Hills v. AT&T Mobility Services LLC

Plaintiff: Katia Hills
Defendant: AT&T Mobility Services LLC, AT, AT&T Inc and AT&T Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2017cv00556
Filed: July 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Office: South Bend Office
County: Elkhart
Presiding Judge: Jon E DeGuilio
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #80 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lenora M Lapidus PHV terminated. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 5/13/19. (cck)
May 10, 2019 Filing 80 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney on behalf of Lenora M. Lapidus (deceased) by Plaintiff Katia Hills. (Thomas PHV, Gillian)
April 19, 2019 Filing 79 STIPULATION Stipulation Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information and Production of Documents by Defendants AT&T Inc, AT&T Mobility Services LLC, AT&T Services, Inc.. (Maturi PHV, Alexander)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting #77 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Alison M Lewandoski PHV terminated.Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 4/1/19. (slm)
April 1, 2019 Filing 77 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Alison Lewandoski by Defendants AT&T Mobility Services LLC, AT&T Services, Inc.. (Lewandoski PHV, Alison)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #75 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Miriam R Nemeth PHV terminated. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 3/29/19. (slm)
March 28, 2019 Filing 75 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Miriam R. Nemeth by Plaintiff Katia Hills. (Kotagal PHV, Kalpana)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 SCHEDULING ORDER: Any amendments to the pleadings to be filed by the Plaintiff by 5/22/2019 and by the Defendant by 6/21/2019. Discovery deadline is 1/22/2020. Expert Discovery deadline is 1/22/2020. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 11/22/2019. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 10/22/2019. Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 3/22/2019. Mediator Selection Deadline is 6/30/2019. Mediation to be completed by 4/30/2020. The Court FINDS MOOT #73 MOTION Leave to Appear Telephonically filed by Katia Hills. Because the presiding judge will set the deadline for dispositive motions and trial date, the summary judgment deadline in Fed. R. Civ. P. 56 shall not apply in this case. The Court VACATES the hearing scheduled for 3/26/2019 at 11:30 am. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 3/20/19. (ksp)
March 20, 2019 Filing 73 MOTION Leave to Appear Telephonically by Plaintiff Katia Hills. (Kotagal PHV, Kalpana)
March 18, 2019 Filing 72 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Thomas PHV, Gillian)
March 18, 2019 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by Vess A Miller on behalf of Katia Hills (Miller, Vess)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #69 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Emma J Roth PHV for Katia Hills. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 3/8/2019. (mtr)
March 7, 2019 Filing 69 Application for Attorney Emma Roth to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Katia Hills. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3830172(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
February 26, 2019 Filing 68 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Joint Proposed Discovery due by 3/18/2019. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/26/2019 11:30 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 2/26/19. (slm)
January 25, 2019 Filing 66 ANSWER to #61 Amended Complaint (Second) by AT&T Mobility Services LLC, AT&T Services, Inc..(Maturi PHV, Alexander)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #64 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lenora M Lapidus PHV for Katia Hills. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 1/17/2019. (mtr)
January 16, 2019 Filing 64 Application for Attorney Lenora M. Lapidus to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Katia Hills. (Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/16/2019: #1 SCOTUS Certificate) (mtr). Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 was received on 7/19/2017, receipt number 0755-3306223 (See DE#6 . Modified (to add SCOTUS Certificate and include payment information) on 1/16/2019 (mtr).
December 21, 2018 set answer deadline 63 to amended complaint 01/25/2019 (slm)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting #62 MOTION for Extension of Time to File answer as to #61 Amended Complaint.Answer due 01/25/2019.Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 12/20/18. (slm)
December 18, 2018 Filing 62 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #61 Amended Complaint (Agreed motion) by Defendants AT&T Mobility Services LLC, AT&T Services, Inc.. (Maturi PHV, Alexander)
December 11, 2018 Filing 61 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against All Defendants, filed by Katia Hills.(Kotagal PHV, Kalpana)
December 11, 2018 Filing 60 ***ATTY FILING ERROR, REFILED AT DE #61 *** AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against Katia Hills, filed by Katia Hills.(Kotagal PHV, Kalpana) Modified on 12/12/2018 (rmc).
