March 4, 2024 |
Filing 65
NOTICE: Corey Joseph A. Shaw was directed to return the Consent to or Declination of the Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge attached at Docket Entry #64 regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Clerk's Office has not received the form. Corey Joseph A. Shaw shall return the form within 10 days of the date of this entry. If, after the expiration of the 10-day extension set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Counsel also advised of 10-day consent deadline by email. (nhc)
|
February 5, 2024 |
Filing 64
MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (Copy mailed to atty Redmond). Magistrate Consent forms due by 2/26/2024. (tc)
|
February 2, 2024 |
Filing 63
MEMORANDUM in Support of #62 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jacob Otto, Erin Stokes. (Jimenez, Gustavo)
|
February 2, 2024 |
Filing 62
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Jacob Otto, Erin Stokes. (Jimenez, Gustavo)
|
January 22, 2024 |
Filing 61
MINUTE ORDER: Each party and each attorney in this case shall take reasonable steps to preserve electronically stored information (ESI) that is relevant to any claim or defense in this case, whether or not the information is admissible at trial. This requirement relates back to the point in time when the party or attorney reasonably anticipated litigation about these matters. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 1/22/2024. cc: Lawrence Craig Redmond (tc)
|
January 19, 2024 |
Filing 60
Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:22-cv-00439. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
|
January 18, 2024 |
Filing 59
TRANSFERRED to the USDC Northern District of Indiana the electronic record. (rc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
January 12, 2024 |
Filing 58
MOTION by Plaintiff Corey Joseph A. Shaw for default judgment as to Lake County Sheriff and Officer Medrano (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Redmond, Lawrence) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
December 28, 2023 |
Filing 57
ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/28/2023: Mailed notice. (tg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
November 30, 2023 |
Filing 56
MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: In accordance with the Court's 11/14/23 memorandum opinion and order #53 , the Clerk of Court is directed to transfer the severed claims against Defendant Probation Officers Jacob Otto and Erin Stokes, Counts I-XII, to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631, forthwith. Emailed notice. (cdh, ) Modified on 11/30/2023 (cdh, ). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
November 30, 2023 |
Filing 55
MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: Telephonic status hearing held. Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant Lake County Probation Officers appeared. As discussed on the record, Plaintiff is granted leave to pursue limited discovery as to the identity of the unknown employees of the Cook County Sheriff's Department and/or Cook County Department of Corrections, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d)(1). The deadline for Plaintiff to file any motion for default as to Defendant Lake County Sheriff and Officers is 1/12/24. Emailed notice. (cdh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
November 14, 2023 |
Filing 54
MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: A telephonic status hearing is set for 11/30/23 at 10:00 AM. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: 877-336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media may call in to listen to the hearing. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting court proceedings. Emailed notice. (cdh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
November 14, 2023 |
Filing 53
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER Signed by the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt on 11/14/23. Emailed notice. (cdh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
July 12, 2023 |
Filing 52
MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendants' Reply Brief #51 is denied. FRCP 12(f) allows the Court to strike material that is "an insufficient defense, or any redundant, immaterial, impertinent, or scandalous matter." Plaintiff has made no such argument in his motion. While it is true that arguments raised for the first time in a reply brief are waived, the Court can reach that finding on its own when ruling on the motion to dismiss. See, e.g., Connelly v. Cook County Assessor's Office, 583 F. Supp. 3d 1142, 1145 n.1 (N.D. Ill. 2022) (citing White v. United States, 8 F.4th 547, 552 (7th Cir. 2021)) ("[A]rguments made for the first time in reply briefs are waived"). It is not a valid reason to strike the reply brief. Emailed notice. (cdh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
July 10, 2023 |
Filing 51
MOTION by Plaintiff Corey Joseph A. Shaw to strike response in support of motion, #50 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Redmond, Lawrence) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
July 6, 2023 |
Filing 50
REPLY by Jacob Otto, Erin Stokesin Support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Jacob Otto, Erin Stokes Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction #38 (Jimenez, Gustavo) Modified on 7/6/2023 (jn, ). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
July 6, 2023 |
Filing 49
