Indiana State Council of Carpenters Pension Fund et al v. United Flooring, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Indiana State Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund and Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters
Defendant: United Flooring, Inc., Jack Laurie Floors, LLC doing business as Jack Laurie Group and Jack Laurie Floors, LLC doing business as Jack Laurie Group, an Indiana Limited Liability Company
Case Number: 2:2023cv00430
Filed: December 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Upon review of the report #17 , the Court ORDERS Rule 26(a)(1) initial exchanges must be completed, but not filed with the Court, by 2/29/2024; The parties' deadline to seek leave to amend the pleadings is 1/3/2025; The deadline to complete all fact and expert discovery is 1/31/2025; Plaintiffs' expert witness disclosures and reports are to be provided to Defendants by 12/15/2024; Defendants' expert witness disclosures and reports are to be provided to Plaintiffs by 12/29/2024; Rule 26(e) supplements are due by 1/17/2025; The deadline for the parties to select a mediator is 2/29/2024, and mediation must be completed and a report filed by 1/31/2025; and The deadline for parties to review and return either the consent to or the declination of the exercise of jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge is extended to 2/23/2024. The Court VACATES the Preliminary Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for February 8, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 2/2/24. (nhc)
February 1, 2024 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Blumthal, William)
January 29, 2024 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Jack Laurie Floors, LLC, United Flooring, Inc..(Vance, Aaron)
January 10, 2024 Filing 15 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (smb)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER & NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2024 10:30 AM Central before Magistrate Judge John E Martin. Proposed joint discovery plan in accordance with FRCP 26(f) due 2/2/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/10/2024. (smb)
January 8, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Y Decker on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Decker, Adam)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/3/2024. (smb)
December 27, 2023 Set Deadline per #9 Notice of Automatic Extension. Defendants United Flooring Inc., and Jack Laurie Floors, LLC Answers due by 1/29/2024. (ash)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER" Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 12/22/2023. (smb)
December 21, 2023 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jack Laurie Floors, LLC, United Flooring, Inc.. (Vance, Aaron)
December 21, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE by Jack Laurie Floors, LLC, United Flooring, Inc. re #1 Complaint,, Notification of Automatic Extension of Time to Answer (Vance, Aaron)
December 21, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Vance on behalf of Jack Laurie Floors, LLC, United Flooring, Inc. (Vance, Aaron)
December 11, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Indiana State Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund. Jack Laurie Floors, LLC served on 12/11/2023, answer due 1/2/2024. (Blumthal, William)
December 11, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Indiana State Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund. United Flooring, Inc. served on 12/11/2023, answer due 1/2/2024. (Blumthal, William)
December 7, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Jack Laurie Floors, LLC and United Flooring, Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nal)
December 7, 2023 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. NEW CASE. (nal)
December 6, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E Mallon on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Mallon, Joseph)
December 6, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Indiana State Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund. (Blumthal, William)
December 6, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William M Blumthal, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Blumthal, William)
December 6, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jack Laurie Floors, LLC, United Flooring, Inc.( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5431065.), filed by Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Indiana State Council of Carpenters Pension Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund, Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2009 MOA, #2 Exhibit 2021 MOA, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons)(Blumthal, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Indiana State Council of Carpenters Pension Fund et al v. United Flooring, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana State Council of Carpenters Pension Fund
Represented By: Joseph E Mallon
Represented By: William M Blumthal, Jr
Represented By: Adam Y Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Pension Fund
Represented By: Joseph E Mallon
Represented By: William M Blumthal, Jr
Represented By: Adam Y Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Defined Contribution Pension Fund
Represented By: Joseph E Mallon
Represented By: William M Blumthal, Jr
Represented By: Adam Y Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Welfare Fund
Represented By: Joseph E Mallon
Represented By: William M Blumthal, Jr
Represented By: Adam Y Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters Joint Apprenticeship and Training Fund
Represented By: Joseph E Mallon
Represented By: William M Blumthal, Jr
Represented By: Adam Y Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana/Kentucky/Ohio Regional Council of Carpenters
Represented By: Joseph E Mallon
Represented By: William M Blumthal, Jr
Represented By: Adam Y Decker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Flooring, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Laurie Floors, LLC doing business as Jack Laurie Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Laurie Floors, LLC doing business as Jack Laurie Group, an Indiana Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Aaron Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?