Notre Dame University of v. Sebelius et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Notre Dame University of
Defendant: Kathleen Sebelius, Thomas Perez, Jacob J Lew, US Department of Health and Human Services, US Department of Labor and US Department of the Treasury
Amicus: American Civil Liberties Union
Movant: Jane Does 1 - 3
Case Number: 3:2013cv01276
Filed: December 3, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: South Bend Office
County: St. Joseph
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Nuechterlein
Presiding Judge: Philip P Simon
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 05:702
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2014 Filing 65 NOTICE of Docketing Record on Appeal (1 volume electronically) from USCA re 43 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Notre Dame University of. (Attachments: # 1 Receipt for transcript on 1/15/14)(smp)
January 13, 2014 Filing 64 Transmitted Record on Appeal (1 volume of Pldgs. and 1 volume of a Transcript - both sent via Email) to US Court of Appeals re 43 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. (lyb)
January 10, 2014 Filing 62 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Notre Dame University of. US Department of the Treasury served on 12/13/2013, answer due 2/11/2014. (Kilmartin, Alison)
January 10, 2014 Filing 61 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Notre Dame University of. US Department of Labor served on 12/11/2013, answer due 2/10/2014. (Kilmartin, Alison)
January 10, 2014 Filing 60 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Notre Dame University of. Jacob J Lew served on 12/9/2013, answer due 2/7/2014; Thomas Perez served on 12/9/2013, answer due 2/7/2014. (Kilmartin, Alison)
January 10, 2014 Filing 59 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Notre Dame University of. Kathleen Sebelius served on 12/6/2013, answer due 2/4/2014; US Department of Health and Human Services served on 12/6/2013, answer due 2/4/2014. (Kilmartin, Alison)
January 10, 2014 Filing 58 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to 1 Complaint, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Attorney General of the United States, U.S. Department of Justice Acknowledgement filed by Notre Dame University of. (Kilmartin, Alison)
January 10, 2014 Filing 57 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to 1 Complaint, David A. Capp c/o Civil Process Clerk, United States Attorney Acknowledgement filed by Notre Dame University of. (Kilmartin, Alison)
January 9, 2014 Filing 63 Letter from 7th Circuit Court of Appeals requesting record on appeal. (lyb)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 53 Motion to Stay; proceedings before this Court wil be STAYED during the pendency of the appeal to the Seventh Circuit of the denial of Notre Dame's request for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 1/2/14. (smp)
December 31, 2013 Filing 53 Joint MOTION to Stay District Court Proceedings Pending Appeal by Plaintiff Notre Dame University of. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Seventh Circuit Order (Dec. 30, 2013))(Kairis, Matthew)
December 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER of USCA as to 43 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Notre Dame University of DENYING emergency motion for an injunction. Briefing in the appeal is EXPEDITED. (smp)
December 26, 2013 Filing 51 MEMORANDUM in Support of 50 MOTION to Proceed Anonymously filed by Jane Does 1 - 3. (Moskowitz, Seymour)
December 26, 2013 Filing 50 MOTION to Proceed Anonymously by Movant Jane Does 1 - 3. (Moskowitz, Seymour)
December 23, 2013 Filing 52 USCA Case Number 13-3853 for 43 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Notre Dame University of. (Attachments: # 1 3(b) Fee Notice, # 2 Notice Vacating Fee Notice)(smp)
December 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying 41 Plaintiff's Motion For Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 12/23/2013. (nac)
December 23, 2013 Filing 48 RESPONSE to Motion re 41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal filed by Jacob J Lew, Thomas Perez, Kathleen Sebelius, US Department of Health and Human Services, US Department of Labor, US Department of the Treasury. (Pollack, Michael)
December 23, 2013 Filing 47 Short Record Sent to US Court of Appeals re 43 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal. Appeal filing fees paid in the amount of $455.00 - Receipt # 0755-2243817. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, # 2 Docketing Statement, # 3 Order being appealed, # 4 Docket sheet)(smp)
December 23, 2013 Filing 46 ***THIS REPLACES DOCUMENT 45 *** TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Notre Dame University of for proceedings held on 12/19/2013 before Judge Simon, re 43 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal (Kairis, Matthew) Modified on 12/23/2013 to note this entry replaces DE 45 because of an incorrect document format --- DE 46 has the correct format of the document (lyb).
