Sims et al v. New Penn Financial LLC
Plaintiff: |
Mario L Sims and Tiffiny Sims |
Defendant: |
New Penn Financial LLC |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv00263 |
Filed: |
June 25, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana |
Office: |
South Bend Office |
County: |
St. Joseph |
Presiding Judge: |
Christopher A Nuechterlein |
Presiding Judge: |
Philip P Simon |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 28, 2018 |
Filing
106
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS Shellpoint's motion for summary judgment 73 and DIRECTS the Clerk to enter judgment in favor of Shellpoint on the Simses' remaining claims under the ECOA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 3/28/2018. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(jss)
|
August 2, 2017 |
Filing
63
OPINION AND ORDER denying without prejudice 48 Plaintiffs MOTION to Compel, denying without prejudice 61 Defendants MOTION for Protective Order and denying 62 Plaintiffs MOTION to Stay. The Court ORDERS the parties to meet and confer rega rding a proposed protective order. The parties may file a joint motion for protective order by 8/23/2017. Should the parties fail to reach agreement on a proposed protective order, Plaintiffs may file a renewed motion to compel and Defendants may sep arately file a renewed motion for protective order by 8/23/17. The Court ADVISES that any further evidence of obdurate, contumacious, or vituperative conduct or language directed to either party or this Court will influence any decision this Court mu st make should this discovery dispute not be resolved by the parties themselves. The Court now sua sponte EXTENDS the discovery deadline until 9/30/2017. Plaintiffs responses to Defendants Discovery Requests filed on 6/30/17 DE 60 are due 8/23/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/2/17. (Copy mailed to pro se parties). (nal)
|
November 8, 2016 |
Filing
34
OPINION AND ORDER: GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 30 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint filed by New Penn Financial LLC. Counts One through Eight are DISMISSED WITH PREJUIDCE. The motion to dismiss is DENIED with respect to Count Nine. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 11/8/16. (jld)(cc: Mario & Tiffany Sims)
|
February 12, 2016 |
Filing
28
OPINION AND ORDER: Court DENIES IN PART AND GRANTS IN PART 19 Motion for judgment on the pleadings and motion to dismiss. The portion of the motion requesting judgment on the pleadings is DENIED. But the portion of the motion seeking dismissal f or failure to state a claim is GRANTED. The complaint is therefore DISMISSED, albeit WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The Simses are GRANTED leave to file an amended complaint that addresses the many deficiencies identified in the order by no later than 3/9/2016 and are warned that failure to do so may result in dismissal of this case with prejudice. The Simses 23 Motion to Strike is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Philip P Simon on 2/12/2016. cc: Pro se pltfs (tc)
|
July 1, 2015 |
Filing
6
OPINION AND ORDER: DENYING 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Mario L Sims, Tiffiny Sims. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 7/1/15. (cc: M. Sims, T. Sims) (jld)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?