MINUTE entry before the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt: This case has been reassigned to the calendar of Judge Hunt. The Court has reviewed the pending motions. Defendants' motion for leave to file a reply in support of their motion to dismiss #42 is granted. They are ordered to file their reply as a separate entry on the docket within 7 days. Defendants' motions to dismiss [37, 38] are fully briefed and taken under advisement, along with Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery from Dart #39 . The Court will rule by mail. Discovery will remain stayed until further court order. Emailed notice. (cdh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
June 29, 2023 |
Filing 48
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tom Dart by Johnnetta Michelle Byers (Byers, Johnnetta) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
June 29, 2023 |
Filing 47
WITHDRAWING Alexandrya Black as counsel for Defendant Tom Dart and substituting Johnnetta Michelle Byers as counsel of record (Byers, Johnnetta) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
June 2, 2023 |
Filing 46
EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 23-0023: IT APPEARING THAT, the civil cases on the attached list have been selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable LaShonda A Hunt; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 282 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Lashonda A Hunt; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable LaShonda A Hunt's webpage on the Court's website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order will not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable LaShonda A Hunt to the Court's civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Lashonda A Hunt to the Court's criminal case assignment system ninety (90) days so that Judge Hunt shall thereafter receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable LaShonda A. Hunt for all further proceedings. Honorable Andrea R. Wood no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 6/02/2023.(tg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
March 14, 2023 |
Filing 45
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corey Joseph A. Shaw as to Oscar Martinez on 2/21/2023, answer due 3/14/2023; Nick Medrano on 2/21/2023, answer due 3/14/2023; Brandon Tomko on 2/21/2023, answer due 3/14/2023. (Attachments: #1 Oscar Martinez - USM285, #2 Nick Medrano - USM285)(rc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
February 28, 2023 |
Filing 44
STATUS Report - Joint by Jacob Otto, Erin Stokes (Jimenez, Gustavo) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
February 14, 2023 |
Filing 43
REPLY by Tom Dart to response in opposition to motion #41 (Black, Alexandrya) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
February 13, 2023 |
Filing 42
MOTION by Defendants Jacob Otto, Erin Stokes for leave to file Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment 1 - Defendants Erin Stokes and Jacob Otto's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint)(Jimenez, Gustavo) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
January 31, 2023 |
Filing 41
RESPONSE by Corey Joseph A. Shawin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Tom Dart to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #37 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Redmond, Lawrence) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
January 29, 2023 |
Filing 40
RESPONSE by Corey Joseph A. Shawin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Jacob Otto, Erin Stokes Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction #38 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Redmond, Lawrence) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
January 27, 2023 |
SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Oscar Martinez, Nick Medrano, Brandon Tomko (lm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
January 20, 2023 |
Filing 39
MOTION by Plaintiff Corey Joseph A. Shaw to compel discovery from Dart (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Redmond, Lawrence) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
January 10, 2023 |
Filing 38
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Jacob Otto, Erin Stokes Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Jimenez, Gustavo) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
January 10, 2023 |
Filing 37
MOTION by Defendant Tom Dart to dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (Black, Alexandrya) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
December 29, 2022 |
Filing 36
ANNUAL REMINDER: Pursuant to #Local Rule 3.2 (Notification of Affiliates)#, any nongovernmental party, other than an individual or sole proprietorship, must file a statement identifying all its affiliates known to the party after diligent review or, if the party has identified no affiliates, then a statement reflecting that fact must be filed. An affiliate is defined as follows: any entity or individual owning, directly or indirectly (through ownership of one or more other entities), 5% or more of a party. The statement is to be electronically filed as a PDF in conjunction with entering the affiliates in CM/ECF as prompted. As a reminder to counsel, parties must supplement their statements of affiliates within thirty (30) days of any change in the information previously reported. This minute order is being issued to all counsel of record to remind counsel of their obligation to provide updated information as to additional affiliates if such updating is necessary. If counsel has any questions regarding this process, this #LINK# will provide additional information. Signed by the Executive Committee on 12/29/2022: Mailed notice. (tg, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
December 20, 2022 |
Filing 35
AMENDED COMPLAINT by Corey Joseph A. Shaw against All Defendants. (rc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.] Modified on 1/19/2024 (shk).
