Lake Michigan Yachting Association et al v. Cleveland-Cliffs Inc., formerly known as Arcelormittal USA LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lake Michigan Yachting Association, Portage Port Authority, KLM Dunes, Inc., Portage Public Marina, Marquette Yacht Club, Marina Shores at Dunes Harbor, Nicholas Latham, Kayla Latham, Patricia Petroff and Other Individual Plaintiffs to be Later Named
Defendant: Cleveland-Cliffs Inc., formerly known as Arcelormittal USA LLC, Cleveland-Cliffs Burns Harbor, LLC, formerly known as Arcelormittal Burns Harbor, Arcelormittal USA LLC, Arcelormittal Burns Harbor, Cleveland-Cliffs Inc., Cleveland-Cliffs Burns Harbor LLC and Arcelormittal Burns Harbor LLC
Case Number: 2:2021cv00291
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 19 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. Magistrate Consent forms due by 11/26/2021. (smb)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/4/2021. (smb)
October 22, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by Cleveland-Cliffs Burns Harbor LLC, Cleveland-Cliffs Inc. Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kelln, H)
October 22, 2021 Filing 16 BRIEF in Support of #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) filed by Cleveland-Cliffs Burns Harbor LLC, Cleveland-Cliffs Inc.. (Kelln, H)
October 22, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) by Defendants Cleveland-Cliffs Burns Harbor LLC, Cleveland-Cliffs Inc.. (Kelln, H)
October 22, 2021 Filing 14 BRIEF in Support of #13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) filed by Cleveland-Cliffs Burns Harbor LLC, Cleveland-Cliffs Inc.. (Kelln, H)
October 22, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint Pursuant to Rules 12(B)(1) and 12(B)(6) by Defendants Cleveland-Cliffs Burns Harbor LLC, Cleveland-Cliffs Inc.. (Kelln, H)
October 22, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Kelver Hall on behalf of Cleveland-Cliffs Inc. (Hall, Angela)
October 22, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by H Max Kelln on behalf of Cleveland-Cliffs Inc. (Kelln, H)
October 22, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew D Dettmer on behalf of Cleveland-Cliffs Inc. (Dettmer, Andrew)
September 23, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Per DE #8 Cleveland-Cliffs Burns Harbor LLC answer due 10/22/2021 (nae)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 9/22/2021. (smb)
September 22, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE by Cleveland-Cliffs Burns Harbor LLC Initial Extension of Time to Answer Complaint (Kelln, H)
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew D Dettmer on behalf of Cleveland-Cliffs Burns Harbor, LLC, formerly known as Arcelormittal Burns Harbor (Dettmer, Andrew)
September 20, 2021 **NEW CASE** Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (jdb)
September 20, 2021 Case Reassigned pursuant to General Order In Re: Assignment of Civil Cases. Judge Philip P Simon added. (tlr)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Kelver Hall on behalf of Cleveland-Cliffs Burns Harbor, LLC, formerly known as Arcelormittal Burns Harbor (Hall, Angela)
September 17, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cleveland-Cliffs Burns Harbor, LLC, formerly known as Arcelormittal Burns Harbor identifying Corporate Parent Cleveland-Cliffs Steel LLC for Cleveland-Cliffs Burns Harbor, LLC, formerly known as Arcelormittal Burns Harbor.. (Kelln, H)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by H Max Kelln on behalf of Cleveland-Cliffs Burns Harbor, LLC, formerly known as Arcelormittal Burns Harbor (Kelln, H)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4690307.) from Porter Superior Court, Cause No. 64D05-2108-CT-007295, filed by Cleveland-Cliffs Burns Harbor, LLC, formerly known as Arcelormittal Burns Harbor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Intent to Sue, #3 Exhibit C - Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Corporate Name Change Documents and Proof of Citizenship, #5 Exhibit E - Docket Sheet and Documents Filed, #6 Exhibit F - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Kelln, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lake Michigan Yachting Association et al v. Cleveland-Cliffs Inc., formerly known as Arcelormittal USA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland-Cliffs Inc., formerly known as Arcelormittal USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland-Cliffs Burns Harbor, LLC, formerly known as Arcelormittal Burns Harbor
Represented By: Angela Kelver Hall
Represented By: H Max Kelln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arcelormittal USA LLC
Represented By: Andrew D Dettmer
Represented By: Angela Kelver Hall
Represented By: H Max Kelln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arcelormittal Burns Harbor
Represented By: Angela Kelver Hall
Represented By: H Max Kelln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland-Cliffs Inc.
Represented By: Andrew D Dettmer
Represented By: Angela Kelver Hall
Represented By: H Max Kelln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleveland-Cliffs Burns Harbor LLC
Represented By: Andrew D Dettmer
Represented By: Angela Kelver Hall
Represented By: H Max Kelln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arcelormittal Burns Harbor LLC
Represented By: Andrew D Dettmer
Represented By: Angela Kelver Hall
Represented By: H Max Kelln
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lake Michigan Yachting Association
Represented By: Matthew B Dogan
Represented By: Thomas M Dogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Portage Port Authority
Represented By: Matthew B Dogan
Represented By: Thomas M Dogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KLM Dunes, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew B Dogan
Represented By: Thomas M Dogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Portage Public Marina
Represented By: Matthew B Dogan
Represented By: Thomas M Dogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marquette Yacht Club
Represented By: Matthew B Dogan
Represented By: Thomas M Dogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marina Shores at Dunes Harbor
Represented By: Matthew B Dogan
Represented By: Thomas M Dogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Latham
Represented By: Matthew B Dogan
Represented By: Thomas M Dogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Latham
Represented By: Matthew B Dogan
Represented By: Thomas M Dogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Petroff
Represented By: Matthew B Dogan
Represented By: Thomas M Dogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Other Individual Plaintiffs to be Later Named
Represented By: Matthew B Dogan
Represented By: Thomas M Dogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?