White v. Smith et al
Defendant: Larry Lee Smith, Jr., Transco, Inc., and/or McClane MFS Fleet, Inc and McLane Foodservice Inc
Counter Defendant: Marques White
Case Number: 2:2024cv00004
Filed: January 4, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: John E Martin
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER:Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 2/7/2024. (smb)
February 2, 2024 Filing 14 PLAINTIFF'S ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiff's Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Defendant's McClane Foodservice Inc., Counterclaim against the Minor Surviving Children of the Estate of Marques White, Deceased by Marques White.(Alvarado, Brock)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re #9 Stipulation: The court ORDERS that McLane Foodservices, Inc. is substituted as the proper Defendant for Transco, Inc. and McClane MFS, Fleet, Inc. for all intents and purposes, including all allegations contained in Plaintiff's Complaint, ORDERS that McLane Foodservices, Inc. and Larry Lee Smith, Jr. shall be the parties to file their responsive pleading. Plaintiffs claims against Transco, Inc. and McClane MFS Fleet, Inc., are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, ORDERS that Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Transco, Inc. and McClane MFS, Fleet, Inc. and McLane Foodservice, Inc., for duty to use reasonable care in the hiring, training, supervision, and retention of those entrusted to operate the tractor-trailer contained in paragraph 17 in Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages, are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Said dismissal without prejudice regarding the allegations contained in paragraph 17 in Plaintiff's Complaint for Damages also apply to McLane Foodservice, Inc, ORDERS that the remaining paragraphs and claims of Plaintiff's lawsuit against Defendant Larry Lee Smith, Jr., shall remain pending and ORDERS that the parties shall amend the case caption in any future filings as listed in the Order. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 2/1/24. (nal)
February 1, 2024 Filing 12 STATEMENT , Jurisdictional. by Defendants. (Pfleging, Lesley) Modified on 2/1/2024 to add text (rmf).
February 1, 2024 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by McLane Foodservice Inc identifying Corporate Parent McLane Company, Inc. for McLane Foodservice Inc, McLane Foodservice Inc.. (Pfleging, Lesley)
February 1, 2024 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Marques White by McLane Foodservice Inc.(Pfleging, Lesley)
January 30, 2024 Filing 9 Joint STIPULATION of Partial Dismissal and Substitution of Proper Party by Defendants Larry Lee Smith, Jr, Transco, Inc., and/or McClane MFS Fleet, Inc. (Pfleging, Lesley)
January 10, 2024 Filing 8 STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED. (rmf)
January 5, 2024 Set Deadlines per #6 Larry Lee Smith, Jr, Transco, Inc., and/or McClane MFS Fleet, Inc answer due by 2/1/24. (nal)
January 5, 2024 Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge John E Martin added. NEW CASE. (nal)
January 4, 2024 Filing 6 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Larry Lee Smith, Jr, Transco, Inc., and/or McClane MFS Fleet, Inc ; answer due by 2/1/2024. (Pfleging, Lesley)
January 4, 2024 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Larry Lee Smith, Jr, Transco, Inc., and/or McClane MFS Fleet, Inc identifying Corporate Parent McLane Company, Inc. for Transco, Inc., and/or McClane MFS Fleet, Inc.. (Pfleging, Lesley)
January 4, 2024 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Larry Lee Smith, Jr, Transco, Inc., and/or McClane MFS Fleet, Inc. (Pfleging, Lesley)
January 4, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lesley A Pfleging on behalf of All Defendants (Pfleging, Lesley)
January 4, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Asia L Ellis on behalf of All Defendants (Ellis, Asia)
January 4, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number CINNDC-5452641.) from Lake County Superior Court, Cause No. 45D01-2311-CT-001345, filed by Transco, Inc., and/or McClane MFS Fleet, Inc, Larry Lee Smith, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit (Complaint, Apperance, Summons Def Smith, Summons Def Transco, Summons Def McClane, Apperance, MET, Jury Demand, Order Granting MET, Initial Case Management Order))(Pfleging, Lesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Marques White
Represented By: Brock P Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Lee Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Asia L Ellis
Represented By: Lesley A Pfleging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transco, Inc., and/or McClane MFS Fleet, Inc
Represented By: Lesley A Pfleging
Represented By: Asia L Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLane Foodservice Inc
Represented By: Lesley A Pfleging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?