December 11, 2018 Filing 59 NOTICE by Katia Hills Of Filing Second Amended Complaint (Kotagal PHV, Kalpana)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 OPINION AND ORDER DENYING #47 MOTION to Transfer Case ; DENYING IN PART and GRANTING IN PART #36 MOTION to Amend/Correct #16 Amended Complaint to Add New Party and Class Action Allegations filed by Katia Hills. Plaintiff may file a second amended complaint, including the relevant class allegations incorporated into her proposed second amended complaint [DE 37] related to the instant motion to amend, by December 11, 2018. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to seal the proposed amended complaint [DE 37] accompanying Hills's instant motion to amend to avoid confusion on the docket going forward. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 12/4/18. (ksp)
August 3, 2018 Filing 57 NOTICE by Katia Hills of Filing Complaint in the N.D. of Georgia to Preserve Cynthia Allen's Claims (Kotagal PHV, Kalpana)
June 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #55 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brian Matthew Hayes PHV for AT&T Mobility Services LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 6/28/18. (ksc)
June 28, 2018 Filing 55 Application for Attorney Brian Matthew Hayes to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of AT&T Mobility Services LLC a/k/a AT&T Mobility LLC and AT&T Services, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3608500(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
June 26, 2018 Filing 54 REPLY to Response to Motion re #47 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Katia Hills. (Kotagal PHV, Kalpana)
June 19, 2018 Filing 53 RESPONSE to Motion re #47 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by AT&T Mobility Services LLC, AT&T Services, Inc.. (Gage PHV, Kenneth)
June 19, 2018 Filing 52 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #47 MOTION to Transfer Case Declaration of Ltanya Robnett filed by AT&T Mobility Services LLC, AT&T Services, Inc.. (Gage PHV, Kenneth)
June 19, 2018 Filing 51 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #47 MOTION to Transfer Case Declaration of Heather Miller filed by AT&T Mobility Services LLC, AT&T Services, Inc.. (Gage PHV, Kenneth)
June 19, 2018 Filing 50 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #47 MOTION to Transfer Case Declaration of Dion McGlown filed by AT&T Mobility Services LLC, AT&T Services, Inc.. (Gage PHV, Kenneth)
June 19, 2018 Filing 49 **Refiled at DE #53 RESPONSE to Motion re #47 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by AT&T Mobility Services LLC, AT&T Services, Inc.. (Gage PHV, Kenneth) Modified on 6/19/2018 (nae).
June 5, 2018 Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re #47 MOTION to Transfer Case , #36 MOTION to Amend/Correct #16 Amended Complaint to Add New Party and Class Action Allegations filed by Katia Hills. (Kotagal PHV, Kalpana)
June 5, 2018 Filing 47 MOTION to Transfer Case by Plaintiff Katia Hills. (Kotagal PHV, Kalpana)
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting: #45 MOTION to Withdraw by Attorney Amy DeBrota filed by Katia Hills. Attorney Amy Ficklin DeBrota terminated.Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 6/5/18. (slm)
June 4, 2018 Filing 45 MOTION to Withdraw by Attorney Amy DeBrota by Plaintiff Katia Hills. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Granting Withdrawal)(DeBrota, Amy)
May 29, 2018 Filing 44 RESPONSE to Motion re #36 MOTION to Amend/Correct #16 Amended Complaint to Add New Party and Class Action Allegations filed by AT&T Mobility Services LLC, AT&T Services, Inc.. (Maturi PHV, Alexander)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER granting #40 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Miriam R Nemeth PHV for Katia Hills. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 05/16/2018. (mtr)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #39 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kalpana Kotagal PHV for Katia Hills. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 05/16/2018. (mtr)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #38 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Joseph M Sellers PHV for Katia Hills. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 5/16/2018. (mtr)
May 14, 2018 Filing 40 Application for Attorney Miriam R. Nemeth to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Katia Hills and Cynthia Allen, et al., Plaintiffs. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3566559(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
May 14, 2018 Filing 39 Application for Attorney Kalpana Kotagal to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Katia Hills and Cynthia Allen, et al., Plaintiffs. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3566550(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
May 14, 2018 Filing 38 Application for Attorney Joseph M. Sellers to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Katia Hills and Cynthia Allen, et al., Plaintiffs. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3566542(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
May 14, 2018 Filing 37 *** SEALED PER DE #58 **** AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Katia Hills.(Thomas PHV, Gillian) Modified on 12/4/2018 to add text (ksp).