December 20, 2013 Filing 44 Docketing Statement re: 43 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal filed by Notre Dame University of. (Kairis, Matthew)
December 20, 2013 Filing 43 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to 40 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, filed by Plaintiff Notre Dame University of. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0755-2243817. (Kairis, Matthew)
December 20, 2013 Filing 42 BRIEF in Support of 41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal filed by Notre Dame University of. (Kairis, Matthew)
December 20, 2013 Filing 41 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal by Plaintiff Notre Dame University of. (Kairis, Matthew)
December 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 OPINION AND ORDER: DENYING Plf University of Notre Dame's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction 9 . Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 12/20/2013. (nac) Modified dkt text on 12/27/2013 (kjp).
December 20, 2013 Filing 39 NOTICE by Notre Dame University of re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Oral Argument of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Kairis, Matthew)
December 20, 2013 Filing 38 TRANSCRIPT of Preliminary Injunction hearing held on December 19, 2013, before Judge Philip P. Simon. Court Reporter Sharon Boleck Mroz, Telephone number 219-852-6728. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. IMPORTANT: Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above matter. The parties have 7 calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. Within 21 days of the filing of the transcript, a Redaction Request - Transcript shall be e-filed with the Court. Access to this request will be restricted to the Court and attorneys of record in the case. If no such Notice and Redaction Request are filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the Court Reporter. Counsel are strongly urged to share this notice with all clients so that an informed decision about the inclusion of certain materials may be made. The responsibility for redacting these personal identifiers rests solely with counsel and the parties. The Clerk and Court Reporter will not review each transcript for compliance with this rule. Notice of Intent to Redact due 1/6/2014. Redaction Request due 1/10/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/21/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/20/2014. (sbm)
December 20, 2013 Filing 37 NOTICE by Notre Dame University of re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Oral Argument (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kairis, Matthew)
December 19, 2013 Filing 36 MOTION HEARING held on 12/19/2013 re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Oral Argument filed by Notre Dame University of before Chief Judge Philip P Simon. Pla appeared by atty Matthew A. Kairis. Dft appeared by atty Michael C. Pollack. Court hears oral argument on the motion. Court to issue ruling. Plf requests a TRO and argument was heard. (Court Reporter Sharon Boleck-Mroz.) (nac)
December 19, 2013 Filing 35 Proposed Intervenors' ANSWER to 1 Complaint, pursuant to FRCP 24(c) by Jane Does 1 - 3.(Moskowitz, Seymour)
December 19, 2013 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM in Support of 33 MOTION to Intervene and for Consideration of Intervenors' Arguments in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Jane Does 1 - 3. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Doe #1, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Doe #2, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Doe #3)(Moskowitz, Seymour)
December 19, 2013 Filing 33 MOTION to Intervene by Movant Jane Does 1 - 3. (Moskowitz, Seymour)
December 19, 2013 Filing 32 RESPONSE by Notre Dame University of to 28 Notice (Other), . (Kairis, Matthew)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 29 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ayesha Naseem Kahn PHV for Jane Doe #1-3. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 12/10/13. (smp) Modified on 12/19/2013 (copy sent to attorney Kahn)(smp).
December 19, 2013 Filing 30 BRIEF in Opposition to 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Oral Argument , 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Request for Hearing by Amicus Curiae filed by American Civil Liberties Union. (Lee, Jennifer)
December 19, 2013 Filing 29 APPLICATION for Attorney Ayesha Naseem Khan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, and Jane Doe #3 ; Receipt #3009282. (smp)
December 19, 2013 Filing 28 NOTICE by Jacob J Lew, Thomas Perez, Kathleen Sebelius, US Department of Health and Human Services, US Department of Labor, US Department of the Treasury Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Priests for Life v. HHS)(Pollack, Michael)
December 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 20 ACLU's Motion for Leave to File amicus curiae brief. The ACLU will not be heard at oral argument regarding preliminary injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 12/17/13. (smp)
December 16, 2013 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Oral Argument filed by Notre Dame University of. (Attachments: # 1 Transcript Excerpt, # 2 EDNY Decision & Order, # 3 IOM Report)(Kairis, Matthew)
December 16, 2013 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of Meritain Health, Inc. by Notre Dame University of. (Kairis, Matthew)
December 16, 2013 Filing 24 AFFIDAVIT of John Affleck-Graves (Supplemental) by Notre Dame University of. (Kairis, Matthew)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 22 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Notre Dame's reply brief regarding its Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall not exceed twenty-five (25) pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher A Nuechterlein on 12/16/13. (cck)
December 13, 2013 Filing 22 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Reply Regarding Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Notre Dame University of. (Kairis, Matthew)
