Fields v. de la Cruz et al
Plaintiff: Summer Fields
Defendant: Alejandro Basulto de la Cruz, Chicago Intermodal Transportation Inc. and Direct Chassislink, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2023cv00423
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: James T Moody
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 Filing 22 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information (Fosnot, Alyson)
January 18, 2024 Filing 21 ANSWER to #3 Complaint AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by Alejandro Basulto de la Cruz.(Fosnot, Alyson) Modified on 1/22/2024 to link to complaint (mlc).
January 16, 2024 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (LaTulip, Matthew)
January 16, 2024 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (LaTulip, Matthew)
January 11, 2024 Filing 18 Notice of Automatic Initial Extension of Time to Respond to #13 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Defendants Chicago Intermodal Transportation Inc., Alejandro Basulto de la Cruz. (Fosnot, Alyson) Modified on 1/12/2024 to edit text (ash).
January 3, 2024 Filing 17 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/1/2024 10:30 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due by 1/26/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/3/2024. (smb)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/3/2024. (smb)
December 26, 2023 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Chicago Intermodal Transportation Inc..(Fosnot, Alyson)
December 22, 2023 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Chicago Intermodal Transportation Inc., Alejandro Basulto de la Cruz by Direct Chassislink, Inc..(McGovern, Timothy)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiff's Complaint. Alejandro Basulto de la Cruz answer due 1/18/2024. Approved by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/21/2023. No pdf attached.(cp)
December 20, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly V Milam on behalf of Alejandro Basulto de la Cruz (Milam, Kelly)
December 20, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Alejandro Basulto de la Cruz. (Fosnot, Alyson)
December 20, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyson M Fosnot on behalf of Alejandro Basulto de la Cruz (Fosnot, Alyson)
December 18, 2023 Set/Reset Deadlines: Per DE #8 , answer due 12/21/2023 for defendant Alejandro Basulto De La Cruz. (nae)
December 15, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Alejandro Basulto De La Cruz on 11/30/2023, filed by Summer Fields. (LaTulip, Matthew)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The docket is unclear whether service of summons has been achieved on Defendant Alejandro Basulto de la Cruz. Accordingly, on or before 12/29/2023, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to either file proof/return of summons of the Complaint as to this defendant, OR, file proposed summons on this Court docket for clerk to issue. Text order entry. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/12/2023. (smb)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/12/2023. (smb)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly V Milam on behalf of Chicago Intermodal Transportation Inc. (Milam, Kelly)
December 1, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyson M Fosnot on behalf of Chicago Intermodal Transportation Inc. (Fosnot, Alyson)
November 29, 2023 Senior Judge James T Moody and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. **NEW CASE** (mrm)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S McGovern on behalf of Direct Chassislink, Inc. (McGovern, Timothy)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5425372.) from Porter County, Indiana, Cause No. 64D02-2310-CT-009505, filed by Direct Chassislink, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(McGovern, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fields v. de la Cruz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summer Fields
Represented By: Matthew D LaTulip
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alejandro Basulto de la Cruz
Represented By: Alyson M Fosnot
Represented By: Kelly V Milam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Intermodal Transportation Inc.
Represented By: Alyson M Fosnot
Represented By: Kelly V Milam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Direct Chassislink, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy S McGovern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?