AM General LLC v. Demmer Corporation
Plaintiff: AM General LLC
Defendant: Demmer Corporation
Case Number: 3:2012cv00333
Filed: June 20, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: South Bend Office
County: St. Joseph
Presiding Judge: William C Lee
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Nuechterlein
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 229 OPINION AND ORDER denying 224 Motion for New Trial and to Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 3/18/2015. (rmc)
October 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 208 OPINION AND ORDER: Court concludes Pla AM General LLC prevails on its breach of contract claim in its entirety and enters judgment in favor of Pla AM General LLC and against Dft Demmer Corporation in the amount of $27,966,498, plus prejudgment i nterest from September 9, 2011 to the date of the judgment, plus attorneys' fees and costs and post-judgment interest. Court further holds that AM General properly withheld excessive payments made to Demmer and need not return them. Counts I and II of Demmer's Counterclaim are dismissed with prejudice and Demmer shall take nothing for its Counterclaim. Parties directed to meet and confer w/in 14 days on the amounts to be added to the judgment for prejudgment interest, costs, and attorn eys' fees. To the extent the parties cannot reach agreement on the amounts to be added to the judgment, AM General is directed to file post-judgment briefing setting out its position on any outstanding disputes within 28 days of the judgment. D emmer to file any objections or response within 14 days of Pla's submission. AM General may reply within 14 days after Demmer's response. AM General's ddls for submissions for Costs and Attorneys' Fees under Fed. R. Civ. P. 54 are extended as set forth herein pursuant to N.D. Ind. L.R. 54-1. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 10/6/2014. (lns)
September 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 74 OPINION AND ORDER: DENYING 50 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 9/23/13. (jld)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AM General LLC v. Demmer Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AM General LLC
Represented By: John A Drake
Represented By: John David LaDue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Demmer Corporation
Represented By: Michael R Limrick
Represented By: Wayne C Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?