MercAsia USA, LTD v. Zhu et al
Plaintiff: |
MercAsia USA LTD |
Defendant: |
Jianqing Zhu and 3BTech, Inc. |
Counter_claimant: |
3BTech, Inc. |
Counter_defendant: |
MercAsia USA LTD |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv00718 |
Filed: |
September 19, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana |
Office: |
South Bend Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Jon E DeGuilio |
Presiding Judge: |
Michael G Gotsch |
Nature of Suit: |
Patent |
Cause of Action: |
35 U.S.C. § 271 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 14, 2023 |
Filing
222
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS in part the motion for summary judgment, finding air ports below the spout are not the equivalent of those above the spout as a matter of law; to all other issues, the Court DENIES Defendants' motion for summary judgment 205 . Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 02/14/2023. (jdb)
|
March 24, 2022 |
Filing
192
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court DENIES MercAsia's motion to seal 173 and GRANTS MercAsia's motion for leave to amend and supplement its first amended complaint 174 . The Court DIRECTS the Clerk to unseal docket entries 174, 174- 1, and 17 4-2 as well as docket entries 175 and 175-1. Docket entries 175-2, 175-3, and 175-4 will remain sealed for the time being and will be unsealed if neither party files a new motion to seal within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. The Court further DIRECTS the Clerk to file MercAsia's attached First Supplemental Complaint as a separate docket entry (DE 174-1). Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 3/24/2022. (rmf)
|
March 16, 2021 |
Filing
152
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 147 in its entirety and DENYING 98 MOTION for Sanctions in the Form of Entry of Default Judgment by Plaintiff MercAsia USA LTD. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 3/16/2021. (lhc)
|
March 1, 2021 |
Filing
146
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court GRANTS MercAsia's 66 MOTION to Compel Documents and Responses to Requests for Production and GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART MercAsia's 106 Second MOTION to Compel Documents and Responses to Requests for Production as specified in opinion and order. Accordingly the Court AWARDS MercAsia its reasonable expenses, including attorney's fees, incurred in bringing its motion to compel 66 and 106 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 3/1/2021. (nae)
|
June 30, 2020 |
Filing
111
OPINION AND ORDER DENYING 82 Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 6/30/20. (kjp)
|
August 13, 2018 |
Filing
46
OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 34 Second MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Party Jianqing Zhu (an individual) terminated. Attorney Michael D Marston; Lei Mei; Philip Andrew Riley; Richard P Hadorn and Garrick T Lankford terminated. This action remains pending as to the claims against 3BTech. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 8/13/18. (ksp)
|
November 13, 2017 |
Filing
38
OPINION AND ORDER: The Court DENIES MercAsias motion for a preliminary injunction DE 4 . MercAsias motion for oral argument DE 21 is DENIED as unnecessary, and the defendants motion to strike DE 28 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 11/13/17. (nal)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?