Aaron, MacGregor & Associates, LLC et al v. Zhejiang Jinfei Kaida Wheels Co., Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: |
Aaron, MacGregor & Associates, LLC and Future International, LLC |
Defendant: |
Zhejiang Jinfei Kaida Wheels Co., Ltd., Future Industrial & Trading, Inc. and Ge Bingzao |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv00254 |
Filed: |
June 17, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana |
Office: |
South Bend Office |
County: |
Elkhart |
Presiding Judge: |
Christopher A Nuechterlein |
Presiding Judge: |
Philip P Simon |
Nature of Suit: |
Trademark |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. ยง 1051 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 20, 2018 |
Filing
109
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court now OVERRULES all of the Defendants' evidentiary objections (DE 85 , 90 , 92 , and 98 ); DENIES Defendants' 72 Renewed Motion for Sanctions; DENIES Plaintiffs' 75 motion to compel; GRANTS IN PART a nd DENIES IN PART 69 AMA and Zou's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART 73 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment in favor of AMA and Zou on Jinfe is Second Counterclaim of Unjust Enrichment, Third Counterclaim of Conversion, and Fourth Counterclaim of Fraud as pled in Defendants First Amended Answer to First Amended Complaint, Third-Party Complaint and Counterclaims [DE 52]. The Clerk is DI RECTED to enter judgment in favor of Defendants on Plaintiffs claims for Unfair Competition (Count VI) and Trademark Infringement and False Designation of Origin (Count VII) in their First Amended Complaint 14 . Future Industrial & Trading, Inc ., Bingzao Ge, and Aaron Zou are terminated as parties in this action. The Court NOTES that AMA and Zou filed three exhibits (DE 70 , 70-1, 70-2) related to its motion for partial summary judgment and two exhibits (DE 76 , 76-1) related to its mo tion to compel under seal without the Courts permission. The Court ORDERS Plaintiffs to submit a brief including authority and good cause for sealing the documents by 7/6/2018. Defendants may file a response by 7/13/2018. No further briefing will be accepted. Defendants' counsel is ORDERED to show cause by 6/29/2018 why the Court should not find the 72 Renewed Motion for Sanctions was presented for an improper purpose. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 6/20/18. (jld)
|
October 30, 2017 |
Filing
64
OPINION AND ORDER: DENYING 60 MOTION for Sanctions by Defendants Ge Bingzao, Future Industrial & Trading, Inc., Zhejiang Jinfei Kaida Wheels Co., Ltd. The Court ORDERS all parties to serve an additional round of supplemental discovery responses b y November 6, 2017. The producing party should also provide written notice to the requesting party by the same date should no additional responsive information be possessed. Supplementation under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(e) shall then continue every six weeks until trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 10/30/2017. (lhc)
|
April 11, 2016 |
Filing
28
OPINION AND ORDER: Counts III and V as asserted by Future International are DISMISSED and Defendants' 18 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 4/11/2016. (tc)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?