Initial Responsive Pleading Motion to Dismiss filed by C & E Transport, Inc.. (Halstead, John)
June 22, 2021 Filing 17 STRICKEN RE 19 MINUTE ORDER: ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, Jury Demand and Motion to Dismiss by C & E Transport, Inc., Ernest A. Fields, Charlotte F. Mendez.(Halstead, John) Modified on 6/22/2021 (tc).
June 17, 2021 Filing 16 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/2/2021 10:30 AM in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1274 and enter access code 4620540# when prompted to join the conference. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 6/17/2021. (tc)
June 15, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by C & E Transport, Inc.. (Halstead, John)
May 28, 2021 Reset Answer Deadlines: Answer for Charlotte F. Mendez, Ernest A. Fields, and C & E Transport, Inc. due 6/22/2021 pursuant to DE #7 . Answer for United Transport Inc due 6/24/2021 pursuant to DE #12 . (kms)
May 27, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle G Grothoff on behalf of United Transport Inc (Grothoff, Kyle)
May 27, 2021 Filing 12 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by United Transport Inc ; answer due by June 24, 2021. (Twohy, John)
May 27, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Transport Inc. (Twohy, John)
May 27, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John P Twohy on behalf of United Transport Inc (Twohy, John)
May 25, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pratt Logistics, LLC. All Defendants. (Wendt, T)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 5/17/2021. (tc)
May 14, 2021 Filing 7 Local Rule 6.1 Notice of Initial Enlargement of Time to Respond to Complaint or Initial Responsive Pleading by Defendants C & E Transport, Inc., Ernest A. Fields, Charlotte F. Mendez. (Halstead, John) Modified on 5/17/2021 to reflect document is not a motion (tc).
May 14, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John H Halstead on behalf of C & E Transport, Inc., Ernest A. Fields, Charlotte F. Mendez (Halstead, John)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to C & E Transport, Inc., Ernest A. Fields, Charlotte F. Mendez, United Transport Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmc)
April 29, 2021 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. (NEW CASE) (rmc)
April 28, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Cory L Turner on behalf of Pratt Logistics, LLC (Turner, Cory)
April 28, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pratt Logistics, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Pratt Industries, Inc. for Pratt Logistics, LLC.. (Wendt, T)
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by T Joseph Wendt on behalf of Pratt Logistics, LLC (Wendt, T)
April 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4557364.), filed by Pratt Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons United Transport, #2 Proposed Summons Mendez, #3 Proposed Summons Fields, #4 Proposed Summons C&E Transport, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wendt, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pratt Logistics, LLC v. United Transport Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & E Transport, Inc.
Represented By: John H Halstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlotte F. Mendez
Represented By: John H Halstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest A. Fields
Represented By: John H Halstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Transport Inc
Represented By: John P Twohy
Represented By: Kyle G Grothoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pratt Logistics, LLC
Represented By: T Joseph Wendt
Represented By: Cory L Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?