Jeffrey T Meister,DDS LLC et al v. Miller
Plaintiff: JEFFREY T. MEISTER, DDS, LLC, DISTINCTIVE DENTISTRY, MUNSTER PEDIATRIC DENTAL SPECIALISTS, LLC, MUNSTER PEDIATRIC DENTAL, LLC, JEFFREY T. MEISTER & ASSOCIATES LLC, WHITE OAK CENTER FOR DENTURES AND DENTAL IMPLANTS LLC, Jeffrey T Meister DDS LLC a Limited Liability Company in the State of Indiana doing business as Munster Distinctive Dentistry LLC, Munster Pediatric Dental Specialists LLC, Munster Pediatric Dental LLC and Jeffrey T Meister & Associates LLC
Defendant: DISTINCTIVE DENTISTRY LLC and HEATHER MILLER
Case Number: 2:2021cv00230
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Heather Miller. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 9/20/2021. (lhc)
September 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Plaintiffs against All Defendants, filed by Jeffrey T Meister DDS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jaskowiak, F)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 9/9/2021, before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Pla appeared by atty Lauren Kroeger. Dft appeared by atty B.J. Brinkerhoff. The Report filed as DE #13 is ADOPTED as follows: Fact discovery to be completed by 6/3/2022. Expert discovery to be completed by 8/5/2022. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 2/4/2022. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 4/8/2022. Rule 26(e) supplements due by 5/6/2022. The last date to seek leave of court to join additional parties and to amend the pleadings for Pltf is 11/19/2021; for Dft is 12/17/2021. Parties anticipate the case should be ready for a 3 day jury trial by September 2022. All other agreements of the parties concerning discovery are adopted. Magistrate Consent forms due by 9/30/2021. All other dates/ddls to be set by presiding judge at a later time. (Tape #ATT HOST (4).) (tc)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren K Kroeger on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Kroeger, Lauren)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Jaskowiak, F)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 BRIEF in Support of #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Heather Miller. (Brinkerhoff, William)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Heather Miller. (Brinkerhoff, William)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/9/2021 11:00 AM (Central time) before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted to join the conference. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 8/20/2021. (tc)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 7/30/2021. (tc)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines: Answer due 8/27/2021 per #5 (jld)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (NEW CASE) (jld)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AMENDED DOCUMENT by HEATHER MILLER. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Docket and State Court Records, #2 Exhibit B - Operative Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brinkerhoff, William)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by HEATHER MILLER ; answer due by August 27, 2021. (Brinkerhoff, William)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by MacKenzie Adair Johnson on behalf of HEATHER MILLER (Johnson, MacKenzie)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly D Jeselskis on behalf of HEATHER MILLER (Jeselskis, Kimberly)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William J Brinkerhoff on behalf of HEATHER MILLER (Brinkerhoff, William)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4637399.) from Lake County Superior Court 11, Cause No. 45D11-2106-PL-000473, filed by HEATHER MILLER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Docket and State Court Records, #2 Exhibit B - Operative Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brinkerhoff, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jeffrey T Meister,DDS LLC et al v. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY T. MEISTER, DDS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DISTINCTIVE DENTISTRY
Represented By: F Joseph Jaskowiak
Represented By: Lauren K Kroeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MUNSTER PEDIATRIC DENTAL SPECIALISTS, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MUNSTER PEDIATRIC DENTAL, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFFREY T. MEISTER & ASSOCIATES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WHITE OAK CENTER FOR DENTURES AND DENTAL IMPLANTS LLC
Represented By: F Joseph Jaskowiak
Represented By: Lauren K Kroeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey T Meister DDS LLC a Limited Liability Company in the State of Indiana doing business as Munster Distinctive Dentistry LLC
Represented By: F Joseph Jaskowiak
Represented By: Lauren K Kroeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Munster Pediatric Dental Specialists LLC
Represented By: F Joseph Jaskowiak
Represented By: Lauren K Kroeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Munster Pediatric Dental LLC
Represented By: F Joseph Jaskowiak
Represented By: Lauren K Kroeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey T Meister & Associates LLC
Represented By: F Joseph Jaskowiak
Represented By: Lauren K Kroeger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DISTINCTIVE DENTISTRY LLC
Represented By: F Joseph Jaskowiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HEATHER MILLER
Represented By: Kimberly D Jeselskis
Represented By: MacKenzie Adair Johnson
Represented By: William J Brinkerhoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?