Todosijevic v. R.S. Pennyfields, Inc. d/b/a Rich Penn Auctions et al
Plaintiff: PETER TODOSIJEVIC
Defendant: R.S. PENNYFIELDS, INC. d/b/a RICH PENN AUCTIONS, RICHARD PENN, WILLIAM ARRINGTON and R.S. Pennyfield's, Inc. doing business as Rich Penn Auctions
Case Number: 2:2022cv00379
Filed: December 8, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Peter Todosijevic ; answer due by 2/21/2023. (Gehringer, Stephen)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 BRIEF in Support of #12 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Alternatively Motion to Transfer filed by Richard Penn, R.S. Pennyfield's, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A - Penn Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Penn Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Penn Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B - Consent to Declaration)(Bosak, Cameron)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or Alternatively Motion to Transfer by Defendants Richard Penn, R.S. Pennyfield's, Inc.. (Bosak, Cameron)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2023 09:00 AM (Central time) before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted to join the conference. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 1/24/2023. (tc)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STATEMENT re Supplemental Jurisdiction. (Gehringer, Stephen)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OPINION AND ORDER: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to FILE on or before 1/25/23, a supplemental jurisdictional statement that properly alleges the citizenships of the parties as described. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 1/4/23. (nal)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 1/3/2023. (tc)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines: R.S. Pennyfield's, Inc. and Richard Penn Answer due 1/31/23 pursuant to DE #6 . (kmt)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Richard Penn, R.S. Pennyfield's, Inc. ; answer due by 01/31/2023. (Bosak, Cameron)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron Bosak on behalf of Richard Penn, R.S. Pennyfield's, Inc. (Bosak, Cameron)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Todosijevic. R.S. Pennyfield's, Inc. served on 12/13/2022, answer due 1/3/2023. (Gehringer, Stephen)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Todosijevic. William Arrington served on 12/10/2022, answer due 1/3/2023. (Gehringer, Stephen)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to William Arrington, Richard Penn, R.S. Pennyfield's, Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sej)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order **NEW CASE** Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. (sej)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5100015.), filed by Peter Todosijevic. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Proposed Summons, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons)(Gehringer, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todosijevic v. R.S. Pennyfields, Inc. d/b/a Rich Penn Auctions et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETER TODOSIJEVIC
Represented By: Stephen Gehringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.S. PENNYFIELDS, INC. d/b/a RICH PENN AUCTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RICHARD PENN
Represented By: Cameron Bosak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WILLIAM ARRINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.S. Pennyfield's, Inc. doing business as Rich Penn Auctions
Represented By: Cameron Bosak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?