Connolly v. Christopher R. Schmidgall, et al.
Plaintiff: Noreen Connolly
Defendant: Christopher R. Schmidgall, et al., Christopher R Schmidgall, Amanda Hires and Jennifer Prokop
Case Number: 2:2023cv00405
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Joshua P Kolar
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2024 Filing 18 (Unsigned) REQUEST for Admissions to Defendant Christopher Schmidgall by Noreen Connolly. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (No Caption or Case No. listed) (jdb)
January 19, 2024 Filing 17 (Unsigned) REQUEST for Admissions to Defendant Amanda Hires by Noreen Connolly. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (No Caption or Case No. listed) (jdb)
January 19, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION to Amend #2 State Court Complaint titled Motion to Leave to Amend Complaint by Plaintiff Noreen Connolly. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Envelope) (jdb)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The appearance of Attorney Courtney M. Gaber for Defendant Christopher R. Schmidgall is WITHDRAWN. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/16/24. Text entry order. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nal)
January 15, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Courtney M. Gaber by Defendants Amanda Hires, Christopher R Schmidgall. (Gaber, Courtney)
January 5, 2024 Filing 13 ****ATTORNEY FILED IN ERROR***NOTICE by Amanda Hires, Christopher R Schmidgall (Young, James) Modified on 1/8/2024 (jdb).
January 5, 2024 Filing 12 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 1/26/2024. cc: pro se pltf (tc)
January 4, 2024 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM in Support of #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jennifer Prokop. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Irvin - AUSA, Brian)
January 4, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Jennifer Prokop. (Irvin - AUSA, Brian)
January 4, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney M Gaber on behalf of Christopher R Schmidgall (Gaber, Courtney)
December 21, 2023 Filing 8 BRIEF in Support of #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Ask for Leave from Court filed by Christopher R Schmidgall. (Attachments: #1 proposed order)(Young, James)
December 21, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Ask for Leave from Court by Defendant Christopher R Schmidgall. (Young, James)
December 6, 2023 Set Deadline per #6 Agreed Notice. Defendants Amanda Hires, Christopher R Schmidgall answer due 1/3/2024. (mrm)
December 5, 2023 Filing 6 AGREED NOTICE by Amanda Hires, Christopher R Schmidgall of Automatic Initial Extension of Time (Young, James) Modified on 12/6/2023 to update title (mrm).
December 4, 2023 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED. ; State Court Case No. 45D05-2311-CT-001292. (nhc)
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James T Young on behalf of Amanda Hires, Christopher R Schmidgall (Young, James)
November 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar on 11/27/2023. cc: Connolly (tc)
November 22, 2023 Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Joshua P Kolar added. **NEW CASE** (rmc)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lake Superior Court, Civil Division 5, Cause No. 45D05-2311-CT-001292, filed by Christopher R. Schmidgall, et al.. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Irvin - AUSA, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connolly v. Christopher R. Schmidgall, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noreen Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher R. Schmidgall, et al.
Represented By: Brian Irvin - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher R Schmidgall
Represented By: James T Young
Represented By: Courtney M Gaber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Hires
Represented By: James T Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Prokop
Represented By: Brian Irvin - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?