Hahn v. Aziyo Biologics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: David Hahn
Defendant: Aziyo Biologics, Inc., Medtronic Inc, Medtronic PLC and Medtronic, USA, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00265
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DISMISSAL ORDER: Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #14 is GRANTED. This action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Each party to bear its own fees and costs. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 10/1/2021. (shk)
September 30, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Hahn (Leonas, Theodore)
September 24, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aziyo Biologics, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Aziyo Biologics, Inc. for Aziyo Biologics, Inc... (Slusher, Jordan)
September 24, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Medtronic, Inc., answer due 10/21/2021 per #12 . (lhc)
September 24, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: MDT USA, answer due 10/26/2021 per #12 . (lhc)
September 23, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE by Medtronic Inc, Medtronic, USA, Inc. of Automatic Initial Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Jorczak, Robert)
September 23, 2021 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Medtronic Inc, Medtronic, USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Medtronic PLC for Medtronic Inc, Medtronic, USA, Inc... (Jorczak, Robert)
September 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert A Jorczak on behalf of Medtronic Inc, Medtronic, USA, Inc. (Jorczak, Robert)
September 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly C Metzger on behalf of Medtronic Inc, Medtronic, USA, Inc. (Metzger, Kimberly)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 9/22/2021. (smb)
September 2, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Per DE #6 Aziyo Biologics, Inc answer due 10/12/2021. (nae)
September 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan M Slusher on behalf of Aziyo Biologics, Inc. (Slusher, Jordan)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Aziyo Biologics, Inc. of Automatic Initial Extension (Schiferl, Kevin)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C Schiferl on behalf of Aziyo Biologics, Inc. (Schiferl, Kevin)
August 27, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Aziyo Biologics, Inc., Medtronic Inc, Medtronic PLC, Medtronic, USA, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mrm)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 Proposed Summons filed by David Hahn. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Leonas, Theodore)
August 26, 2021 Filing 2 *No summons submitted by attorney with Complaint.* (bas)
August 25, 2021 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (NEW CASE) (bas)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aziyo Biologics, Inc, Medtronic Inc, Medtronic PLC, and Medtronic, USA, Inc ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4667693.), filed by David Hahn.(Leonas, Theodore) Modified on 8/26/2021 (bas).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hahn v. Aziyo Biologics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Hahn
Represented By: Theodore S Leonas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aziyo Biologics, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan M Slusher
Represented By: Kevin C Schiferl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic Inc
Represented By: Kimberly C Metzger
Represented By: Robert A Jorczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic, USA, Inc.
Represented By: Kimberly C Metzger
Represented By: Robert A Jorczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?