Quarles v. Morgan Summer Wood, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Michelle A Quarles
Defendant: Morgan Summer Wood, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood Apartments, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood Management, LLC and Morgan Summer Wood Realty, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00294
Filed: October 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Order: This case is REMANDED to Lake Superior Court, Civil Division 5, in the County of Lake, State of Indiana, under Cause No. 45D05-2204-CT-000405. Defendants' motions to dismiss #16 ; #18 and motion to strike #20 are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE and all further settings in this action are hereby VACATED. The Clerk shall treat this civil action as TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 11/18/2022. (Certified copy mail to Lake Superior Court, Civil Division 5) (jdb)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: The Court DENIES #23 Defendants' Motion To Be Released From Obligation To Identify Individual Names Of Nonparty LLC Members, Or, In The Alternative, Motion To Be Released From The Obligation And For Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 11/17/2022. (tc)
November 17, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian N Custy on behalf of Michelle A Quarles (Custy, Brian)
November 14, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION to be Released from Obligation to Identify Individual Names of Nonparty LLC Members, or In The Alternative, Motion to be Released from the Obligation and for Remand by Defendants Morgan Summer Wood Apartments, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood Management, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood Realty, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood, LLC. (Ahlers, Jeffrey)
November 14, 2022 Filing 22 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 12/5/2022. (tc)
November 10, 2022 Filing 21 BRIEF in Support of #20 RULE 12(f) MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Jury Demand filed by Morgan Summer Wood Management, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood Apartments, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood Realty, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ahlers, Jeffrey)
November 10, 2022 Filing 20 RULE 12(f) MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Jury Demand by Defendants Morgan Summer Wood Apartments, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood Management, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood Realty, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood, LLC. (Ahlers, Jeffrey)
November 10, 2022 Filing 19 BRIEF in Support of #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Morgan Summer Wood, LLC. (Ahlers, Jeffrey)
November 10, 2022 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Morgan Summer Wood, LLC. (Ahlers, Jeffrey)
November 10, 2022 Filing 17 BRIEF in Support of #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Morgan Summer Wood Management, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood Apartments, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood Realty, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ahlers, Jeffrey)
November 10, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Morgan Summer Wood Apartments, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood Management, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood Realty, LLC. (Ahlers, Jeffrey)
November 10, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Morgan Summer Wood Realty, LLC.(Ahlers, Jeffrey)
November 10, 2022 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Morgan Summer Wood Management, LLC.(Ahlers, Jeffrey)
November 10, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Morgan Summer Wood Apartments, LLC.(Ahlers, Jeffrey)
November 10, 2022 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Morgan Summer Wood, LLC.(Ahlers, Jeffrey)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER (text entry only): Defendants Unopposed Motion For Extension Of Time To File Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement #10 is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendants to file a supplemental jurisdictional statement is EXTENDED to 11/14/2022. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 10/24/22. (efc)
October 21, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement by Defendants Morgan Summer Wood Apartments, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood Management, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood Realty, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood, LLC. (Ahlers, Jeffrey)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Given the importance of determining the Court's jurisdiction to hear this case, Defendants must allege a sufficient basis for concluding the Court has diversity jurisdiction over this matter. Therefore, the Court ORDERS Defendants to FILE a Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement on or before October 31, 2022, which statement must correct the deficiencies in the Notice of Removal identified above and properly allege diversity jurisdiction over the state court complaint pursuant to the principles discussed in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 10/14/22. (ksp)
October 13, 2022 Filing 8 STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED (docket sheet). (nal)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 10/11/2022. (tc)
October 7, 2022 Reset Deadlines: Morgan Summer Wood, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood Apartments, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood Management, LLC, and Morgan Summer Wood Realty, LLC Answer due 11/10/2022 pursuant to DE #5 . (kmt)
October 7, 2022 **NEW CASE** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (kmt)
October 6, 2022 Filing 5 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Morgan Summer Wood Apartments, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood Management, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood Realty, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood, LLC ; answer due by November 10, 2022. (Ahlers, Jeffrey)
October 6, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon T Curl on behalf of All Defendants (Curl, Brandon)
October 6, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey W Ahlers on behalf of Morgan Summer Wood Apartments, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood Management, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood Realty, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood, LLC (Ahlers, Jeffrey)
October 6, 2022 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Morgan Summer Wood Apartments, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood Management, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood Realty, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Morgan Summer Wood Apartments, LLC for Morgan Summer Wood, LLC.. (Ahlers, Jeffrey)
October 6, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5043830.) from Lake Superior Court, Cause No. 45D05-2204-CT-000405, filed by Morgan Summer Wood Management, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood Apartments, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood, LLC, Morgan Summer Wood Realty, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Ahlers, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quarles v. Morgan Summer Wood, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle A Quarles
Represented By: Andrew G Brown
Represented By: Brian N Custy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Summer Wood, LLC
Represented By: Brandon T Curl
Represented By: Jeffrey W Ahlers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Summer Wood Apartments, LLC
Represented By: Brandon T Curl
Represented By: Jeffrey W Ahlers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Summer Wood Management, LLC
Represented By: Brandon T Curl
Represented By: Jeffrey W Ahlers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Summer Wood Realty, LLC
Represented By: Brandon T Curl
Represented By: Jeffrey W Ahlers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?