Monster Energy Corporation v. R&R Medical d/b/a Bear Komplex
Plaintiff: Monster Energy Corporation
Defendant: R&R Medical d/b/a Bear Komplex and R&R Medical, LLC an Indiana limited liability company doing business as Bear Komplex
Case Number: 2:2021cv00179
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #15 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lynda J Zadra-Symes PHV for Monster Energy Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 7/19/2021. (ace)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #16 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Steven J Nataupsky PHV for Monster Energy Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 7/19/2021. (ace)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: Finding good cause and noting the agreement of the parties, the Court GRANTS #17 Unopposed Motion to Extend Filing Deadlines. The Court EXTENDS Defendant's deadline to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to 8/16/2021, and EXTENDS the deadline for the parties' Proposed Discovery Plan to 9/16/2021. The Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference is RESET to 9/23/2021 at 09:30 AM (Central time) before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted to join the conference. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 7/19/2021. Text entry order. (tc)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #13 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Sean M Murray PHV for Monster Energy Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 7/15/2021. (ace)
July 15, 2021 Filing 17 Consent MOTION to Extend Filing Deadlines and to Vacate and Reschedule Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Defendant R&R Medical, LLC. (Perry, Louis)
July 15, 2021 Filing 16 Application for Attorney Steven Nataupsky to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Monster Energy Company. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4629198(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
July 15, 2021 Filing 15 Application for Attorney Lynda Zadra-Symes to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Monster Energy Company. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4629171(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #10 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Aryeh N Feinstein PHV for Monster Energy Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 7/15/2021. (ace)
July 14, 2021 Filing 13 Application for Attorney Sean Murray to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Monster Energy Company. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4627955(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
July 13, 2021 Filing 12 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/29/2021 09:15 AM (Central time) in US District Court - Hammond before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted to join the conference. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 7/13/2021. (tc)
June 22, 2021 Filing 10 Application for Attorney Aryeh Feinstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Monster Energy Company. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4608373 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/15/2021: #2 VA Certificate) (ace).
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 6/21/2021. (tc)
June 21, 2021 Reset Answer Deadline: Answer for R&R Medical d/b/a Bear Komplex is due 7/19/2021. (kms)
June 18, 2021 Filing 8 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by R&R Medical, LLC ; answer due by 7/19/2021. (Perry, Louis)
June 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis T Perry on behalf of R&R Medical, LLC (Perry, Louis)
May 28, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Monster Energy Corporation of Filing Complaint to USPTO (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint w/Exhibits 1-14)(Riley, James)
May 27, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to R&R Medical, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (shk)
May 27, 2021 **NEW CASE** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (shk)
May 26, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monster Energy Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Monster Beverage Corporation, Other Affiliate Coca Cola Company for Monster Energy Corporation.. (Riley, James)
May 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jaclyn M Flint on behalf of Monster Energy Corporation (Flint, Jaclyn)
May 26, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James W Riley, Jr on behalf of Monster Energy Corporation (Riley, James)
May 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against R&R Medical d/b/a Bear Komplex( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4584878.), filed by Monster Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. 2,903,214, #2 Exhibit 2. 4,011,301, #3 Exhibit 3. 4,721,432, #4 Exhibit 4. 3,434,821, #5 Exhibit 5. 4,625,118, #6 Exhibit 6. 5,580,962, #7 Exhibit 7. 5,022,676, #8 Exhibit 8. 3,908,601, #9 Exhibit 9. 3,914,828, #10 Exhibit 10. 5,664,586, #11 Exhibit 11. 4,865,702, #12 Exhibit 12. 3,963,668, #13 Exhibit 13. 3,963,669, #14 Exhibit 14. 4,865,702, #15 Civil Cover Sheet, #16 Proposed Summons)(Riley, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monster Energy Corporation v. R&R Medical d/b/a Bear Komplex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&R Medical d/b/a Bear Komplex
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R&R Medical, LLC an Indiana limited liability company doing business as Bear Komplex
Represented By: Louis T Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monster Energy Corporation
Represented By: James W Riley, Jr
Represented By: Jaclyn M Flint
Represented By: Aryeh N Feinstein PHV
Represented By: Lynda J Zadra-Symes PHV
Represented By: Sean M Murray PHV
Represented By: Steven J Nataupsky PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?