Ellis v. Burris et al
Plaintiff: |
Demajio J Ellis |
Defendant: |
Sergeant Burris, Sergeant Penning, Officer Mahoney and Officer Nicksich |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv00561 |
Filed: |
August 22, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana |
Office: |
South Bend Office |
County: |
LaPorte |
Presiding Judge: |
Jon E DeGuilio |
Presiding Judge: |
John E Martin |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 20, 2020 |
Filing
106
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 81 and DIRECTS the Clerk to enter judgment in favor of Defendants Sgt. Alonzo Burris, Sgt. Steven Penning, Officer Daniel Nicksich, and Officer Brandon Mahoney. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Martin on 3/20/2020. (lhc)
|
January 27, 2017 |
Filing
12
OPINION AND ORDER the court Grants the plaintiff leave to proceed against Sgt. Burris, Sgt. Penning, Off. Mahoney and Off. Nicksich in their individual capacities for money damages for failing to provide him with adequate conditions of confinement on 1/12/16 through 1/13/16; DISMISSES any and all other claims contained in the complaint; DIRECTS the clerk and the United States Marshals Service to issue and serve process on Sgt. Burris, Sgt. Penning, Off. Mahoney and Off Nicksich with a copy of th is order and the amended complaint and ORDERS that Sgt. Burris, Sgt. Penning, Off. Mahoney and Off. Nicksich respond, only to the claims for which the plaintiff has been granted leave to proceed in this screening order. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 1/27/2017. (lpw)
|
October 28, 2016 |
Filing
7
OPINION AND ORDER re 1 Pro Se Complaint, the court GRANTS the plaintiff leave to proceed against Sergeant Burris, Sergeant Penning and Officer Mahoney and Officer Nicksich in their individual capacities for money damages for failing to provide h im with adequate conditions of confinement on January 12, 2016 through January 13, 2016; DISMISSES any and all other claims contained in the complaint; DIRECTS the clerk and the US Marshals Service to issue and serve process on Sergeant Burris, Serge ant Penning, Officer Mahoney and Officer Nicksich with a copy of this order and the complaint: ORDERS that Sergeant Burris, Sergeant Penning, Officer Mahoney and Officer Nicksich respond only to the claims for which the plaintiff has been granted leave to proceed in this screening order. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 10/28/2016. (lpw)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?