Garrett v. Bristol Town of et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Liza Garrett
Defendant: Bristol Town of, Bristol-Washington Township Public Library and Michael W Albin
Mediator: Lewis C Laderer Jr
Case Number: 3:2007cv00180
Filed: April 18, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: South Bend Office
County: Elkhart
Presiding Judge: Robert L Miller Jr
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Nuechterlein
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2008 CASE DISMISSED pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (kds)
July 14, 2008 Filing 31 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice, Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss by Defendants Bristol Town of, Michael W Albin. (Gardner, Martin)
June 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: Based upon notificaton by Mediator that parties have reached settlement the court VACATES deadlines previously set. ( Dismissal Papers due by 7/30/2008.). Signed by Judge Robert L Miller Jr on 6/30/08. (sdf)
June 25, 2008 Filing 29 MOTION to Withdraw 23 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Answer Interrogatories by Defendant Bristol-Washington Township Public Library. (Byron, James)
June 25, 2008 Filing 28 REPORT of Mediation by Lewis C Laderer, Jr.(Laderer, Lewis)
June 20, 2008 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re 23 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Answer Interrogatories filed by Bristol-Washington Township Public Library. (Byron, James)
June 17, 2008 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re 23 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Answer Interrogatories filed by Liza Garrett. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Answers to Bristol-Washington Township Public Librarys First Interrogatories to Plaintiff, Liza Garrett, # 2 Plaintiff's Answer to Bristol-Washington Township Public Librarys Continuing Interrogatories to Plaintiff, Liza Garrett)(Jones, Andrew)
May 30, 2008 Filing 25 STATEMENT Certification of Good Faith Efforts to Obtain Discoverable Information. (Byron, James)
May 30, 2008 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support of 23 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Answer Interrogatories filed by Bristol-Washington Township Public Library. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Byron, James)
May 30, 2008 Filing 23 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff to Answer Interrogatories by Defendant Bristol-Washington Township Public Library. (Byron, James)
October 16, 2007 Filing 22 NOTICE of Change of Address by Philip J Gibbons, Jr (Gibbons, Philip)
September 4, 2007 Filing 21 Amended ANSWER to 14 Answer to Complaint of Plaintiff by Bristol-Washington Township Public Library.(Byron, James) Modified on 9/5/2007 to add link (smp).
August 16, 2007 Filing 20 RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/16/2007. before Judge Christopher A Nuechterlein. Pla appeared by atty Andrew G Jones. Dft appeared by atty Martin J Gardner and James Byron. Lewis Laderer appointed as mediator. Results of the mediation shall be filed with the court no later than 10 days before the final pretrial conference Any amendments to the pleadings to be filed by 9/18/2007.Discovery deadline is 8/1/2008.Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 4/30/2008.Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 5/30/2008.Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 9/18/2007.Dispositive motions to be filed by 9/3/2008,Daubert motions to be filed by 9/3/2008, (slm)
July 23, 2007 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Sampson, Dinah)
June 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically for the 8/16/07 Preliminary Pretrial Conference. All parties to appear telephonically. Signed by Judge Christopher A Nuechterlein on 6/2107. (sdf)
June 20, 2007 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically by Plaintiff Liza Garrett. (Jones, Andrew)
June 19, 2007 Filing 16 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track). (sdf)
June 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER:Parties Proposed Discovery Plan due by 7/23/2007.,Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2007 04:00 PM in South Bend before Magistrate Judge Christopher A Nuechterlein.. Signed by Judge Christopher A Nuechterlein on 6/18/07. (sdf)
June 13, 2007 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint by Bristol Town of, Michael W Albin.(Gardner, Martin)
May 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Bristol-Washington Township Public Library answer due 6/18/2007.. Signed by Judge Christopher A Nuechterlein on 5/17/07. (sdf)
May 16, 2007 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint (and Affirmative Defenses) by Bristol-Washington Township Public Library.(Byron, James)
May 11, 2007 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant Bristol-Washington Township Public Library. (Byron, James)
May 9, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Bristol Town of answer due 6/18/2007.. Signed by Judge Christopher A Nuechterlein on 5/9/07. (sdf)
May 9, 2007 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bristol Town of. Bristol Town of served on 4/26/2007, answer due 5/16/2007. (Gibbons, Philip)
May 9, 2007 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liza Garrett. Bristol-Washington Township Public Library served on 4/26/2007, answer due 5/16/2007. (Gibbons, Philip)
May 9, 2007 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Liza Garrett. Michael W Albin served on 4/26/2007, answer due 5/16/2007. (Gibbons, Philip)
May 9, 2007 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Dinah H Sampson on behalf of Bristol Town of (Sampson, Dinah)
May 9, 2007 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Bristol Town of. (Gardner, Martin)
May 9, 2007 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin J Gardner on behalf of Bristol Town of (Gardner, Martin)
May 8, 2007 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James R Byron on behalf of Bristol-Washington Township Public Library (Byron, James)
April 19, 2007 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Bristol Town of, Bristol-Washington Township Public Library, Michael W Albin. (kds)
April 18, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Bristol Town of, Bristol-Washington Township Public Library, Michael W Albin (Filing fee $ 350.) Receipt #3336005, filed by Liza Garrett. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett v. Bristol Town of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liza Garrett
Represented By: Andrew G Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol Town of
Represented By: Dinah H Sampson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bristol-Washington Township Public Library
Represented By: James R Byron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael W Albin
Represented By: Martin J Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Lewis C Laderer Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?