May 14, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION to Amend/Correct #16 Amended Complaint to Add New Party and Class Action Allegations by Plaintiff Katia Hills. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Thomas PHV, Gillian)
May 14, 2018 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Lynn A Toops on behalf of Katia Hills (Toops, Lynn)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING IN PART #33 Status Report filed by Katia Hills, All Defendants. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the operative amended complaint (DE 16)is EXTENDED until 6/22/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 5/8/18. (ksp)
April 30, 2018 Filing 33 STATUS REPORT (in letter form) by Katia Hills. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Thomas PHV, Gillian) Modified dkt text on 5/1/2018 (kjp).
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: Consistent with the Order dated March 1, 2018, the stay in this case REMAINS LIFTED. (DE #27 at 3). Additionally, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to secure a Notice of Right to Sue for her Second Amended Charge from the EEOC. Plaintiff shall request the Notice of Right to Sue from the EEOC by 4/30/2018. Plaintiff may file a Second Amended Complaint reflecting claims arising from the Notice of Right to Sue within seven days of Plaintiff's receipt of the Notice. However, if Plaintiff fails to request a Notice of Right to Sue by 4/30/2018, she will forfeit her right to amend her complaint to add claims encompassed by the Notice of Right to Sue into this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 4/23/2018. (lhc)
April 23, 2018 Filing 31 Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Status Report by AT&T Mobility Services LLC, AT&T Services, Inc. to #30 Status Report . (Gage PHV, Kenneth)
April 20, 2018 Filing 30 STATUS REPORT by Katia Hills. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Thomas PHV, Gillian)
March 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alexander J Maturi PHV for AT&T Mobility Services LLC and AT&T Services, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 3/13/2018. (mtr)
March 8, 2018 Filing 28 Application for Attorney Alex J. Maturi to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of AT&T Mobility Services LLC and AT&T Services, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3507290(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
March 1, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants answer due 5/14/2018 per #27 order (jss)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion to stay IN PART #18 . All proceedings in this case are STAYED until 4/20/2018, at which time the stay will be automatically lifted. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a status report by 4/20/2018. The deadline for Defendants to answer or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint is EXTENDED until 5/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 3/1/2018. (jss)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kenneth W Gage PHV for AT&T Mobility Services LLC and AT&T Services, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 2/22/2018. (mtr)
February 21, 2018 Filing 25 Application for Attorney Kenneth W. Gage to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of AT&T Mobility Services LLC and AT&T Services, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3491681(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
February 20, 2018 Filing 24 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION to Stay re #16 Amended Complaint filed by AT&T Mobility Services LLC, AT&T Services, Inc.. (Lewandoski PHV, Alison)
February 20, 2018 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AT&T Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc for AT&T Services, Inc... (Lewandoski PHV, Alison)
February 20, 2018 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AT&T Mobility Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent AT&T Inc for AT&T Mobility Services LLC.. (Lewandoski PHV, Alison)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alison M Lewandoski PHV for AT&T Mobility Services LLC and AT&T Services, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 2/16/2018. (mtr)
February 15, 2018 Filing 20 Application for Attorney Alison M. Lewandoski to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of AT&T MOBILITY SERVICES LLC a/k/a AT&T MOBILITY LLC and AT&T SERVICES, INC.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3487248(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
February 13, 2018 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Katia Hills. AT&T Mobility Services LLC waiver sent on 2/6/2018, answer due 4/9/2018; AT&T Services, Inc. waiver sent on 2/6/2018, answer due 4/9/2018. (Thomas PHV, Gillian)
February 6, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Stay re #16 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Katia Hills. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thomas PHV, Gillian)
