Hitterman v. List Industries, Inc.
Petitioner: Regional Director Paul Hitterman and Paul Hitterman
Respondent: List Industries, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2021cv00395
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2022 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion to Try on Administrative Record and Supporting Brief Petitioner's Reply to DE 27, Respondent's Response, Opposing Motion to Try on the Administrative Record, DE 3 filed by Paul Hitterman. (Hill, Christina)
February 11, 2022 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Petitioner's Reply to DE 26, which was Respondent's Response to DE1, Petition for Injunction filed by Paul Hitterman. (Hill, Christina)
January 28, 2022 Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion to Try on Administrative Record and Supporting Brief filed by List Industries, Inc.. (Lufkin PHV, Michael)
January 28, 2022 Filing 26 BRIEF in Opposition to #1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by List Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of C. Rodriguez))(Lufkin PHV, Michael)
January 20, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Preller on behalf of List Industries, Inc. (Preller, Alexander)
January 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. List's Response deadline is extended to 1/28/22. Hitterman's Reply deadline is extended to 2/11/22. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 1/19/22. (nal)
January 18, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily O'Neill on behalf of Paul Hitterman (O'Neill, Emily)
January 18, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Unopposed by Respondent List Industries, Inc.. (Holshouser PHV, Eric)
January 11, 2022 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Petition for Temporary Injunction Under Section 10(j) of the National Labor Relations Act, as amended by List Industries, Inc..(Holshouser PHV, Eric)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #15 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Eric J Holshouser PHV for List Industries, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/3/2022. (ace)
January 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael J Lufkin PHV for List Industries, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/3/2022. (ace)
December 29, 2021 Filing 18 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 12/29/2021 before Judge Philip P Simon. Pla appeared by Attorney Christina Hill. Respondent present by Attorneys Eric Holshouser, Alex Preller and Michael Lufkin. Case discussed, process explained by the plf. Court hears from the defense, requesting that the response date be after January 18 - granted. Court sets deadlines, which will also be provided in a written order (Response: 1/21/2022 and Reply: 2/4/2022). The Court will determine if a hearing and/or oral argument is required after the filing of the documents. (Court Reporter Stacy Drohosky.) (nac)
December 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: Respondent List Industries, Inc.'s request is GRANTED. Respondent's Response deadline is extended to 1/21/2022. Petitioner Paul Hitterman's Reply deadline is extended to 2/4/2022. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 12/29/2021. (shk)
December 29, 2021 Filing 16 Application for Attorney Michael J. Lufkin to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of List Industries, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-4789800 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Lufkin, Michael)
December 29, 2021 Filing 15 Application for Attorney Eric J Holshouser to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of List Industries, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-4789797 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Holshouser, Eric)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #11 Motion to Continue Telephonic Conference. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 12/28/21. (nal)
December 27, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Paul Hitterman re #12 Response to Motion (Hill, Christina)
December 27, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Continue Telephonic Conference filed by Paul Hitterman. (Hill, Christina)
December 24, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Continue Telephonic Conference by Respondent List Industries, Inc.. (Paul, Brian)
December 24, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian J Paul on behalf of List Industries, Inc. (Paul, Brian)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #3 Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion to Try on Administrative Record and Supporting Brief , #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Memo of Points & Authorities in Support of Petition for Injunctive Relief : TELEPHONIC HEARING set for 12/29/2021 10:00 AM (central) in US District Court - Hammond before Judge Philip P Simon. Parties shall access the telephone conference at: 888-363-4749 and then entering the code of 9147763#.. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 12/22/2021. It is ORDERED that exhibits 7-2 and 7-5 are placed under SEAL. (nac) Modified on 12/22/2021 to add detail. (nac).
December 21, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Memorandum on Points and Authorities in Support of Injunction Petition served on the Respondent and Counsel, the Union and Counsel, and the Discriminatee's Counsel on December 21, 2021, filed by Paul Hitterman. (Hill, Christina)
December 21, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Memo of Points & Authorities in Support of Petition for Injunctive Relief by Petitioner Paul Hitterman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit Index, Petitioner Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Petitioner Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Petitioner Exhibit C, Pt.1, #4 Exhibit Petitioner Exhibit C, Pt. 2, #5 Exhibit Petitioner Exhibit C, Pt. 3, #6 Exhibit Petitioner Exhibit D)(Hill, Christina)
December 21, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Service document Brief in Support of Motion to Try on Administrative Record served on Respondent and Union and their Attorneys on 12/21/21, filed by Paul Hitterman. (Hill, Christina)
December 21, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Service document Motion to Try on Administrative Record served on Respondent and Union and their Attorneys on 12/21/21, filed by Paul Hitterman. (Hill, Christina)
December 21, 2021 Filing 4 Proposed Conclusions of Law filed by Paul Hitterman. (Hill, Christina)
December 21, 2021 Filing 3 Supplemental MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Motion to Try on Administrative Record and Supporting Brief by Petitioner Paul Hitterman. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion to Try on Administrative Record, #2 Certificate of Service of Motion to Try on Administrative Record, #3 Certificate of Service for Brief in Support of Motion to Try on Administrative Record)(Hill, Christina)
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Petition for Injunctive Relief served on The Respondent, Respondent's counsel, and the Union on December 21, 2021, filed by Paul Hitterman. (Hill, Christina)
December 21, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Petitioner Paul Hitterman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Petition Cover Letter, #2 Exhibit Petition Exhibits and Index)(Hill, Christina)
December 21, 2021 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. NEW CASE: PETITION FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION PENDING (tlr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hitterman v. List Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Regional Director Paul Hitterman
Represented By: Christina Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Paul Hitterman
Represented By: Christina Hill
Represented By: Emily O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: List Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Brian J Paul
Represented By: Eric J Holshouser PHV
Represented By: Michael J Lufkin PHV
Represented By: Alexander Preller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?