|
December 20, 2022 |
Filing 34
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic status hearing held on 12/20/2022. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff's motion to file his first amended complaint #27 is granted. The Clerk is directed to separately docket the first amended complaint at docket entry [27-2]. Defendants' previously filed motions to dismiss #13 , #14 are terminated as moot. Consistent with the agreement on the record, the parties will adopt their existing briefing in support of Probation Officer Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss the first amended complaint. Defendants' motion to dismiss the first amended complaint and any supplement necessitated by the amendment to the complaint, as discussed on the record, shall be filed by 1/10/2023. Plaintiff shall respond to any supplement by 1/31/2023. Defendant Sheriff Dart shall also answer or file any motion to dismiss the first amended complaint by 1/10/2023; Plaintiff shall respond by 1/31/2023; and Defendant Sheriff Dart shall reply by 2/14/2023. Discovery remains stayed until further order of the Court. By 2/28/2023, the parties shall file a joint status report setting forth: (1) the status of service for any remaining defendant who has not appeared, (2) the parties' current views regarding prospects for settlement, and (3) whether the parties require a telephonic status hearing and, if so, what matters they feel it would be helpful to discuss with the Court. Mailed notice (lma, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
December 5, 2022 |
Filing 33
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic status hearing set for 12/6/222 is stricken and reset for 12/20/2022 at 9:15 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (lma, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
November 7, 2022 |
Filing 32
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic status hearing set for 11/8/222 is stricken and reset for 12/6/2022 at 10:45 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (exr, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
October 5, 2022 |
Filing 31
REPLY by Corey Joseph A. Shaw to response in opposition to motion #29 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Redmond, Lawrence) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
September 7, 2022 |
Filing 30
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic status hearing held on 9/7/2022. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiff shall file a reply in support of his motion for leave to amend the complaint by 10/5/2022. A written ruling to be issued based on the written record. Telephonic status hearing set for 11/8/2022 at 9:15 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (lma, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
August 26, 2022 |
Filing 29
RESPONSE by Tom Dart, Jacob Otto, Erin Stokesin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Corey Joseph A. Shaw to amend/correct complaint #1 #27 (Joint) (Jimenez, Gustavo) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
August 12, 2022 |
Filing 28
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's motion to file his first amended complaint #27 by 8/26/2022. Motion to withdraw Rachel D. Wilson as counsel of record #26 is granted. Attorney Wilson is terminated as counsel of record in this matter. Telephonic status hearing set for 9/7/2022 #22 remains firm. Mailed notice (lma, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
August 11, 2022 |
Filing 27
MOTION by Plaintiff Corey Joseph A. Shaw to amend/correct complaint #1 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit)(Redmond, Lawrence) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
August 3, 2022 |
Filing 26
MOTION by Attorney Rachael Denae Wilson to withdraw as attorney for Tom Dart. No party information provided (Wilson, Rachael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
July 27, 2022 |
Filing 25
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tom Dart by Alexandrya Black (Black, Alexandrya) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
July 12, 2022 |
Filing 24
REPLY by Jacob Otto, Erin Stokes to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Jacob Otto, Erin Stokes Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction #14 (Jimenez, Gustavo) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
July 12, 2022 |
Filing 23
REPLY by Tom Dart to response in opposition to motion #19 , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Tom Dart #13 (Wilson, Rachael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
July 6, 2022 |
Filing 22
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Having reviewed Joint Defendants' Status Report #21 (which identifies no issues for discussion at a status hearing) and in light of the modification to the briefing schedule for Defendants' motion to dismiss, the telephonic status hearing set for 7/7/2022 is stricken and reset for 9/7/2022 at 9:30 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (aw,) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
June 30, 2022 |
Filing 21
STATUS Report Defendants' Joint Status Report by Tom Dart, Jacob Otto, Erin Stokes (Jimenez, Gustavo) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
June 21, 2022 |
Filing 20
RESPONSE by Corey Joseph A. Shawin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Jacob Otto, Erin Stokes Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction #14 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Redmond, Lawrence) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
June 18, 2022 |
Filing 19
RESPONSE by Corey Joseph A. Shawin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Tom Dart #13 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Redmond, Lawrence) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
June 9, 2022 |
Filing 18
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Defendants having confirmed by email that there is no objection to Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to respond to motions to dismiss #17 , the Court grants the motion. The Court extends the briefing schedule for Defendants' motions to dismiss as follows. Plaintiff shall file responses to the motions to dismiss #13 , #14 by 6/21/2022. Defendants shall file replies by 7/12/2022. The Court reminds Plaintiff's counsel that, pursuant to Judge Wood's case management procedures, any motion for an extension of time must indicate whether any other party objects to the extension. Mailed notice (dal, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