February 6, 2018 Filing 17 STATUS REPORT by Katia Hills. (Thomas PHV, Gillian)
February 6, 2018 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against AT&T Mobility Services LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., filed by Katia Hills.(Thomas PHV, Gillian)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying without prejudice #6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Lenora Michelle Lapidus pursuant to NDI LR 83-5 (c) (ii) and (iii),to reapply upon receipt of reactivation of admission in District of Columbia. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 1/30/18. (slm) (cc) Lapidus
January 23, 2018 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Katia Hills. AT&T Mobility Services LLC waiver sent on 1/18/2018, answer due 3/19/2018; AT&T Services, Inc. waiver sent on 1/18/2018, answer due 3/19/2018. (Thomas PHV, Gillian)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (DE 9) and her Second Amended Complaint (DE 11). Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a status report by 2/6/2018 showing cause as why this action should not be dismissed for incomplete service in process in violation of FRCP 4(m). Plaintiff is ADMONISHED to comply with the Rule 4 summons requirements when filing complaints or amended complaints in this Court in the future. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 1/22/18. (ksp)
January 18, 2018 Filing 12 Proposed Summons for added Defendant AT&T Services Inc not provided re DE #11 . (sct)
January 17, 2018 Filing 11 *** STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED 1/22/2018 *** AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against AT&T Mobility Services LLC, AT&T Services, Inc., filed by Katia Hills.(Thomas PHV, Gillian) Modified on 1/22/2018 to add text (ksp).
October 20, 2017 Filing 10 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to AT&T Inc, AT&T Mobility Services LLC. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmc)
October 19, 2017 Filing 9 *** STRICKEN PER ORDER DATED 1/22/2018 *** AMENDED COMPLAINT against AT&T Inc, AT&T Mobility Services LLC, filed by Katia Hills.(Thomas PHV, Gillian) Modified on 1/22/2018 to add text (ksp).
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Gillian L Thomas PHV for Katia Hills. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 8/2/17. (mtr)
July 19, 2017 Filing 7 Application for Attorney Gillian Lathrop Thomas to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Katia Hills. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3306239(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/1/2017: #1 Supplement SCOTUS Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Supplement NJ Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Supplement PA Status) (mtr). (Main Document 7 replaced on 8/2/2017) (mtr).
July 19, 2017 Filing 6 Application for Attorney Lenora Michelle Lapidus to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Katia Hills. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3306223(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2017: #1 NY Certificate, #2 NJ Certificate, #3 SCOTUS Certificate) (mtr). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2017: #4 Letter re DC Status) (mtr). (Main Document 6 replaced on 9/6/2017) (mtr).
July 18, 2017 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to AT&T Inc, AT&T Mobility Services LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (ksp)
July 17, 2017 Filing 4 Proposed Summons filed by Katia Hills. (DeBrota, Amy)
July 17, 2017 Filing 3 Proposed Summons filed by Katia Hills. (DeBrota, Amy)
July 17, 2017 Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (NEW CASE) (ksp)
July 14, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against AT&T Mobility Services LLC( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3302611.), filed by Katia Hills.(DeBrota, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hills v. AT&T Mobility Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility Services LLC
Represented By: Alison M Lewandoski PHV
Represented By: Kenneth W Gage PHV
Represented By: Brian M Hayes PHV
Represented By: Alexander J Maturi PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT
Represented By: Alison M Lewandoski PHV
Represented By: Kenneth W Gage PHV
Represented By: Brian M Hayes PHV
Represented By: Alexander J Maturi PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Inc
Represented By: Alexander J Maturi PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Services, Inc.
Represented By: Alison M Lewandoski PHV
Represented By: Kenneth W Gage PHV
Represented By: Brian M Hayes PHV
Represented By: Alexander J Maturi PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katia Hills
Represented By: Amy Ficklin DeBrota
Represented By: Lynn A Toops
Represented By: Lenora M Lapidus PHV
Represented By: Kalpana Kotagal PHV
Represented By: Gillian L Thomas PHV
Represented By: Emma J Roth PHV
Represented By: Joseph M Sellers PHV
Represented By: Miriam R Nemeth PHV
Represented By: Vess A Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?