Tracy et al v. Minne et al

Plaintiff: Mona C Tracy and Terah Tracy
Defendant: Paul J Minne and Jean M Minne
Case Number: 3:2015cv00212
Filed: May 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: South Bend Office
County: Vigo
Presiding Judge: Christopher A Nuechterlein
Presiding Judge: Robert L Miller
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 OPINION AND ORDER: The court: 1. finds for plaintiffs Mona and Terah Tracy on their claim against defendant Paul Minne for breach of fiduciary duty; 2. finds for defendant Paul Minne on all other claims against him; 3. finds for defendant Jean Minne on all claims against her; and 4. finds for counter-defendants Mona and Terah Tracy on all claims against them in Paul and Jean Minnes counterclaim. The clerk shall enter a money judgment for Mona and Terah Tracy and against Paul Minne in the amount of $55,867.16. The judgment shall further order Paul Minne to hold Mona Tracy harmless on the tax warrant against them for unpaid employment taxes. Costs shall be assessed the defendants. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/12/2018. (lhc)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 42 MOTION for Summary Judgment , DENYING 40 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to Counts I and II of Defendants/Counter-Plaintiffs' Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 2/13/18. (ksp)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 OPINION AND ORDER: Court DENIES 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 1/25/2016. (tc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tracy et al v. Minne et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mona C Tracy
Represented By: Mark D Hassler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terah Tracy
Represented By: Mark D Hassler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul J Minne
Represented By: Andrew M Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean M Minne
Represented By: Andrew M Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?