Scruggs v. West et al
Plaintiff: |
Christopher L Scruggs |
Defendant: |
Nurse West and CO Miller |
Miscellaneous_party: |
WESTVILLE E-FILE(Court Use Only) |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv00033 |
Filed: |
January 21, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana |
Office: |
South Bend Office |
County: |
LaPorte |
Presiding Judge: |
James T Moody |
Presiding Judge: |
Christopher A Nuechterlein |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 13, 2019 |
Filing
335
OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 331 MOTION for a New Trial filed by Christopher L Scruggs.. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/13/19. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(kjp)
|
June 26, 2019 |
Filing
244
OPINION AND ORDER: The court GRANTS the motion for ruling ECF 242 and the motion to refile ECF 233 as it pertains to the motion for sanctions ECF 197 and DENIES the motions for an expert ECF 186 and ECF 241 , the motion for sanctions ECF 197 and the motion to amend the scheduling order ECF 231 . Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/26/19. (nal)
|
September 10, 2018 |
Filing
177
OPINION AND ORDER: The motions for summary judgment ECF 106 and 133 are DENIED. Additionally, Mr. Scruggs' motion ECF 173 to file a surreply, motion ECF 174 for hearing and compound motion ECF 175 are DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 9/10/18. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nal)
|
December 27, 2017 |
Filing
161
ORDER DENYING 131 Motion for Review of Magistrate Judge Decision by a District Judge. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 12/27/2018. (Copy sent to pro se party)(sct)
|
June 28, 2017 |
Filing
85
ORDER ADOPTS 67 Report and Recommendations of the magistrate judge, and DENIES 61 Scruggs' Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunctions by Plaintiffs Christopher L Scruggs. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/28/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party via e-file)(lhc)
|
June 21, 2017 |
Filing
82
OPINION AND ORDER: DENYING 72 Scruggs' Interference Complaints with MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . If Mr. Scruggs does not stop filing meritless motions for preliminary injunction and/or does not stop placing multiple case numbers on his filings, he may be fined, sanctioned, or restricted from filing. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 6/21/2017. (Copy mailed to pro se party via e-file)(lhc) Modified on 6/21/2017 to correct text (lhc).
|
October 18, 2016 |
Filing
21
OPINION AND ORDER re 19 Amended Complaint, the court GRANTS plaintiff leave to proceed against Nurse West in her individual capacity for monetary damages for using excessive force against him on October 25, 2015; GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proc eed against C.O. Miller in his individual capacity for monetary damages for failing to intervene in Nurse West's use of excessive force on October 25, 2015; DISMISSES any and all other claims contained in the complaint; DIRECTS the clerk and the US Marshals Service to issue and serve process on Nurse West and C.O. Miller with a copy of this order and the amended complaint; ORDERS Nurse West and C.O. Miller respond only to the claims for which the pro se plaintiff has been granted leave to proceed in this screening order. Signed by Judge Robert L Miller, Jr on 10/14/2016. (lpw)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?