Maitner et al v. WT Transportation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER MAITNER and JOSEPHINE BERAULT
Defendant: WT TRANSPORTATION, INC., JIAMING WANG and Jaiming Wang
Other: Richard McDevitt
Case Number: 2:2024cv00022
Filed: January 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Rodovich
Referring Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2024 Filing 15 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/23/2024 before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Pla appeared by attys David McCracken, Joseph Jaskowiak. Dfts appeared by atty James Culp. The Report filed as #14 is APPROVED. Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 3/22/2024. Discovery deadline is 3/10/2025. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 11/22/2024. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 12/23/2024. Expert Discovery deadline is 2/12/2025. The last date the parties may seek permission to join additional parties and to amend the pleadings is 06/28/2024. Magistrate Consent forms due by 3/15/2024. Richard McDevitt appointed as mediator. Results of the mediation shall be filed with the court no later than 10 days before the final pretrial conference. All other dates/dds to be set by presiding judge at a later time. (jdb)
February 16, 2024 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Culp, James)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Mark E McNabola PHV for Josephine Berault and Christopher Maitner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 2/13/2024. (ace)
February 12, 2024 Filing 12 Application for Attorney Mark Edward McNabola to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher Maitner and Josephine Berault. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5489293 (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(McNabola, Mark)
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David C McCracken PHV for Josephine Berault and Christopher Maitner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 2/9/2024. (ace)
February 8, 2024 Filing 10 Application for Attorney David Coleman McCracken to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Christopher Maitner and Josephine Berault. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5486272 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(McCracken, David)
February 6, 2024 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (tc)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/23/2024 09:30 AM Central time before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Parties are instructed to dial 833-568-8864, enter Meeting ID 161 6723 3388 and passcode 649671 when prompted to join the conference. A proposed Discovery Plan under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) to be filed no later than five (5) business days prior to the pretrial conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 2/6/2024. (tc) (tc).
February 5, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint , Affirmative Defenses and Demand for Trial by Jury by WT Transportation, Inc., Jaiming Wang.(Culp, James)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 1/17/2024. (tc)
January 16, 2024 **NEW CASE** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich added. (kmt)
January 12, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JIAMING WANG, WT TRANSPORTATION, INC.. (Culp, James)
January 12, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James L Culp on behalf of JIAMING WANG, WT TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Culp, James)
January 12, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R Whitten on behalf of JIAMING WANG, WT TRANSPORTATION, INC. (Whitten, Christopher)
January 12, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AINNDC-5461421.) from Porter Superior Court 5, Cause No. 64D05-2312-CT-011216, filed by JIAMING WANG, WT TRANSPORTATION, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record (Complaint for Damages, Appearance of F. Joseph Jaskowiak for Plaintiffs, Summons to WT Transportation, Inc., Summons to Jiaming Wang, Proof of Service on WT Transportation, Inc., Amended Summons to Jiaming Wang, Appearance of Christopher R. Whitten and James L. Culp for Defendant WT Transportation, Inc., Defendants Motion for Enlargement of Time, Order Granting Defendant WT Transportation, Inc.s Motion for Enlargement of Time, Appearance of Christopher R. Whitten and James L. Culp for Defendant Jiaming Wang, Motion for Enlargement of Time for Defendant Jiaming Wang, Affidavit of Service by Secretary of State, and Order Granting Motion for Enlargement of Time for Defendant Jiaming Wang), #2 Exhibit B-Plaintiffs' Complaint, #3 Exhibit C-State Court Docket, #4 Civil Cover Sheet D Civil Cover Sheet)(Culp, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maitner et al v. WT Transportation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER MAITNER
Represented By: David C McCracken PHV
Represented By: F Joseph Jaskowiak
Represented By: Mark E McNabola PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPHINE BERAULT
Represented By: F Joseph Jaskowiak
Represented By: Mark E McNabola PHV
Represented By: David C McCracken PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WT TRANSPORTATION, INC.
Represented By: Christopher R Whitten
Represented By: James L Culp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JIAMING WANG
Represented By: Christopher R Whitten
Represented By: James L Culp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaiming Wang
Represented By: Christopher R Whitten
Represented By: James L Culp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Other: Richard McDevitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?