Krol v. Whitten Law Office LLC et al
Defendant: Great West Casualty Company
Counter Defendant: Gina Krol
Counter Claimant: Whitten Law Office LLC and Michael T Terwilliger
Case Number: 2:2023cv00366
Filed: October 23, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: John E Martin
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2023 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Gina Krol. (Brown, Robert)
December 21, 2023 Filing 43 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #39 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Michael T Terwilliger, Whitten Law Office LLC. (Hull, Andrew)
December 20, 2023 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM in Support of #41 MOTION to Transfer Case Great West Casualty Company's Motion to Transfer Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois or Alternatively, to Dismiss filed by Great West Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Application to Employ Special Counsel, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order Employing Special Counsel, #3 Exhibit 3 - Order Granting Motion for Relief from Automatic Stay, #4 Exhibit 4 - Order on Motion for Relief from Order of 9-12-22)(Murphy, Siobhan)
December 20, 2023 Filing 41 MOTION to Transfer Case Great West Casualty Company's Motion to Transfer Venue to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Illinois or Alternatively, to Dismiss by Defendant Great West Casualty Company. (Murphy, Siobhan)
December 20, 2023 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM in Support of #39 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Gina Krol. (Kramer, Jack)
December 20, 2023 Filing 39 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Counter Defendant Gina Krol. (Kramer, Jack)
December 15, 2023 Filing 38 NOTICE OF JOINDER by Great West Casualty Company regarding #30 Response to Motion, #25 Sealed Document,,,, #26 MOTION to Seal Docket 25 Great West Casualty Company's Joinder to Motion to Seal and Motion for Protective Order as to Attorney-Client Privileged Documents (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Application to Employ Special Counsel, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order Employing Special Counsel, #3 Exhibit 3 - Vipers Posttrial Motion, #4 Exhibit 4 - Krofts Response in Opposition to Post-Trial Motions, #5 Exhibit 5 - Vipers Reply in Support of Posttrial Motion., #6 Exhibit 6 - Register of Actions of the Kroft Lawsuit in Illinois state court)(Murphy, Siobhan)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Reply to be filed by 12/22/2023.Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/7/2023. No pdf attached.(cp)
December 6, 2023 Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Gina Krol, Counter Defendant Gina Krol. (Kramer, Jack)
December 4, 2023 Filing 35 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Michael T Terwilliger, Whitten Law Office LLC. (Hull, Andrew)
December 4, 2023 Filing 34 RESPONSE to Motion re #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Great West Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Murphy, Siobhan)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING #31 Joint MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference filed by Gina Krol. The Court VACATES the Prelim R16B Pretrial Conference on 12/14/2023, and the deadline for parties to submit a proposed case management plan pending ruling on #21 MOTION to Remand. Text order entry. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/4/2023. (smb)
December 4, 2023 Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #26 MOTION to Seal Docket 25 filed by Michael T Terwilliger, Whitten Law Office LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 11/27/23 Email from Breen's Counsel)(Hull, Andrew)
December 1, 2023 Filing 31 Joint MOTION to Continue Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Plaintiff Gina Krol, Counter Defendant Gina Krol. (Kramer, Jack)
November 30, 2023 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion re #26 MOTION to Seal Docket 25 filed by Gina Krol. (Kramer, Jack)
November 30, 2023 Filing 29 *ATTORNEY FILED IN ERROR refiled at #30 * RESPONSE to Motion re #26 MOTION to Seal Docket 25 filed by Gina Krol. (Kramer, Jack) Modified to mark as filing error on 11/30/2023 (nhc).
November 29, 2023 Filing 28 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses & Jury Demand by Great West Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - GWWC Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - May 26, 2016 letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - June 22, 2016 letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - Breen tender letter, #5 Exhibit 5 - April 16, 2019 email, #6 Exhibit 6 - April 10, 2019 email, #7 Exhibit 7 - April 30, 2019 email, #8 Exhibit 8 - June 28, 2019 email, #9 Exhibit 9 - June 28, 2019 email, #10 Exhibit 10 - July 15, 2019 email)(Murphy, Siobhan)
November 29, 2023 Filing 27 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Gina Krol by Michael T Terwilliger, Whitten Law Office LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Under Seal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Breen letter to Great West, #3 Exhibit 3 - Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 4 - 7/14/14 - Terwilliger Email to Bradley, #5 Exhibit 5 - Counsel Email Exchange, #6 Exhibit 6 - Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 7 - 4/20/19 Terwilliger Email to Bradley, #8 Exhibit 8 - 6/28/19 Terwilliger Email to Bradley, #9 Exhibit 9 - 6/28/19 Bradley Email to Terwilliger, #10 Exhibit 10 - 7/15/19 Bradley Email to Terwilliger, #11 Exhibit 11 - Under Seal, #12 Exhibit 12 - Mediation Agreement, #13 Exhibit 13 - Under Seal, #14 Exhibit 14 - Under Seal, #15 Exhibit 15 - 8/16/19 Terwilliger Email to Bradley, #16 Exhibit 16 - 9/27/19 Bradley Email to Terwilliger, #17 Exhibit 17 - Under Seal, #18 Exhibit 18 - Under Seal, #19 Exhibit 19 - Under Seal, #20 Exhibit 20 - Under Seal, #21 Exhibit 21 - Under Seal, #22 Exhibit 22 - Under Seal)(Hull, Andrew)
