Bowes-Northern v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA et al
Plaintiff: Shedrick Bowes-Northern
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA, Jamie Dimon and Crystal Richmond
Case Number: 2:2021cv00315
Filed: October 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joseph S Van Bokkelen
Referring Judge: John E Martin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2021 Filing 10 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-02574. Original file and docket sheet received.
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Indiana. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Indiana, on October 12, 2021. (DWH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/14/2021.]
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 CLOSED TRANSFER Northern District of Indiana - Pro se Plaintiff Shedrick Bowes-Northern filed a Complaint on October 4, 2021 (Dkt. No. 1). While the caption of Plaintiff's Complaint notes the "United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana," his Complaint explains that he is located in Valparaiso, Indiana, and he is suing based on events that occurred in Michigan City, Indiana, both of which are in the Northern District of Indiana. It appears that one of the named defendants is located in Michigan City, Indiana, in the Northern District of Indiana, and other defendants are located in New York. It is apparent that this action was incorrectly filed in the United States District Court for the Southern District of Indiana and should have been filed in the Northern District of Indiana. The Clerk is directed to transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana, Hammond Division. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 10/12/2021. Copy to Plaintiff via US Mail. (DWH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/14/2021.]
October 6, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Reassignment of Case to Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore. Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia is no longer assigned to this case. Please include the new case number, 1:21-cv-02574-TWP-MJD, on all future filings in this matter. (LMK) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/14/2021.]
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Clerk is directed to randomly reassign case and notify parties of newly assigned Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mario Garcia on 10/6/2021. (NAD) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/14/2021.]
October 5, 2021 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/14/2021.]
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Have Filings and Everything Sent Via Email filed by Plaintiff, SHEDRICK BOWES-NORTHERN. (DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/14/2021.]
October 4, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Assistance with Recruiting Counsel filed by Plaintiff, SHEDRICK BOWES-NORTHERN. (DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/14/2021.]
October 4, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff, SHEDRICK BOWES-NORTHERN. (DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/14/2021.]
October 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JAMIE DIMON, JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., and CRYSTAL RICHMOND, filed by SHEDRICK BOWES-NORTHERN. (No fee paid with this filing) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits including JPMorganChase Modern Slavery Group Statement, U.S. Attorney's Ofice press release, Watchdogs articles, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summonses and USM-285 forms, #4 Proposed Subpoena to JPMorganChase Bank)(DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 10/14/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bowes-Northern v. JPMorgan Chase Bank NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shedrick Bowes-Northern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Dimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Richmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?