Nustar Enterprises LLC v. Reloaded Merch LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: Nustar Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: Reloaded Merch, LLC and Bill Omar Carrasquillo
Case Number: 2:2022cv00080
Filed: April 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2022 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support of #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and improper venue CORRECTED MEMORANDUM in lieu of [ECF No.19] filed by Bill Omar Carrasquillo, Reloaded Merch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Bill Omar Carrasquillo)(Axenfeld PHV, Robert)
May 27, 2022 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Memorandum Of LAW by Defendants Bill Omar Carrasquillo, Reloaded Merch, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Bill Omar Carrasquillo)(Axenfeld PHV, Robert)
May 27, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and improper venue by Defendants Bill Omar Carrasquillo, Reloaded Merch, LLC. (Axenfeld PHV, Robert)
May 13, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Sanjay Satish Karnik on behalf of Nustar Enterprises, LLC (Karnik, Sanjay)
May 11, 2022 Filing 16 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/23/2022 10:00 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 6/17/2022.Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/11/2022. (smb)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/11/2022. (smb)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/22/2022. No pdf attached(cp)
May 11, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due 5/27/2022 (smb)
May 10, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re Summons Returned Executed Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Plaintiff Nustar Enterprises, LLC. (Hicks, Andrew)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert R Axenfeld PHV for Bill Omar Carrasquillo and Reloaded Merch LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 5/9/2022. (ace)
May 4, 2022 Filing 10 Application for Attorney Robert R. Axenfeld to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Reloaded Merch LLC and Bill Omar Carrasquillo. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-4908847 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - DC, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - PA)(Axenfeld, Robert)
May 4, 2022 Set Deadlines per #7 and #8 Bill Omar Carrasquillo answer due 5/13/22. Per #9 Reloaded Merch, LLC answer due 5/19/22. (nal)
May 3, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint with Exhibits, and Civil Cover Sheet served on Bill Omar Carrasquillo on 4/22/2022, filed by Nustar Enterprises, LLC. (Leazenby, Dean)
May 3, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint with Exhibits, and Civil Cover Sheet served on Reloaded Merch, LLC on 4/28/2022, filed by Nustar Enterprises, LLC. (Leazenby, Dean)
May 3, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint with Exhibits, and Civil Cover Sheet served on Reloaded Merch, LLC on 4/28/2022, filed by Nustar Enterprises, LLC. (Leazenby, Dean)
April 4, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Bill Omar Carrasquillo, Reloaded Merch, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (shk)
April 4, 2022 **NEW CASE** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (shk)
April 1, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nustar Enterprises, LLC. (Leazenby, Dean)
April 1, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE by Nustar Enterprises, LLC re #1 Complaint, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Leazenby, Dean)
April 1, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Dean E Leazenby on behalf of Nustar Enterprises, LLC (Leazenby, Dean)
April 1, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M Hicks on behalf of Nustar Enterprises, LLC (Hicks, Andrew)
April 1, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Bill Omar Carrasquillo, Reloaded Merch, LLC, Reloaded Merch, LLC( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-4878686.), filed by Nustar Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, #7 Proposed Summons)(Hicks, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nustar Enterprises LLC v. Reloaded Merch LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nustar Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Dean E Leazenby
Represented By: Andrew M Hicks
Represented By: Sanjay Satish Karnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reloaded Merch, LLC
Represented By: Robert R Axenfeld PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Omar Carrasquillo
Represented By: Robert R Axenfeld PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?