December 12, 2013 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Amicus American Civil Liberties Union. (Attachments: # 1 Addendum Proposed Amicus Brief)(Lee, Jennifer)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Defendants' Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motions for Temporary Restraining Order and for Preliminary Injunction shall not exceed twenty-nine (29) pages and need not include a table of contents and table of authorities. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher A Nuechterlein on 12/12/13. (cck)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Oral Argument : ORAL ARGUMENT set for 12/19/2013 09:00 AM (CST) in US District Court - Hammond before Chief Judge Philip P Simon.. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 12/11/13. (smp)
December 11, 2013 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Support of 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Oral Argument , 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Request for Hearing filed by Notre Dame University of. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Kairis, Matthew)
December 11, 2013 Filing 17 NOTICE by Notre Dame University of Withdrawal of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Request for Hearing (Kairis, Matthew)
December 11, 2013 Filing 16 SUPPLEMENT to 10 Affidavit, Exhibit A attached to Affidavit of John Affleck-Graves filed by Notre Dame University of. (Kairis, Matthew)
December 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Notre Dames Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction shall not exceed fifty (50) pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher A Nuechterlein on 12/11/13. (cck)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Request for Hearing filed by Notre Dame University of to Judge Van Bokkelen. Parties are directed to contact Judge VanBokkelen's chambers at 219-852-6744 to schedule a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 12/10/13. (smp)
December 10, 2013 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Oral Argument , 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Request for Hearing filed by Jacob J Lew, Thomas Perez, Kathleen Sebelius, US Department of Health and Human Services, US Department of Labor, US Department of the Treasury. (Pollack, Michael)
December 10, 2013 Filing 12 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages and to dispense with table of contents and table of authorities by Defendants Jacob J Lew, Thomas Perez, Kathleen Sebelius, US Department of Health and Human Services, US Department of Labor, US Department of the Treasury. (Pollack, Michael)
December 10, 2013 Chief Judge Philip P Simon added. Senior Judge James T Moody no longer assigned to case. (kwk)
December 9, 2013 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Notre Dame University of. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Memorandum in Support, # 2 Exhibit A to Ex. 1 - Memorandum in Support, # 3 Exhibit B to Ex. 1 - Memorandum in Support, # 4 Exhibit C to Ex. 1 - Memorandum in Support, # 5 Exhibit D to Ex. 1 - Memorandum in Support, # 6 Exhibit E to Ex. 1 - Memorandum in Support, # 7 Exhibit F to Ex. 1 - Memorandum in Support, # 8 Exhibit G to Ex. 1 - Memorandum in Support, # 9 Exhibit H to Ex. 1 - Memorandum in Support)(Kairis, Matthew)
December 9, 2013 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT re 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Oral Argument , 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Request for Hearing of John Affleck-Graves by Notre Dame University of. (Kairis, Matthew)
December 9, 2013 Filing 9 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Request for Oral Argument by Plaintiff Notre Dame University of. (Kairis, Matthew)
December 9, 2013 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT re 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Request for Hearing of Matthew A. Kairis by Notre Dame University of. (Kairis, Matthew)
December 9, 2013 Filing 7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Request for Hearing by Plaintiff Notre Dame University of. (Kairis, Matthew)
December 5, 2013 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa D Palmisciano on behalf of Notre Dame University of (Palmisciano, Melissa)
December 5, 2013 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Alison M Kilmartin on behalf of Notre Dame University of (Kilmartin, Alison)
December 3, 2013 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jacob J Lew, Thomas Perez, Kathleen Sebelius, US Department of Health and Human Services, US Department of Labor, US Department of the Treasury. NOTE: Only copies that bear the seal of the court should be used for service of process. (jld)
December 3, 2013 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Notre Dame University of. (jld)
December 3, 2013 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A Kairis on behalf of Notre Dame University of (jld)
December 3, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jacob J Lew, Thomas Perez, Kathleen Sebelius, US Department of Health and Human Services, US Department of Labor, US Department of the Treasury (Filing fee $ 400.) Receipt #3009121, filed by Notre Dame University of. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jld) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2013: # 2 Exhibit A) (jld).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Notre Dame University of v. Sebelius et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Notre Dame University of
Represented By: Matthew A Kairis
Represented By: Alison M Kilmartin
Represented By: Melissa D Palmisciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Sebelius
Represented By: Michael C Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Perez
Represented By: Michael C Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob J Lew
Represented By: Michael C Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Michael C Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Labor
Represented By: Michael C Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of the Treasury
Represented By: Michael C Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: American Civil Liberties Union
Represented By: Jennifer K Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Jane Does 1 - 3
Represented By: Ayesha Naseem Khan PHV
Represented By: Seymour H Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?