Franklin et al v. Civil City of South Bend et al
Plaintiff: |
Dan Franklin, Vivian Franklin and Deshawn Franklin |
Defendant: |
Civil City of South Bend, Pete Buttigieg, Charles Hurley, Eric Mentz, PFC Michael Stuk and Officer Aaron Knepper |
Case Number: |
3:2013cv00207 |
Filed: |
March 15, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana |
Office: |
South Bend Office |
County: |
St. Joseph |
Presiding Judge: |
Christopher A Nuechterlein |
Presiding Judge: |
Theresa L Springmann |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 7, 2016 |
Filing
99
OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 90 Motion for Bill of Costs and granting in part and denying in part 94 Motion for Attorney Fees. The Court finds that a fee award for Plaintiffs Counsel in this case is not reasonable. Plaintiffs Counsel is awarded $1,065.30 in costs and Defendants Counsel is awarded $97.52 in costs. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 12/7/16. (nal)
|
September 3, 2015 |
Filing
43
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART the Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF No. 36] filed by Defendants Eric Mentz, Michael Stuk, and Aaron Knepper, and DENIES the Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Paragraph [ECF No. 39]. Fu rther, the Plaintiffs' claim for Invasion of Privacy is DISMISSED. Still pending are the Plaintiffs' claims for unlawful entry and seizure under the Fourth Amendment and claims for false arrest, false imprisonment, and battery under state law. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 9/3/15. (ksp)
|
January 27, 2015 |
Filing
34
OPINION AND ORDER denying without prejudice 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Eric Mentz, Pete Buttigieg, PFC Michael Stuk, Officer Aaron Knepper, Civil City of South Bend, Charles Hurley. Plaintiffs to file by February 27 , 2015, a status of the case setting forth the discrete claims they intend to pursue to trial, including which Defendants are being sued for each particular claim. The Defendants shall then have untilMarch 27, 2015, to either file a motion for summary judgment, or a status indicating their intent to proceed to trial. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 1/27/2015. (kds)
|
September 19, 2013 |
Filing
19
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 11 MOTION to Dismiss; DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants Civil City of South Bend, Pete Buttigieg, and Charles Hurley, asserted in the fourth and fifth causes of action; AFFORDING the Plaintiffs fourteen days from the date of this Opinion and Order to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 9/19/2013. (lyb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?