Parker v. Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company
Plaintiff: Daniel Parker
Defendant: Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company
Case Number: 2:2022cv00017
Filed: January 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Filing 13 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/14/2022 10:30 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 4/8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 3/4/2022. (smb)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 3/4/2022. (smb)
March 2, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J Albright on behalf of Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company (Albright, Andrew)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alfred E Koehler PHV, III for Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 3/1/2022. (ace)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER STRIKING 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Alfred E Koehler PHV, III on behalf of Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company for reason stated in the order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 2/24/2022. (Copy mailed as directed in Order)(smb)
February 22, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company.(Ver Steeg, Matthew)
February 17, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew S Ver Steeg on behalf of Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company (Ver Steeg, Matthew)
February 16, 2022 Filing 4 Application for Attorney Alfred Emil Koehler to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-4834765(Koehler PHV, Alfred) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/1/2022: #1 IL Certificate) (ace).
February 10, 2022 Reset Deadlines: Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company served 2/1/22, Answer due 2/22/22. (jld)
February 9, 2022 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad on 2/1/2022, filed by Daniel Parker. (Brugess, George)
January 27, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jdb)
January 27, 2022 **NEW CASE** Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (jdb)
January 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-4815654.), filed by Daniel Parker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons to Indiana Harbor)(Brugess, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Parker
Represented By: George T Brugess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indiana Harbor Belt Railroad Company
Represented By: Alfred E Koehler PHV, III
Represented By: Andrew J Albright
Represented By: Matthew S Ver Steeg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?