Dukes v. Arias et al
Plaintiff: Walter Dukes, Jr.
Defendant: Marvin Rodriguez Arias, Loves Travel Stops & Country Stores Inc. and Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv00336
Filed: October 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #10 Statement. Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement to be filed by 12/11/2023 regarding the citizenship of the parties as outlined in the attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/27/2023. (smb)
November 17, 2023 Filing 10 STATEMENT (Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement) regarding #9 Order, Set Deadlines. (VanDenburgh, John)
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Defendant ORDERED to FILE a supplemental jurisdictional statement regarding the citizenship of the parties by 11/17/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/6/2023. (smb)
October 30, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to #5 Complaint for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial by Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc..(VanDenburgh, John) Modified on 11/1/2023 to link to complaint (mlc).
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/13/2023. (smb)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/SET DEADLINE: The Court docket is unclear as to whether there is service of process as to the Complaint filed 8/21/2023 in State Court as to Defendant Marvin Rodriguez Arias. Accordingly, Plaintiff is given to 10/30/2023 to file proof of service of the Complaint as this Defendant. Alternatively, plaintiff is to file proposed summons for the Clerk to issue by 10/30/2023. Text order entry. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/13/2023. (smb)
October 13, 2023 Set Answer Deadline Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc. Answer due 10/30/2023 per [1-2] (smb)
October 5, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Loves Travel Stops & Country Stores Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc. for Loves Travel Stops & Country Stores Inc... (VanDenburgh, John)
October 5, 2023 ***NEW CASE*** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (jdb)
October 4, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by Loves Travel Stops & Country Stores Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, Amended (VanDenburgh, John)
October 4, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John T VanDenburgh on behalf of Loves Travel Stops & Country Stores Inc. (VanDenburgh, John)
October 4, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5373374.) from Lake Circuit Court, Cause No. 45C01-2308-CT-000881, filed by Loves Travel Stops & Country Stores Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Court Filings, #3 Exhibit Service of Process, #4 Exhibit Business Entity Report, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet)(VanDenburgh, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dukes v. Arias et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Dukes, Jr.
Represented By: Timothy W Cochren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin Rodriguez Arias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loves Travel Stops & Country Stores Inc.
Represented By: John T VanDenburgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Love's Travel Stops & Country Stores, Inc.
Represented By: John T VanDenburgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?