Petrulakis v. SLT Lending SPV, Inc.
Plaintiff: Luann Petrulakis
Defendant: SLT Lending SPV, Inc. d/b/a Sur La Table and SLT Lending SPV Inc doing business as Sur La Table
Case Number: 2:2023cv00202
Filed: June 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The Joint Motion To Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference And For Relief From Particular Rule 26 Obligations [DE 23] is GRANTED. The preliminary pretrial conference scheduled for 8/24/2023 [DE 10] is VACATED, and the parties' obligations under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) CONTINUED, to be scheduled at a later date. Order on Motion to Consolidate [DE 13] forthcoming in coming weeks. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 8/18/2023. Text entry order. (tc)
August 18, 2023 ***Hearing terminated. (tc)
August 18, 2023 Cases associated. (shk)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Consolidate Cases. It is hereby ORDERED Case 2:23-cv-190 and 2:23-cv-202 are hereby CONSOLIDATED. All future filings shall be made on the Docket of the Baker Suit, Case No. 2:23-CV-190 only, using the combined case caption shown in this Order. A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 9/13/2023 at 10:30 AM (CST) before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Among other matters, the Court will discuss its intention to order the filing of a consolidated complaint. Parties should be prepared to discuss their objections, if any, to doing so at that time. Parties are instructed to dial 833-568-8864, enter Meeting ID 161 2255 6691 and passcode 252788 when prompted to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 8/17/2023. (shk)
August 17, 2023 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference and for Relief from Particular Rule 26 Obligations by Plaintiff Luann Petrulakis. (DeLaney, Kathleen)
August 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Defendant's Unopposed Motion To Stay Proceedings Pending Consolidation of Related Actions, Or, In The Alternative, Motion To Extend Time To Respond To Complaint #12 is GRANTED with relief different than requested. The deadline for Defendant to respond to the complaint is VACATED, to be reset following a ruling on the motion to consolidate, which must be filed in Case No. 2:23-cv-00190. Defendant is DIRECTED to file the motion to consolidate in the first-filed case, No. 2:23-cv-00190, forthwith. Approved by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 8/1/2023. Text entry order. (tc)
July 31, 2023 Filing 13 MOTION to Consolidate Cases Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Consolidate Related Actions by Defendant SLT Lending SPV Inc. (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
July 31, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Consolidation of Related Actions or in the Alternative Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendant SLT Lending SPV Inc. (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
July 27, 2023 Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc)
July 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/24/2023 09:30 AM (Central time) before Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar. Parties are instructed to dial 877-336-1280 and enter access code 3293676# when prompted to join the conference. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 7/27/2023. (tc)
July 18, 2023 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SLT Lending SPV Inc. (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 7/17/2023. (tc)
July 17, 2023 Set Deadline per #6 Agreed Notice. Dft SLT Lending SPV Inc answer due 7/31/2023. (mrm)
July 14, 2023 Filing 7 **Disregard DE as it is a proposed Order**- NOTICE by SLT Lending SPV Inc re #6 Notice (Other) Proposed Order on Defendant's Notice for Automatic Initial Extension of Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint (DelGobbo, Bonnie) Modified on 7/17/2023 to disregard.(mrm).
July 14, 2023 Filing 6 AGREED NOTICE by SLT Lending SPV Inc re #1 Complaint Defendant's Notice for Automatic Initial Extension of Time to Respond to Class Action Complaint (DelGobbo, Bonnie) Modified on 7/17/2023 to advise agreed (mrm).
July 14, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bonnie Keane DelGobbo on behalf of SLT Lending SPV Inc (DelGobbo, Bonnie)
June 26, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luann Petrulakis. SLT Lending SPV Inc served on 6/26/2023, answer due 7/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Tracking)(DeLaney, Kathleen)
June 22, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to SLT Lending SPV Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmc)
June 22, 2023 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. **NEW CASE** (rmc)
June 21, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen A DeLaney on behalf of Luann Petrulakis (DeLaney, Kathleen)
June 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against SLT Lending SPV, Inc. d/b/a Sur La Table( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5277248.), filed by Luann Petrulakis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(DeLaney, Kathleen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petrulakis v. SLT Lending SPV, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luann Petrulakis
Represented By: Kathleen A DeLaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLT Lending SPV, Inc. d/b/a Sur La Table
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLT Lending SPV Inc doing business as Sur La Table
Represented By: Bonnie Keane DelGobbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?