Guinnup v. Mad Mushroom Franchise Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Lyle Guinnup
Defendant: Mad Mushroom Franchise Group, LLC
Case Number: 2:2022cv00397
Filed: December 22, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2023 Filing 30 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Snow, Peter)
February 2, 2023 Filing 29 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2023 10:30 AM (Central time) before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted to join the conference. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 2/2/2023. (tc)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #24 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney James L Simon PHV for Lyle Guinnup. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 2/1/2023. (ace)
January 30, 2023 Filing 26 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Lyle Guinnup filed by Lyle Guinnup. (Simon, James)
January 30, 2023 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by James L Simon on behalf of Lyle Guinnup (Simon, James)
January 30, 2023 Filing 24 Application for Attorney James L. Simon to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Lyle Guinnup. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5144691 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Simon, James)
January 30, 2023 Filing 23 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Mad Mushroom Franchise Group, LLC filed by Mad Mushroom Franchise Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record)(Denton, D)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS Attorneys James L. Simon and Duane R. Denton to show cause in writing by 2/3/2023, why they have not complied with the violation notices. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 1/27/2023. (copy mailed to Attorney Duane Denton)(mrm)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 12/29/2022. (Copy mailed to James Simon, Duane Denton) (tc)
December 22, 2022 Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:22-cv-01954. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
December 20, 2022 Filing 19 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Indiana. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Indiana, on 12/20/2022. (JSR) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/22/2022.]
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CLOSED TRANSFER to the Northern District of Indiana - Because the Northern District of Indiana is where Mr. Guinnup resides, Mad Mushroom is headquartered, and the acts or omissions underlying this lawsuit occurred, the Clerk is DIRECTED to TRANSFER this action to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana, Hammond Division. (See Order.) Signed by Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson on 12/20/2022. (JSR) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/22/2022.]
December 20, 2022 Filing 17 Notice to File Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement. (RAGS) (JSR) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/22/2022.]
December 19, 2022 Filing 16 Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Defendant MAD MUSHROOM FRANCHISE GROUP, LLC. (Denton, Duane) Modified on 12/20/2022 - Updated dkt text. (JSR). [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/22/2022.]
December 19, 2022 Filing 15 Defendant's ANSWER to #2 Complaint , filed by MAD MUSHROOM FRANCHISE GROUP, LLC.(Denton, Duane) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/22/2022.]
November 18, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information. Consistent with Local Rule 5-3, Peter Snow hereby notifies the Clerk of the court of changed contact information. (Snow, Peter) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/22/2022.]
November 17, 2022 Filing 13 NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time re Filing a response to pleading defined by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7(a), filed by Defendant MAD MUSHROOM FRANCHISE GROUP, LLC. (Denton, Duane) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/22/2022.]
November 17, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Duane R. Denton on behalf of Defendant MAD MUSHROOM FRANCHISE GROUP, LLC. (Denton, Duane) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/22/2022.]
November 17, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Snow on behalf of Defendant MAD MUSHROOM FRANCHISE GROUP, LLC. (Snow, Peter) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/22/2022.]
November 3, 2022 Filing 10 RETURN of Personal Service, filed by LYLE GUINNUP. MAD MUSHROOM FRANCHISE GROUP, LLC served on 10/29/2022. (Simon, James) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/22/2022.]
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #1 Motion to Appear pro hac vice. Attorney James L. Simon for LYLE GUINNUP added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark J. Dinsmore on 10/12/2022. (SWM) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/22/2022.]
October 7, 2022 Filing 8 PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES before Judge Jane Magnus-Stinson. (JSR) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/22/2022.]
October 6, 2022 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/22/2022.]
October 6, 2022 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to MAD MUSHROOM FRANCHISE GROUP, LLC. (DJH) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/22/2022.]
October 6, 2022 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET , filed by Plaintiff LYLE GUINNUP. (Simon, James) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/22/2022.]
October 6, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Consent to be Party Plaintiff Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) by LYLE GUINNUP (Simon, James) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/22/2022.]
October 6, 2022 Filing 3 Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to MAD MUSHROOM FRANCHISE GROUP, LLC. (Simon, James) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/22/2022.]
October 6, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-7313585) (Simon, James) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/22/2022.]
October 4, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Attorney(s) James L. Simon to Appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $100, receipt number AINSDC-7309135), filed by Plaintiff Lyle Guinnup. (Simon, James) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 12/22/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guinnup v. Mad Mushroom Franchise Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lyle Guinnup
Represented By: James L. Simon
Represented By: James L Simon PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mad Mushroom Franchise Group, LLC
Represented By: Duane R. Denton
Represented By: Peter Snow
Represented By: D Rusty Denton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?