June 7, 2022 |
Filing 17
MOTION by Plaintiff Corey Joseph A. Shaw for extension of time to file response/reply as to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #13 , Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim #14 (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Redmond, Lawrence) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
May 27, 2022 |
Filing 16
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Corey Joseph A. Shaw as to Jacob Otto on 5/27/2022, answer due 6/17/2022; Erin Stokes on 5/27/2022, answer due 6/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 USM-285 Form - Erin Stokes)(rc, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
April 21, 2022 |
Filing 15
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic status hearing held on 4/21/2022. The Court sets the following briefing schedule for Defendants' motions to dismiss #13 , #14 . Plaintiff shall respond to the motions by 6/7/2022. Defendants shall reply by 6/28/2022. Discovery is stayed, with the caveat that discovery for the limited purpose of identifying and locating any unnamed defendants may proceed. By 6/30/2022, the parties shall file a joint status report setting forth any progress that has been made toward identifying the unidentified defendants and any issues the parties believe require a status hearing prior to 7/7/2022. Telephonic status hearing set for 7/7/2022 at 9:00 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (dal, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
April 18, 2022 |
Filing 14
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Jacob Otto, Erin Stokes Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Jimenez, Gustavo) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
April 11, 2022 |
Filing 13
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Tom Dart (Wilson, Rachael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
March 29, 2022 |
Filing 12
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: At the emailed request of the parties, the telephonic status hearing set for 4/21/2022 is reset for 4/21/2022 at 9:15 AM. (TIME CHANGE ONLY). Mailed notice (dal, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
March 29, 2022 |
Filing 11
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Telephonic status hearing set for 3/31/2022 is stricken and reset for 4/21/2022 at 9:45 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice (dal, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
March 23, 2022 |
Filing 10
STATUS Report Joint Initial by Corey Joseph A. Shaw (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Redmond, Lawrence) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
March 23, 2022 |
Filing 9
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Tom Dart by Rachael Denae Wilson (Wilson, Rachael) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
March 15, 2022 |
Filing 8
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Erin Stokes. Erin Stokes waiver sent on 2/16/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. (Jimenez, Gustavo) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
March 15, 2022 |
Filing 7
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Jacob Otto. Jacob Otto waiver sent on 2/16/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. (Jimenez, Gustavo) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
March 15, 2022 |
Filing 6
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Jacob Otto, Erin Stokes by Gustavo Angel Jimenez (Jimenez, Gustavo) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
February 8, 2022 |
Filing 5
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by U.S. Marshal as to Tom Dart waiver sent on 2/8/2022, answer due 4/11/2022. (kl, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
January 31, 2022 |
SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Tom Dart, Jacob Otto, Erin Stokes. Forwarded to U.S. Marshal via email. (kl, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
January 31, 2022 |
Filing 4
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Andrea R. Wood: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. The Court finds that Plaintiff is unable to pay the fees associated with filing this action and thus the filing fee is waived. The U.S. Marshal is appointed to serve Defendants. The Clerk is directed to issue summonses for service on Defendants by the U.S. Marshal. The Marshals Service shall communicate with Plaintiff's counsel of record regarding effecting service. The Court advises Plaintiff's counsel that a completed USM-285 form is required for service on each Defendant. Alternatively, Plaintiff's counsel may elect to serve Defendants or request waivers of service on his own. Telephonic status hearing set for 3/31/2022 at 9:00 AM. To ensure public access to court proceedings, members of the public and media may call in to listen to telephonic hearings. The call-in number is (888) 557-8511 and the access code is 3547847. Counsel of record will receive an email 30 minutes prior to the start of the telephonic hearing with instructions to join the call. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. The parties are directed to meet and conduct a planning conference pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). At least seven days before the initial status hearing, the parties shall file a joint written status report, not to exceed five pages in length. The initial status report shall provide the information described on the Court's website at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under District Judges, Judge Andrea R. Wood, Initial Status Conference. Mailed notice (dal, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
January 29, 2022 |
Filing 3
APPLICATION by Plaintiff Corey Shaw for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Redmond, Lawrence) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
January 28, 2022 |
Filing 2
CIVIL Cover Sheet (Redmond, Lawrence) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
January 28, 2022 |
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Andrea R. Wood. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|
January 28, 2022 |
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached
|
January 25, 2022 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT filed by Corey Shaw; Jury Demand. (Redmond, Lawrence) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 1/19/2024.]
|