November 29, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION to Seal Docket 25 by Defendants Michael T Terwilliger, Whitten Law Office LLC. (Hull, Andrew)
November 29, 2023 Filing 25 Sealed Document re #12 State Court Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Whitten Email Exchange with Cvijetic, #2 Exhibit 2 - Breen letter to Great West, #3 Exhibit 3 - Terwilliger Letter to Cvijetic, #4 Exhibit 4 - 7/14/14 - Terwilliger Email to Bradley, #5 Exhibit 5 - Counsel Email Exchange, #6 Exhibit 6 - 4/22/19 Bren Email to Terwilliger, #7 Exhibit 7 - 4/20/19 Terwilliger Email to Bradley, #8 Exhibit 8 - 6/28/19 Terwilliger Email to Bradley, #9 Exhibit 9 - 6/28/19 Bradley Email to Terwilliger, #10 Exhibit 10 - 7/15/19 Bradley Email to Terwilliger, #11 Exhibit 11 - 7/2/19 Terwilliger Pretrial Report, #12 Exhibit 12 - Mediation Agreement, #13 Exhibit 13 - Terwilliger Email to Buckley, #14 Exhibit 14 - 8/16/19 Breen Email to Terwilliger, #15 Exhibit 15 - 8/16/19 Terwilliger Email to Bradley, #16 Exhibit 16 - 9/27/19 Bradley Email to Terwilliger, #17 Exhibit 17 - 10/11/19 Terwilliger Report, #18 Exhibit 18 - 11/28/16 Terwilliger Report, #19 Exhibit 19 - 4/12/17 Terwilliger Report, #20 Exhibit 20 - 10/11/17 Terwilliger Report, #21 Exhibit 21 - 4/9/18 Terwilliger Report, #22 Exhibit 22 - Terwilliger Letter to Great West)(Hull, Andrew)
November 29, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Clara P Gutwein on behalf of Michael T Terwilliger, Whitten Law Office LLC (Gutwein, Clara)
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #12 State Court Complaint. Michael T Terwilliger answer due 11/29/2023; Whitten Law Office LLC answer due 11/29/2023. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/21/2023. No pdf attached.(djs)
November 20, 2023 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Support of #21 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Gina Krol. (Brown, Robert)
November 20, 2023 Filing 21 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Gina Krol. (Brown, Robert)
November 20, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert D Brown on behalf of Gina Krol (Brown, Robert)
November 20, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #12 State Court Complaint by Defendants Michael T Terwilliger, Whitten Law Office LLC. (Hull, Andrew)
November 2, 2023 Filing 18 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
November 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/14/2023 10:30 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 12/8/2023.Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 11/2/2023. (smb)
October 31, 2023 Reset Deadlines: Whitten Law Office LLC and Michael T Terwilliger Answer due 11/27/2023 pursuant to DE #16 . (kmt)
October 30, 2023 Filing 16 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Michael T Terwilliger, Whitten Law Office LLC ; answer due by 11/27/2023. (Hull, Andrew)
October 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time. Great West Casualty Company answer now due 11/29/2023. Text order entry. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/30/2023. (smb)
October 27, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Defendant Great West Casualty Company. (Murphy, Siobhan)
October 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 10/27/2023. (smb)
October 24, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE by Great West Casualty Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing of State Court Docket (Attachments: #1 Supplement State Court Docket)(Murphy, Siobhan)
October 24, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Danny L Worker on behalf of Great West Casualty Company (Worker, Danny)
October 24, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jack A Kramer on behalf of Gina Krol (Kramer, Jack)
October 24, 2023 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great West Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corp for Great West Casualty Company.. (Murphy, Siobhan)
October 24, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Siobhan M Murphy on behalf of Great West Casualty Company (Murphy, Siobhan)
October 24, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory A English on behalf of Michael T Terwilliger, Whitten Law Office LLC (English, Gregory)
October 24, 2023 ***NEW CASE*** Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (jld)
October 23, 2023 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Whitten Law Office LLC. (Hull, Andrew)
October 23, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE by Michael T Terwilliger, Whitten Law Office LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, of Consent to Removal (Hull, Andrew)
October 23, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew W Hull on behalf of Michael T Terwilliger, Whitten Law Office LLC (Hull, Andrew)
October 23, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5391897.) from Superior Court of Porter County, Cause No. 64D02-2309-CT-008768, filed by Great West Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - NDIL Docket, #4 Exhibit 3 - Co-Defendants Written Consent to Removal)(Murphy, Siobhan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krol v. Whitten Law Office LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Gina Krol
Represented By: Jack A Kramer
Represented By: Kenneth J Allen
Represented By: Robert D Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Whitten Law Office LLC
Represented By: Andrew W Hull
Represented By: Clara P Gutwein
Represented By: Gregory A English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Michael T Terwilliger
Represented By: Andrew W Hull
Represented By: Clara P Gutwein
Represented By: Gregory A English
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great West Casualty Company
Represented By: Siobhan M Murphy
Represented By: Danny L Worker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?