Biggs v. Riel et al
Plaintiff: David Biggs
Defendant: Richard Riel and American National Property and Casualty Co.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00324
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Danny Merril Newman, Jr on behalf of American National Property and Casualty Co. (Newman, Danny)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/13/2022 11:00 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Parties' proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 1/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/16/2021. (smb)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/16/2021. (smb)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American National Property and Casualty Co. identifying Corporate Parent American National Group, Inc. for American National Property and Casualty Co... (Wells, Trevor)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by American National Property and Casualty Co..(Wells, Trevor)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor W Wells on behalf of American National Property and Casualty Co. (Wells, Trevor)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Richard Riel.(DeCastro, John)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Court STRIKES from the docket the Answer to Complaint #11 with leave to re-file a document that complies with the Local Rules on or before 11/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/12/2021. (lhc)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 *STRICKEN pursuant to #12 * ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Richard Riel.(DeCastro, John) Modified on 11/12/2021 (lhc).
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. Richard Riel answer due 12/27/2021. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/9/2021. No pdf attached.(cp)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Richard Riel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(DeCastro, John)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John M DeCastro on behalf of Richard Riel (DeCastro, John)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due for deft Riel 10/16/21, Answer due for deft American National Property and Casualty Co 11/18/21 (jld) Modified on 11/3/2021 to correct answer due dates (jld).
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Defendants, Biggs and American National Property and Casualty Co. on 10/26/2021 and 10/28/2021, filed by David Biggs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Shrader, Natalie)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455(a), the Undersigned recuses herself from this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 137 and Local Rule 40-1(f)(2)(A), the Clerk of this Court is hereby directed to randomly reassign this matter to another Article III Judge for all further proceedings. Case reassigned to Judge Philip P Simon for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 11/1/2021. (lhc)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT Supplemental Jurisdicational Statement filed by David Biggs. (Shrader, Natalie)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to FILE, on or before 11/4/2021, a supplemental jurisdictional statement clarifying the citizenship of the parties under 28 U.S.C. 1332(c)(2) as outlined. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/21/2021. (lhc) Modified on 10/22/2021 to correct text (lhc).
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to American National Property and Casualty Co., Richard Riel. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jdb)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order **NEW CASE** Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (jdb)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie V Shrader on behalf of David Biggs (Shrader, Natalie)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4720124.), filed by David Biggs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Shrader, Natalie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Biggs v. Riel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Biggs
Represented By: Natalie V Shrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Riel
Represented By: John M DeCastro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National Property and Casualty Co.
Represented By: Danny Merril Newman, Jr
Represented By: Trevor W Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?