Ledesma v. Gary Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: Frank Ledesma
Defendant: Gary Railway Company, United States Steel Corporation and Terry Carter
Case Number: 2:2023cv00322
Filed: September 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Frank Ledesma. (Benton, Thomas)
November 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court Defendants' Response In Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand for Sanctions filed by Terry Carter, United States Steel Corporation. (Curtis, Justin)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting, for relief different than requested, #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Response to #5 to be filed by 12/19/2023, with leave to request additional extension as needed. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/25/2023. No pdf attached(cp)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas R Benton on behalf of Frank Ledesma (Benton, Thomas)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response in Opposition by Plaintiff Frank Ledesma. (Benton, Thomas)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support of #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Frank Ledesma. (Benton, Thomas)
October 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Frank Ledesma. (Benton, Thomas)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. Magistrate Consent forms due by 11/3/2023. (smb)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/13/2023. (smb)
October 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Defendant United States Steel Corporation's ANSWER to #2 Complaint by United States Steel Corporation.(Curtis, Justin) Modified on 10/16/2023 to link complaint (mlc).
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Court STRIKES from the docket Defendant United States Steel Corporation's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint #7 with leave to re-file a document that complies with the Local Rules on or before 10/13/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/06/2023. (jdb)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ***STRICKEN per #8 Order*** Defendant United States Steel Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint by United States Steel Corporation.(Curtis, Justin) Modified on 10/6/2023 (jdb).
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in Support of #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Terry Carter. (Curtis, Justin)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Terry Carter. (Curtis, Justin)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United States Steel Corporation. (Curtis, Justin)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin K Curtis on behalf of Terry Carter, United States Steel Corporation (Curtis, Justin)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order ***NEW CASE*** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (jdb)
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5366772.) from Lake Superior Court, Cause No. 45D112308CT000958, filed by United States Steel Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Curtis, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledesma v. Gary Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Ledesma
Represented By: Otto J Shragal
Represented By: Thomas R Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Railway Company
Represented By: Scott R Bilse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Steel Corporation
Represented By: Justin K Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Carter
Represented By: Justin K Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?