Perma-Green Supreme, Inc v. Dr.Permagreen, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Perma-Green Supreme, Inc
Defendant: Dr.Permagreen, LLC, Michael Klott, FTW Investments LLC and Michael Edward Klott
Case Number: 2:2023cv00341
Filed: October 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: The Court hereby ORDERS Rule 26(a)(1) initial exchanges have been exchanged. The Plaintiff's deadline to seek leave to amend the pleadings is 02/16/2024; The Defendants' deadline to seek leave to amend the pleadings is 04/18/2024; The deadline to complete all fact and expert discovery is 11/15/2024; Plaintiff's deadline for expert witness disclosures and reports to Defendants is 07/19/2024; Defendants' deadline for expert witness disclosures and reports to Plaintiff is 07/19/2024; The deadline for Rule 26(e) supplements is 09/20/2024; The parties are ordered to conduct mediation and the parties' deadline to select a mediator is 03/01/2024; mediation must be completed and a report filed by 11/15/2024; and The deadline for the parties to return the Consent to or Declination of Exercise of Jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge is extended to 01/02/2024. The Court VACATES the Preliminary Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for December 14, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/11/2023. (jdb)
December 8, 2023 Filing 26 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Alasauskas, Amanda)
December 8, 2023 Filing 25 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Dr.Permagreen, LLC, FTW Investments LLC, Michael Edward Klott.(Kizy PHV, Brandon)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: The Court REMINDS counsel for Defendants of the need to comply with the Local Rules, availabe at Local Rules | Northern District of Indiana | United States District Court (uscourts.gov), and WARNS them that noncompliant filings will continue to be stricken. The Court STRIKES with leave to refile Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint #21 , with the re-filed document to be filed by 12/15/2023, and to comply with Local Rule 10-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/8/2023. (ash)
December 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Northern District of Indiana Local Rule 26-2 prohibits the routine filing of discovery, the Court STRIKES Defendants' Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures #22 . Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/5/23. (nhc)
December 4, 2023 Filing 22 **STRICKEN per #23 Order** DEFENDANTS RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES filed by Defendants Dr.Permagreen, LLC, FTW Investments LLC, Michael Edward Klott. (Kizy PHV, Brandon) Modified on 12/4/2023 to edit text -filed as motion/term motion. (smb). Modified to strike on 12/5/2023 (nhc).
November 26, 2023 Filing 21 *STRICKEN per #24 Order* Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Dr.Permagreen, LLC, FTW Investments LLC, Michael Edward Klott.(Kizy PHV, Brandon) Modified on 12/8/2023 to strike (ash).
November 2, 2023 Filing 20 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2023 11:30 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 12/8/2023.Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/2/2023. (smb)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. ByMagistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/2/2023. (smb)
November 1, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Perma-Green Supreme, Inc. FTW Investments LLC served on 10/23/2023, answer due 11/13/2023. (Fardy, P)
November 1, 2023 Filing 16 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Dr.Permagreen, LLC, FTW Investments LLC, Michael Edward Klott ; answer due by November 27, 2023. (Kizy PHV, Brandon)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brandon J Kizy PHV for Dr.Permagreen, FTW Investments LLC, and Michael Edward Klott. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/27/2023. (ace)
October 25, 2023 Filing 14 Application for Attorney Brandon Kizy to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael Klott. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5393855(Kizy, Brandon) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/26/2023: #1 MI certificate) (ace).
October 24, 2023 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Perma-Green Supreme, Inc. Michael Edward Klott served on 10/16/2023, answer due 11/6/2023. (Fardy, P)
October 24, 2023 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Perma-Green Supreme, Inc. Dr.Permagreen, LLC served on 10/16/2023, answer due 11/6/2023. (Fardy, P)
October 17, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda J Alasauskas on behalf of Perma-Green Supreme, Inc (Alasauskas, Amanda)
October 12, 2023 Filing 10 Copy of #8 AO 120 form sent to Patent and Trademark Office. (jld)
October 12, 2023 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Dr.Permagreen, LLC, FTW Investments LLC, Michael Klott. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jld)
October 10, 2023 Filing 8 REPORT by Perma-Green Supreme, Inc Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a trademark. (Fardy, P)
October 10, 2023 Filing 7 Proposed Summons filed by Perma-Green Supreme, Inc. (Fardy, P)
October 10, 2023 Filing 6 Proposed Summons filed by Perma-Green Supreme, Inc. (Fardy, P)
October 10, 2023 Filing 5 Proposed Summons filed by Perma-Green Supreme, Inc. (Fardy, P)
October 10, 2023 **NEW CASE** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (shk)
October 9, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by P Stephen Fardy on behalf of Perma-Green Supreme, Inc (Fardy, P)
October 6, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by William D Patterson on behalf of Perma-Green Supreme, Inc (Patterson, William)
October 6, 2023 Filing 2 STATEMENT Civil Cover Sheet. (Patterson, William)
October 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Perma-Green Supreme, Inc( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5375691.), filed by Perma-Green Supreme, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Patterson, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perma-Green Supreme, Inc v. Dr.Permagreen, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perma-Green Supreme, Inc
Represented By: William D Patterson
Represented By: P Stephen Fardy
Represented By: Amanda J Alasauskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr.Permagreen, LLC
Represented By: Brandon J Kizy PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Klott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FTW Investments LLC
Represented By: Brandon J Kizy PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Edward Klott
Represented By: Brandon J Kizy PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?