Williams v. Noble Home Health Care, LLC
Plaintiff: Lynnette Williams
Defendant: Noble Home Health Care, LLC
Case Number: 2:2023cv00439
Filed: December 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2024 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Noble Home Health Care, LLC. (Carroll, Jeffrey)
January 30, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE: Noble Home Health Care, LLC, Lynnette Williams was directed to return the Consent to or Declination of the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge attached at Docket Entry #7 regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Clerk's Office has not received the form. Noble Home Health Care, LLC, Lynnette Williams shall return the form within 10 days of the date of this entry. If, after the expiration of the 10-day extension set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Counsel also advised of 10-day consent deadline by phone (jdb)
January 25, 2024 Filing 8 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lynnette Williams. (Thompson, Tomas)
January 4, 2024 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. Magistrate Consent forms due by 1/25/2024. (smb)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 1/4/2024. (smb)
January 4, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Noble Home Health Care, LLC. (Carroll, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey R Carroll on behalf of Noble Home Health Care, LLC (Carroll, Jeffrey)
December 19, 2023 Set Deadlines: Noble Home Health Care, LLC Answer due 1/4/2024 pursuant to DE #3 . (kmt)
December 18, 2023 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Noble Home Health Care, LLC on December 14, 2023, filed by Lynnette Williams. (Thompson, Tomas)
December 11, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Noble Home Health Care, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jdb)
December 11, 2023 ***NEW CASE*** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. (jdb)
December 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Noble Home Health Care, LLC( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5433796.), filed by Lynnette Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Summons for issuance)(Thompson, Tomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Noble Home Health Care, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynnette Williams
Represented By: Tomas M Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Home Health Care, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey R Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?