Grimes v. Evergreen Recreational Vehicles, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Grimes
Defendant: Evergreen Recreational Vehicles, LLC, KR Enterprises Inc and JMA, LLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00472
Filed: July 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: South Bend Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Theresa L Springmann
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 OPINION AND ORDER on 73 Joint MOTION for Orders (1) Preliminarily Approving the Settlement Agreement, (2) Approving the Form and Manner of the Class Settlement Notice, (3) Scheduling a Final Fairness Hearing, and (4) Finally Approving the Settl ement Agreement filed by JMA, LLC. While the Court DENIES as premature any request to finally approve the settlement agreement (because this issue will be considered after the final fairness hearing), the Court GRANTS the remaining requests. Final fairness hearing set for 12/5/2019 at 1:30 pm (Eastern Time) before Judge Jon E. DeGuilio, South Bend Federal Court, 204 S. Main Street, South Bend, IN 46601. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 9/4/19. (ksp)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 30 Motion to Certify Class; ORDERING that this case be certified as a class action with the class defined as stated in Section II.B.6 above; APPOINTING Outten & Golden LLP as class counsel and Cohen & Malad LLP, as liaison counsel; and DIRECTING class counsel to provide notice of this certification (as amended herein) to each individual member of the class who can be identified through reasonable effort. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 3/12/18. (jld)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Class Action Complaint by Defendants JMA, LLC, KR Enterprises Inc. Signed by Judge Theresa L Springmann on 12/12/16. (cer)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grimes v. Evergreen Recreational Vehicles, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Grimes
Represented By: Irwin B Levin
Represented By: Vess A Miller
Represented By: Jack Raisner PHV
Represented By: Rene S Roupinian PHV
Represented By: Richard E Shevitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evergreen Recreational Vehicles, LLC
Represented By: Bradford R Shively
Represented By: Jonathan R Slabaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KR Enterprises Inc
Represented By: Bradford R Shively
Represented By: Jonathan R Slabaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JMA, LLC
Represented By: Bradford R Shively
Represented By: Jonathan R Slabaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?