Gumwood HP Shopping Partners LP v. Simon Property Group Inc
Plaintiff: |
Gumwood HP Shopping Partners LP |
Defendant: |
Simon Property Group Inc |
Case Number: |
3:2011cv00268 |
Filed: |
June 29, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana |
Office: |
South Bend Office |
County: |
St. Joseph |
Presiding Judge: |
Jon E DeGuilio |
Presiding Judge: |
Christopher A Nuechterlein |
Nature of Suit: |
Antitrust |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. ยง 1 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 17, 2017 |
Filing
320
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 309 MOTION in Limine on Damages by Plaintiff Gumwood HP Shopping Partners LP. Plaintiff Gumwood HP Shopping Partners LP may seek the damages outlined in its Motion in Limine for lost revenues f or the period up to December 31, 2010. It may not seek as damages the reduction in market value of Heritage Square as of January 2011. Parties ORDERED to attend another mediation session. Parties ORDERED to file a Status Report by 8/7/2017 identifying their mediation date or requesting a judicial settlement conference. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 7/17/17. (cer)
|
November 22, 2016 |
Filing
279
OPINION AND ORDER: Court GRANTS 192 Motion to exclude the testimony of Dr. Frech as outlined; GRANTS 217 Motions in Limine; and GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART 190 Motion to exclude the testimony of Dr. Meyer as outlined. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 11/22/2016. (tc)
|
October 19, 2016 |
Filing
268
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 190 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Certain Testimony of Simon's Experts by Plaintiff Gumwood HP Shopping Partners LP; GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 192 MOTION to Exclude Testimony of Plaintiff's Designated Expert H.E. Frech III by Defendant Simon Property Group Inc. The Motions REMAIN UNDER ADVISEMENT as to the experts' damages opinions, which the Court will resolve in a separate order.Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 10/19/16. (cer)
|
June 17, 2013 |
Filing
62
OPINION AND ORDER: DENYING 56 MOTION for Reconsideration re 55 Order on Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Simon Property Group Inc; DIRECTI NG the Clerk to lift all restrictions on 55 Court's 3/13/13 Memorandum Opinion and Order; and DISMISSING AS MOOT 58 MOTION to have Court's Memorandum Opinion and Order dated March 13, 2013 (DE 55) Remain Sealed Until the Court Rules on Simon's Motion for Reconsideration (DE 56) re 55 Order on Report and Recommendations, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous filed by Simon Property Group Inc. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 6/17/13. (jld)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?