Shah et al v. Rodino et al

Plaintiff: Amit Shah and Tim Dugle
Defendant: Terry Rodino, Stacey Rodino, Allison Rodino Bailey, Aaron Zou, Duro Inc, Duro Recycling Inc, Duro Realty Inc, Duro Transport Inc, Apex Pallet Inc, Lucky Lou LLC, 2610 LLC, American Travel Palace LLC and ATP Exports Inc
Case Number: 3:2013cv00103
Filed: February 14, 2013
Court: Indiana Northern District Court
Office: South Bend Office
County: Elkhart
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Christopher A Nuechterlein
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 20, 2017 356 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER: The Court hereby GRANTS in part and DENIES in partDefendants Terry Rodino, Stacey Rodino, Allison Rodino Bailey, Patrick Bailey, Aaron Zou, Apex Pallet, Inc., Lucky Lou, LLC, American Travel Palace, LLC; and ATP Exports, Inc.s Mot ion to Quash Subpoenas 307 . The Court QUASHES the subpoena Plaintiffs propose to serve on Lake City Bank. The Court also GRANTS Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Defendants Motion to Quash Subpoenas 330 and gave approp riate weight to Plaintiffs surreply. The Court ORDERS the moving defendants to file an itemization of their reasonable expenses incurred in making the Motion to Quash by no later than 7/7/2017. Plaintiffs may respond to the itemization by no later t han 7/14/2017. No reply is to be filed. The Court GRANTS Defendant Terry Rodinos Motion for Protective Order 316 and ORDERS that the Law Firm Defendants need not respond to Plaintiffs Request No. 20. Because the Court grants the Motion for Protect ive Order, the Court ORDERS Defendant Rodino to file an itemization of his reasonable expenses incurred in making the Motion for Protective Order alongwith argument as to why those expenses are reasonable in this situation by 7/7/2017. Plaintiffs may respond to the itemization by 7/14/2017. No reply is to be filed. The Court GRANTS Defendant, Scott Mills Motion for Leave to File Documents under Seal Pursuant to N.D. Ind. Local Rule 5-3(c) and Rule 37-1 343 and ORDERS Defendant Mills to file t he at-issue emails on the docket, ex parte, by 7/7/2017. The Court REMINDS Defendant Mills of the need to comply with the Northern District of Indiana Local Rules and CM/ECF User Manual when filing the emails under seal and ex parte. If Defendant Mills prefers, he may file hard copies of the emails with the Court. Any party asserting a privilege in the at-issue emails may file a brief supporting that claim by no later than 7/14/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 6/20/17. (jss)
March 22, 2016 226 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying without prejudice with leave to refile 144 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 3/22/2016. (smb) Modified on 3/23/2016 to correct doc title (lhc).
March 24, 2014 69 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 59 Motion for Review of Magistrate Judge Decision by a District Judge. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 3/24/14. (smp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shah et al v. Rodino et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amit Shah
Represented By: Amanda C Couture
Represented By: John K Henning
Represented By: Todd J Kaiser
Represented By: Michelle Renee Maslowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Dugle
Represented By: Amanda C Couture
Represented By: John K Henning
Represented By: Todd J Kaiser
Represented By: Michelle Renee Maslowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Rodino
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Represented By: Christopher M Lerner
Represented By: Robert J Palmer
Represented By: Georgianne M Walker
Represented By: E Spencer Walton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacey Rodino
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Represented By: Christopher M Lerner
Represented By: Robert J Palmer
Represented By: Georgianne M Walker
Represented By: E Spencer Walton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Rodino Bailey
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Represented By: Christopher M Lerner
Represented By: Robert J Palmer
Represented By: Georgianne M Walker
Represented By: E Spencer Walton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Zou
Represented By: Christopher S Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duro Inc
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Represented By: Christopher M Lerner
Represented By: Robert J Palmer
Represented By: Georgianne M Walker
Represented By: E Spencer Walton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duro Recycling Inc
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Represented By: Christopher M Lerner
Represented By: Robert J Palmer
Represented By: Georgianne M Walker
Represented By: E Spencer Walton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duro Realty Inc
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Represented By: Christopher M Lerner
Represented By: Robert J Palmer
Represented By: Georgianne M Walker
Represented By: E Spencer Walton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duro Transport Inc
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Represented By: Christopher M Lerner
Represented By: Robert J Palmer
Represented By: Georgianne M Walker
Represented By: E Spencer Walton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Pallet Inc
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Represented By: Christopher M Lerner
Represented By: Robert J Palmer
Represented By: Georgianne M Walker
Represented By: E Spencer Walton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucky Lou LLC
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Represented By: Christopher M Lerner
Represented By: Robert J Palmer
Represented By: Georgianne M Walker
Represented By: E Spencer Walton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2610 LLC
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Represented By: Christopher M Lerner
Represented By: Robert J Palmer
Represented By: Georgianne M Walker
Represented By: E Spencer Walton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Travel Palace LLC
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Represented By: Christopher M Lerner
Represented By: Robert J Palmer
Represented By: Georgianne M Walker
Represented By: E Spencer Walton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ATP Exports Inc
Represented By: Trevor Q Gasper
Represented By: Christopher M Lerner
Represented By: Robert J Palmer
Represented By: Georgianne M Walker
Represented By: E Spencer Walton, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?