Vela v. Thompson et al
Plaintiff: |
Alfred Vela |
Defendant: |
Indiana Department of Corrections, Corizon Health Inc and Joseph Thompson |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv00051 |
Filed: |
February 1, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana |
Office: |
South Bend Office |
County: |
LaPorte |
Presiding Judge: |
James T Moody |
Presiding Judge: |
Christopher A Nuechterlein |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 18, 2022 |
Filing
147
OPINION AND ORDER OVERRULING 139 Motion/Objectiion for Review of Magistrate Judge Decision by a District Judge re 138 Order denying discovery motions 92 , 93 and 95 , filed by Alfred Vela. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 5/18/2022. (mrm)
|
October 7, 2021 |
Filing
137
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court finds that Mr. Vela's objection to the Magistrate Judge's order 126 is SUSTAINED as the use of an extraordinary cause standard when applying Rule 16 is contrary to law 129 . The Court SETS ASIDE the order so that the Magistrate Judge can review the discovery motions 92 , 93 , 95 under the proper standard. Once this has been addressed, the undersigned would then be in a position to adequately review the magistrate's decision pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A), should either counsel file a motion to review. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 10/7/2021. (bas)
|
February 20, 2018 |
Filing
61
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court OVERRULES defendants' objection 56 , ADOPTS Magistrate Judge Gotsch's Report and Recommendation 55 , and DENIES defendants' motion for summary judgment (more aptly characterized as a motion to dismiss) on grounds of exhaustion 18 . Signed by Senior Judge James T Moody on 2/20/2018. (lhc)
|
January 24, 2017 |
Filing
28
OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 18 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Corizon Health Inc, Joseph Thompson; DENYING 23 RULE 56 MOTION to Strike 22 Reply to Response to Motion by Plaintiff Alfred Vela. This matter is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr to oversee preliminary discovery, if appropriate, and conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, on the factual questions related to exhaustion as described in Part II (D) of this Opinion and to submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for the disposition of the issue. Signed by Senior Judge James T Moody on 1/24/17. (cer)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?