Autism Home Services, LLC v. The Piece That Fits Daycare and ABA Therapy, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Autism Home Services, LLC
Defendant: The Piece That Fits Daycare and ABA Therapy, Inc. and Khiana Boone
Case Number: 2:2022cv00316
Filed: October 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with affirmative defenses by Khiana Boone.(Twohy, John)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle G Grothoff on behalf of Khiana Boone (Grothoff, Kyle)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Proposed Pretrial Order Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by The Piece That Fits Daycare and ABA Therapy, Inc.. (Camper, Justin)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of #16 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM First MOTION to Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss filed by The Piece That Fits Daycare and ABA Therapy, Inc.. (Camper, Justin)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , First MOTION to Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss by Defendant The Piece That Fits Daycare and ABA Therapy, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memo of Law for Motion to Dismiss)(Camper, Justin)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/19/2023 11:30 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Parties' proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 1/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/12/2022. (smb)
December 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/12/2022. (smb)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. The Piece That Fits Daycare and ABA Therapy, Inc. answer due 12/27/2022. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/28/2022. No pdf attached.(cp)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Khiana Boone answer due 12/19/2022. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/28/2022. No pdf attached.(cp)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendant The Piece That Fits Daycare and ABA Therapy, Inc. (jdb)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin L Camper on behalf of The Piece That Fits Daycare and ABA Therapy, Inc. (jdb)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (L.R. 6-1 Notice) by Defendant Khiana Boone. (Twohy, John)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John P Twohy on behalf of Khiana Boone (Twohy, John)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Personal Service of Vito Davis served on Khiana Boone on October 30, 2022, filed by Autism Home Services, LLC. (Cohron, Travis)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Khiana Boone, The Piece That Fits Daycare and ABA Therapy, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmc)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. **NEW CASE** (rmc)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Proposed Summons filed by Autism Home Services, LLC. (Cohron, Travis)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Proposed Summons filed by Autism Home Services, LLC. (Cohron, Travis)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Travis W Cohron on behalf of Autism Home Services, LLC (Cohron, Travis)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Autism Home Services, LLC( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5061805.), filed by Autism Home Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit At Will Employment Agreement)(Cohron, Travis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Autism Home Services, LLC v. The Piece That Fits Daycare and ABA Therapy, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Autism Home Services, LLC
Represented By: Travis W Cohron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Piece That Fits Daycare and ABA Therapy, Inc.
Represented By: Justin L Camper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khiana Boone
Represented By: John P Twohy
Represented By: Kyle G Grothoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?